Burkhart v. International Paper Company
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Jerry Edwards, Jr |
Referred: | Kayla D Mcclusky |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00441 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 28, 2024 5:09 PM CDT |
Defendant
International Paper Company
201 St Charles St Suite 2700
New Orleans, LA 70170 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jewell Burkhart
1075 Government Street
Baton Rouge, LA 70802 |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/08 10:41 AM
Response to Removal Order by International Paper Co re7 Removal Order (aty,Smith, Lea) Modified on 4/8/2024 to modify docket text. (Crick, S) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/04 3:37 PM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by International Paper Co. (aty,Smith, Lea) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Removal Order
Tue 04/02 1:41 PM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 4/2/2024. (crt,Leday, A) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Mon 04/01 10:53 AM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/1/2024. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Mon 04/01 10:48 AM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal sent to Adras Paul LaBorde, III, Madaline King Rabalais on behalf of Jewell Burkhart, International Paper Co. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 4/15/2024. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 03/29 1:11 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by International Paper Company.(aty,Rabalais, Madaline) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/28 5:33 PM
NOTICE of List of Parties and Pleadings by International Paper Company(aty,Rabalais, Madaline) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Docket from DeSoto Parish | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/28 5:15 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by International Paper Company. (aty,Rabalais, Madaline) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 03/28 5:06 PM
NOTICE of Removal from 42 JDC Desoto Parish, Case Number 84892-B with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-5899770) filed by International Paper Company.(Attorney Madaline King Rabalais added to party International Paper Company(pty:dft))(aty,Rabalais, Madaline) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Docket from Desoto Parish, | ||
Att: 2 Civil cover sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/01 10:43 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge Jerry Edwards, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Crick, S) |