Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Timothy S Black
Referred: Chelsey M Vascura
Case #: 2:24-cv-01447
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2024
Terminated:Jun 25, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 24, 2024 4:55 AM EDT
Defendant
John Doe
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By
John Charles Ridge
Ridge Law, LLC
contact info

GPO Apr 05 2024
ORDER: (1) granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve Third-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference; and (2) issuing a Protective Order. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 4/5/2024. (rrs)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 06/25 9:17 AM
***Civil Case Terminated per11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (zmc)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 06/24 5:02 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Ridge, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
10 10 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 04/05 4:41 PM
ORDER: (1) granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve Third-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference; and (2) issuing a Protective Order. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 4/5/2024. (rrs)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 04/05 2:19 PM
MOTION Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Ridge, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Williamson,
Att: 2 Declaration of Patrick Paige,
Att: 3 Declaration of Susan Stalzer,
Att: 4 Proposed Entry
Friday, March 29, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 03/29 11:42 AM
ORDER - This civil case, being related Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe, No. 1:23-cv-144, is hereby reassigned to the docket of the Honorable Timothy S. Black. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 9/1/2023. (kh)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Fri 03/29 12:20 PM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (kh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/28 3:43 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC AO 121 Form (Ridge, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Works List
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/28 3:42 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, General Media Systems LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Ridge, John)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Complaint Thu 03/28 3:41 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against John Doe, filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Ridge, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Works List,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/28 3:06 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC AO 121 Form (Ridge, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Works List
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/28 3:06 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, General Media Systems LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Ridge, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/28 3:04 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against John Doe ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9892782), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Ridge, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Works List,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet