California Central District Court
Judge:Kenly Kiya Kato
Referred: Shashi H Kewalramani
Case #: 5:24-cv-00665
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2024
Terminated:Jan 23, 2025
Case in other court:California Superior Court, County of Riverside, CVRI2400756
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 24, 2024 1:23 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Penske Transportation Management LLC
Represented By
Jordan Ryan Turner
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Kim L Carter
Littler Mendelson, P.C
contact info
Plaintiff
Chasity Foreman
Represented By
Donald James Aaron Brock
Brock And Gonzales LLP
contact info
Christina R Kerner
Brock And Gonzales LLP
contact info
Elizabeth Ann Siruno
Brock And Gonzales, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, January 23, 2025
27 27 order Dismissing Case Thu 01/23 10:59 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Based on the Parties' Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, it is hereby ORDERED that: 1. All claims in the above-captioned action are dismissed in their entirety with prejudice; 2. Each party is to bear her/its own respective attorney's fees and costs; and 3. All existing dates and deadlines in this matter are vacated. RE: First STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Case settled26 . (Case Terminated. Made JS-6.) (aco)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
26 26 stip Dismiss Case Wed 01/22 5:25 PM
First STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Case settled filed by Plaintiff Chasity Foreman Chasity Foreman.(Brock, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Monday, September 30, 2024
24 24 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Mon 09/30 9:37 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Related Deadlines from February 10, 2025 to April 16, 202523 . The following error(s) was/were found: Caption shall indicate how many previous extensions requested. See Judge Kato's Standing Order. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
23 23 motion Continue Fri 09/27 5:23 PM
Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Related Deadlines from February 10, 2025 to April 16, 2025 filed by Defendant Penske Transportation Management LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/31/2024 at 09:30 AM before Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (Carter, Kim)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum - Plaintiff and Defendant's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Joint Motion to Continue Trial Date and Related Deadlines,
Att: 2 Declaration - Declaration of Kim Carter in Support of Plaintiff and Defendant's Joint Motion to Continue Trial Date and Related Deadlines,
Att: 3 Declaration Declaration of Christina R. Kerner in Support of Plaintiff and Defendant's Joint Motion to Continue Trial Date and Related Deadlines,
Att: 4 Proposed Order - Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff and Defendant's Joint Motion to Continue Trial Date and Related Deadlines
Thursday, August 01, 2024
22 22 misc Statement Thu 08/01 3:46 PM
STATEMENT Joint Statement re: Scheduling of ADR Proceeding (Kerner, Christina)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
21 21 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) Fri 05/24 10:08 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 12/20/2024. (aco)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 05/24 10:05 AM
CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. This case is set for trial before the Honorable Kenly Kiya Kato, 3470 12th Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom 3, Riverside, CA 92501. Final Pretrial Conference: 1/23/2025 at 10:30 a.m. Jury Trial: 2/10/2025 at 8:30 a.m. (See document for further information). (aco)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
19 19 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 05/17 11:48 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: The Scheduling Conference set for 5/23/2024, is hereby VACATED. The Court will issue a separate trial scheduling order setting forth a trial schedule. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
18 18 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Thu 05/09 11:52 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Joint Rule 26 Report ; estimated length of trial 3 to 7 days, filed by Defendant Penske Transportation Management LLC.. (Turner, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
17 17 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Tue 04/23 10:34 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: The Court has updated its procedures in civil cases, including the recommended timelines in the Court's Schedule of Pretrial Dates form and the requirements and deadlines for filing pretrial documents. The parties are hereby directed to review the updated Civil Standing Order, Order Setting Scheduling Conference, and Civil Trial Scheduling Order, which are available on the Court's website at[LINK:https://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-kenly-kiya-kato.] THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
16 16 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 04/12 4:50 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Chasity Foreman, (Kerner, Christina)
Related: [-]
15 15 trial Jury Demand Fri 04/12 4:49 PM
DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Chasity Foreman.. (Kerner, Christina)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 04/12 1:33 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Scheduling Conference set for 5/23/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (npo)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 04/12 11:49 AM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (npo)
Related: [-]
12 12 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 04/12 11:49 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Fri 04/12 11:43 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym to Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 5:24-cv-00665-KK (SHKx). (et)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
10 10 misc Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Thu 04/11 3:42 PM
DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant Penske Transportation Management LLC. (Turner, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
9 9 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Mon 04/01 1:23 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (car)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV-11C
Thursday, March 28, 2024
8 8 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Thu 03/28 4:58 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Penske Transportation Management LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement,5 , Notice of Related Case(s)7 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Declaration,4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties,6 , Declaration,3 served on March 28, 2024. (Turner, Jordan)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Related Case(s) Thu 03/28 4:39 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Penske Transportation Management LLC, a Delaware limited liability company. Related Case(s): None (Turner, Jordan)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 03/28 4:36 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Penske Transportation Management LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, identifying Chasity Foreman; Brock & Gonzales, LLP; Penske Transporation Management LLC; and Littler Mendelson, P.C.. (Turner, Jordan)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/28 4:33 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Penske Transportation Management LLC, a Delaware limited liability company identifying Penske Transportation Management LLC as Corporate Parent. (Turner, Jordan)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Declaration Thu 03/28 4:29 PM
DECLARATION of Jordan R. Turner re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 Declaration of Jordan R. Turner in Support of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court filed by Defendant Penske Transportation Management LLC, a Delaware limited liability company. (Turner, Jordan)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration Thu 03/28 4:26 PM
DECLARATION of Cheryl Emery re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 Declaration of Cheryl Emery in Support of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court filed by Defendant Penske Transportation Management LLC, a Delaware limited liability company. (Turner, Jordan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 03/28 4:22 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Penske Transportation Management LLC, a Delaware limited liability company. (Turner, Jordan)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/28 4:18 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from California Superior Court, County of Riverside, case number CVRI Receipt No: ACACDC-37186390 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Penske Transportation Management LLC, a Delaware limited liability company. (Attorney Jordan Ryan Turner added to party Penske Transportation Management LLC, a Delaware limited liability company(pty:dft))(Turner, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Proof of Service - Summons, Complaint, and Other Initial Documents,
Att: 3 Answer to Complaint,
Att: 4 Proof of Service - Answer to Complaint
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 04/01 1:36 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-50, inclusive, Penske Transportation Management LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Chasity Foreman. Filed in State Court on 2/9/2024 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 04/01 1:51 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Chasity Foreman, upon Defendant Penske Transportation Management LLC served on 2/27/2024, answer due 3/19/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent, by serving Nicole Stauss - Authorized Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Filed in State Court on 2/28/2024 Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Mon 04/01 2:00 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Penske Transportation Management LLC. Filed in State Court on 3/27/2024 Submitted with Attachment 3 to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]