Merritt v. Square Capital, LLC
Tennessee Western District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas L Parker |
Referred: | Annie T Christoff |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-02196 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Shelby County Circuit Court, CT-73-00023 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 28, 2024 5:10 PM CDT |
Defendant
Square Capital, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Merritt
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 04/23 1:24 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re8 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Square Capital, LLC. (Morris, Samuel) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 04/09 12:40 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, or, Alternatively, to Dismiss for Failure to State A Claim filed by Kenneth Merritt. (agj) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Compel
Thu 04/04 11:35 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration, or, Alternatively, to Dismiss for Failure to State A Claim by Square Capital, LLC.(Morris, Samuel) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum Memo of Law in Support of Motion, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Declaration of Praneeth Sangani, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Declaration of Tacara Tate, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. A to Tate Decl. - General Terms of Service 4-16-18, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. B to Tate Decl. - General Terms of Service 1 1-2020 | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. C to Tate Decl. - Electronic Correspondence Log, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex. 3 - American Arbitration Assoc. Rules | ||
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/01 2:33 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR PRETRIAL MANAGEMENT UNDER ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2013-05. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 4/1/24. (seh) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge
Fri 03/29 11:06 AM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice LR 16.2
Fri 03/29 11:05 AM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj) |
|
3 | 3
notice
ADR Compliance
Fri 03/29 11:04 AM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 03/29 11:03 AM
Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (agj) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 03/28 5:04 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Square Capital, LLC from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-4473-23 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNWDC-4377768), filed by Square Capital, LLC.(Morris, Samuel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - State Court File, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |