Vines v. Calhoun County Sheriff Department et al
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Phillip J Green |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00323 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Statement Regarding Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/Habeas Case)
Thu 04/04 1:44 PM
STATEMENT RE CONSENT by plaintiff George Taylor Carl Vines consenting to proceed before the Magistrate Judge (pjw) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas)
Thu 03/28 2:33 PM
NOTICE to plaintiff regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 4/18/2024 (pjw) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees
Thu 03/28 2:32 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (pjw) |
|
Att: 1 Financial Documents | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/28 2:28 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by George Taylor Carl Vines (pjw) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix A, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons | ||
utility
Copies Mailed
Thu 03/28 2:59 PM
Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas)3 sent via U.S. Mail to George Taylor Carl Vines (eod) |