34 Drive Corp
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Alan S Trust |
Case #: | 8:24-bk-71222 |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 29, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
34 Drive Corp
53 E Merrick Rd Ste 345
Freeport, NY 11520-4056 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Long Island Federal Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza - Room 560
Central Islip, NY 11722 |
Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Statement
Thu 04/25 3:56 PM
Statement Bar Date Notice with Bar Date Order and Proof of Claim Filed by Harold M Somer, PC on behalf of 34 Drive Corp (Somer, PC, Harold) |
|
Att: 1 Affirmation of Service | ||
Sunday, April 21, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order
Mon 04/22 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Notice Date 04/21/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
order
Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim
Fri 04/19 2:45 PM
Order Establishing Deadline for Filing Proofs of Claim. Proofs of Claims due by 6/21/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 9/24/2024. Signed on 4/19/2024 (ymm) |
|
26 | 26
order
Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference (Ch 11) All Judges
Fri 04/19 2:43 PM
Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference. Status hearing to be held on 5/22/2024 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 960 (Judge Trust), CI, NY. Signed on 4/19/2024 (ymm) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) (No Fee)
Mon 04/15 3:22 PM
Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) : LBR 1073-3 Filed by Harold M Somer, PC on behalf of 34 Drive Corp (Somer, PC, Harold) |
|
Saturday, April 13, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) (No Fee)
Sat 04/13 4:09 PM
Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, : Declaration; Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Harold M Somer, PC on behalf of 34 Drive Corp (Somer, PC, Harold) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Dismiss Case
Thu 04/11 4:55 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case PURSUANT TO § 1112(b) OF THE BANKRUPTCY CODE . Objections to be filed on May 2, 2024. Hearing on Objections, if any, will be held on: May 9, 2024 at 10:00 AM., or in the alternative Motion for Relief from Stay PURSUANT TO § 362(d) OF THE BANKRUPTCY CODE as to the property located at 3498 Bertha Drive, Baldwin, NY 11510, with Certificate of Service . Objections to be filed on May 2, 2024. Hearing on Objections, if any, will be held on: May 9, 2024 at 10:00 AM. Fee Amount $199. Filed by Michael Thomas Rozea on behalf of Planet Home Lending, LLC dba Planet Home Servicing as servicers for Chondrite Asset Trust. Hearing scheduled for 5/9/2024 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 960 (Judge Trust), CI, NY. (Rozea, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Note, Recorded Mortgage and full chain of Assignments of Mortgage | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B. Recorded entered Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C. Entered Order Granting Relief from Automatic Stay - Case No. 23-40649 | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D. Notice of Sale | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E. Online Valuation | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F. EDNY Worksheet | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 8 Certificate of Service | ||
22 | 22
motion
Dismiss Case
Thu 04/11 2:04 PM
ENTERED IN ERROR; ATTORNEY CALLED ; ATTORNEY WILL RE-FILE - Motion to Dismiss Case pursuant to Section 1112(b) of the Bankruptcy or in the alternative for an order pursuant to section 362(d) of the Bankruptcy Code granting Relief from Automatic Stay as to the property located at 3498 Bertha Drive, Baldwin, NY 11510 Filed by Michael Thomas Rozea on behalf of Planet Home Lending, LLC dba Planet Home Servicing as servicers for Chondrite Asset Trust. Hearing scheduled for 5/9/2024 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 960 (Judge Trust), CI, NY. (Rozea, Michael) Modified on 4/11/2024 (ssw) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Note, Recorded Mortgage, and Assignments of Mortgage | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B. Recorded Entered Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C. Entered Relief from Automatic Stay Order from Case No. 23-40649 | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D. Notice of Sale | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E. Online Valuation Estimate | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F. EDNY Worksheet | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 8 Certificate of Service | ||
crditcrd
Automatic docket of credit card/debit card
Thu 04/11 4:55 PM
Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay([LINK:8 24-71222 ast] ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A22539138. Fee amount 199.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Extend Deadline to File Schedules
Tue 04/09 12:29 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by Harold M Somer, PC on behalf of 34 Drive Corp. Hearing scheduled for 5/22/2024 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 960 (Judge Trust), CI, NY. (Somer, PC, Harold) |
|
Att: 1 Affirmation of Harold M. Somer, Esq. | ||
Att: 2 Affirmation of Service | ||
20 | 20
misc
Affidavit
Tue 04/09 11:57 AM
Affidavit Re: LR 1007-4 Affidavit Filed by Harold M Somer, PC on behalf of 34 Drive Corp (Somer, PC, Harold) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Statement
Mon 04/08 2:33 PM
Statement LBR1073-2(b) Filed by Harold M Somer, PC on behalf of 34 Drive Corp (Somer, PC, Harold) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Statement
Mon 04/08 2:31 PM
Statement List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Harold M Somer, PC on behalf of 34 Drive Corp (Somer, PC, Harold) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Statement
Mon 04/08 2:29 PM
Statement Corporate Ownership Filed by Harold M Somer, PC on behalf of 34 Drive Corp (Somer, PC, Harold) |
|
16 | 16
misc
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Form 104 or Form 204
Mon 04/08 2:28 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Filed by Harold M Somer, PC on behalf of 34 Drive Corp (Somer, PC, Harold) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Statement
Mon 04/08 2:14 PM
Statement Corporate Resolutions Filed by Harold M Somer, PC on behalf of 34 Drive Corp (Somer, PC, Harold) |
|
Saturday, April 06, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Sat 04/06 2:53 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Harold M Somer, PC on behalf of 34 Drive Corp (Somer, PC, Harold) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 04/04 12:43 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Michael Thomas Rozea on behalf of Planet Home Lending, LLC dba Planet Home Servicing as servicers for Chondrite Asset Trust (Rozea, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
Extend Time
Wed 04/03 1:50 PM
Order Directing Debtor to Obtain Counsel and to File Schedules; the Debtor shall obtain counsel, and counsel shall file a notice of appearance with the Court, on or before April 8, 2024; the Debtor shall file all schedules and statements required to be filed in this Chapter 11 case under the Bankruptcy Code, the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, and the E.D.N.Y. Local Bankruptcy Rules by April 8, 2024; if the Debtor fails to comply with the preceding paragraphs, the Court will dismiss this case sua sponte without further notice . Signed on 4/3/2024. (one) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Judicial Determination Concerning Placement of a Restriction on a Filed Document
Tue 04/02 9:01 AM
Order Directing Clerk's Office to restrict access to the document . Signed on 4/1/2024 (one) |
|
Sunday, March 31, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Reset of Section 341 Meeting of Creditors
Mon 04/01 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Reset of Section 341 Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 03/31/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Saturday, March 30, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing
Sun 03/31 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Notice Date 03/30/2024. (Admin.) |
|
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Sun 03/31 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 03/30/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
trustee
Notice of Rescheduled Telephonic 341 Meeting with Instructions
Fri 03/29 11:57 AM
Notice of Rescheduled Telephonic 341 Meeting with Instructions. Meeting scheduled for April 29, 2024 @ 3 pm Filed by United States Trustee . (Yang, Stan) |
|
6 | 6
trustee
Notice of Rescheduled Telephonic 341 Meeting with Instructions
Fri 03/29 11:47 AM
Notice of Rescheduled Telephonic 341 Meeting with Instructions. Meeting scheduled for April 30, 2024 @ 3:00 pm Filed by United States Trustee . (Yang, Stan) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Thu 03/28 1:04 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/29/2024 at 03:00 PM at Room 561, 560 Federal Plaza, CI, NY. (dng) |
|
4 | 4
court
Deficient Filing Chapter 11
Thu 03/28 12:35 PM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 3/28/2024. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 3/28/2024. Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 3/28/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 3/28/2024. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 3/28/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 4/11/2024. Schedule A/B due 4/11/2024. Schedule D due 4/11/2024. Schedule E/F due 4/11/2024. Schedule G due 4/11/2024. Schedule H due 4/11/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 4/11/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 4/11/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 4/11/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 4/11/2024. (dng) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Refiled Petition Re: Forms Modernization 2015 (Pgs 1-4) for Non-Individuals
Thu 03/28 12:32 PM
Refiled Petition Re: Forms Modernization 2015 (Pgs 1-4)for Non-Individuals; To remove loan number from matrix Filed by 34 Drive Corp (dng) |
|
1 | 1
10
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Thu 03/28 12:28 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $ 1738. Filed by 34 Drive Corp Chapter 11 Plan due by 7/26/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 7/26/2024. (dng) |
|
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Auto
Thu 03/28 7:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Installment Filing Fee - $1,000.00. Receipt Number 80270956. (GG) (admin) |
||
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Auto
Thu 03/28 7:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Installment Filing Fee - $738.00. Receipt Number 80270956. (GG) (admin) |