Stiltner v. Commissioner of Social Security
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Nicholas P Mizell |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00774 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/23 12:49 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Crystal Stiltner. (Steinberg, Michael) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Thu 04/04 12:41 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 4/4/2024. (WRW) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order to Strike
Thu 04/04 9:57 AM
TEXT ORDER: Local Rule 3.03 requires that each party file a disclosure statement using the standard form from the clerk or the court's website. However, in filing her disclosure, plaintiff used an outdated form. As such, the paper is deemed stricken, and the clerk is directed to delete the PDF file (Doc. 8 ) from the CM/ECF docket. By April 18, 2024, plaintiff must refile her disclosure statement using the proper form, which can be found at: https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/form/disclosure-statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 4/4/2024. (JMM) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/03 8:24 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Crystal Stiltner. (Steinberg, Michael) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Wed 04/03 8:23 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Crystal Stiltner. Related case(s): No (Steinberg, Michael) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Wed 04/03 8:22 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Michael Alan Steinberg on behalf of Crystal Stiltner. Lead Counsel: Michael A. Steinberg. (Steinberg, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/02 1:15 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 8:24-cv-774-NPM. Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate no longer assigned to the case. (NAS) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 03/29 10:00 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 3/29/2024. (CED) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 03/28 3:42 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 8:24-cv-774-UAM. (AJS) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/28 2:45 PM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Crystal Stiltner. (Steinberg, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/28 2:44 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. The plaintiff CONSENTS to jurisdiction of the United States magistrate judge filed by Crystal Stiltner.(Steinberg, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet |