California Northern District Court
Judge:Lisa J Cisneros
Case #: 3:24-cv-01922
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2024
Terminated:Oct 11, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 24, 2024 1:23 AM PDT
Defendant
CENTER FOR THIRD WORLD ORGANIZING
Represented By
Marcy Lynn Gribin Sanchez
Klinedinst PC
contact info
Natalie P. Vance
Klinedinst PC
contact info
Defendant
CAREY JENKINS
Represented By
Marcy Lynn Gribin Sanchez
Klinedinst PC
contact info
Natalie P. Vance
Klinedinst PC
contact info
Defendant
CHINYERE TUTASHINDA
Represented By
Marcy Lynn Gribin Sanchez
Klinedinst PC
contact info
Natalie P. Vance
Klinedinst PC
contact info
Plaintiff
YAMANI VINSON
Represented By
Shahane Arayi Martirosyan
contact info

GPO Jun 27 2024
Order by Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros granting 8 Stipulated Protective Order.(bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2024)

Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, October 11, 2024
28 28 2 pgs motion Dismiss Fri 10/11 10:56 AM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by YAMANI VINSON. Responses due by 11/1/2024. Replies due by 11/8/2024. (Martirosyan, Shahane) Modified on 10/11/2024 (anj, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
27 27 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 10/10 1:32 PM
ORDER by Judge Lisa J. Cisneros: Despite the Court's October 8, 2024 Order identifying the parties' failure to comply with Civil Local Rule 5-1(i)(3), the parties' renewed 26 Stipulation still does not include the attestation required by the Local Rule. The relevant language of that rule is as follows: "In the case of a Signatory... who is an ECF user but whose user ID and password are not utilized in the electronic filing of the document (as in the case of documents requiring multiple signatures), the filer of the document shall attest that each of the other Signatories have concurred in the filing of the document, which shall serve in lieu of their signatures on the document. The filer's attestation may be incorporated into the document itself, or take the form of a declaration attached to the document." The renewed stipulation is STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules and the Court's previous Order. Counsel for both parties are directed to read Local Rule 5-1(i) in its entirety. If any confusion remains after reading the rule, ECF No. 11 in Case No. 24-cv-06284-VC includes an example of an acceptable attestation. The parties are also encouraged to remove the label "CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT" from the footer of any further corrected stipulation. Pending the filing of a valid stipulation to dismiss, the case management conference set for October 31, 2024 remains on calendar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ljclc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
26 26 2 pgs motion Dismiss Thu 10/10 11:07 AM
Stipulation of Dismiss with Prejudice filed by YAMANI VINSON. Responses due by 10/24/2024. Replies due by 10/31/2024. (Martirosyan, Shahane) Modified on 10/10/2024 (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 10/10 10:45 AM
ORDER ORDER by Judge Lisa J. Cisneros: In light of the apparent settlement of this case, the case management conference previously set for October 10, 2024 is CONTINUED sua sponte to October 31, 2024 at 1:30 PM, to occur via Zoom. The conference will be vacated if a corrected stipulation sufficient to dismiss the case is filed before that date. If the case has not been dismissed, however, counsel for the parties are expected to appear. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ljclc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
24 24 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 10/08 9:25 AM
ORDER by Judge Lisa J. Cisneros: The 23 Stipulation filed October 7, 2024 lacks the attestation required by Civil Local Rule 5-1(i)(3). The Court therefore disregards the Stipulation as not properly filed. The Stipulation also does not address whether Defendant Carey Jenkins joins the request and whether Plaintiff intends to dismiss claims against Jenkins. The parties are directed to file a revised stipulation correcting those deficiencies. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ljclc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
23 23 motion Dismiss Mon 10/07 3:19 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by YAMANI VINSON. Responses due by 10/21/2024. Replies due by 10/28/2024. (Martirosyan, Shahane)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
22 22 order Status Report Order Fri 10/04 7:48 PM
ORDER by Judge Lisa J. Cisneros: The parties have not filed a case management statement as required by the Amended Clerk's Notice dated August 9, 2024. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report no later than October 8, 2024 addressing the status of settlement and whether the parties wish to proceed with the case management conference set for October 10, 2024. The parties are required to appear for the case management conference unless it is vacated or continued by the Court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ljclc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
21 21 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Fri 08/09 2:24 PM
AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE. Notice is hereby given that the Initial Case Management Conference previously set for August 15, 2024 is CONTINUED to October 10, 2024 at 1:30 PM. This hearing will proceed via Zoom Webinar. The joint case management statement is due October 3, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bns, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
20 20 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Fri 08/09 2:18 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE. Notice is hereby given that the Initial Case Management Conference previously set for August 15, 2024 is CONTINUED to October 3, 2024 at 1:30 PM. This hearing will proceed via Zoom Webinar. The initial case management conference is due September 6, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bns, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
19 19 2 pgs misc Case Management Statement Thu 08/08 3:12 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (JOINT) filed by CENTER FOR THIRD WORLD ORGANIZING, CAREY JENKINS, CHINYERE TUTASHINDA. (Vance, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
18 18 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Mon 07/29 7:17 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INTIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE RE DOCKET NO.17 . Notice is hereby given that the Initial Case Management Conference is CONTINUED to August 15, 2024 at 01:30 PM via Zoom Webinar. A joint case management statement is due by August 8, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bns, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
17 17 2 pgs misc Status Report Thu 07/25 5:08 PM
STATUS REPORT (JOINT) Request to Continue Case Management Conference and Submit Discovery Plan by CENTER FOR THIRD WORLD ORGANIZING, CAREY JENKINS, CHINYERE TUTASHINDA. (Vance, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 06/28 9:31 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] .[err102] NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Marcy Lynn Gribin Sanchez- The docket shows a different address and phone number from what is appearing on the document. Please update your personal profile on ECF or future filings. Re: 13 Notice of Appearance filed by CAREY JENKINS, CENTER FOR THIRD WORLD ORGANIZING, CHINYERE TUTASHINDA (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
16 16 1 pgs minutes Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Fri 06/28 8:12 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/27/2024. Total Time in Court: 12 minutes. Court Reporter: Recorded via Zoom: 1:37 p.m.- 1:49 p.m. Plaintiff Attorney: Shahane Martirosyan, Stephan Filip P.C, counsel for Plaintiff. Defendant Attorney: Natalie Vance, Klinedinst PC, counsel for Defendant. Results: The parties indicated their preference for a June 2025 trial date. The Court will set a June 2025 trial date and issue a case management schedule thataccords with that scheduled trial date. The parties shall appear for a second case management conference on August 1, 2024 at 1:30 pm.By July 25, 2024, the parties shall file a joint status report describing their settlement effortsincluding if they want to have a settlement conference with a Magistrate Judge that is eitherrandomly assigned or of their own choosing. The status report shall also outline the partiesdiscovery plan, (a) specifying the scope of anticipated discovery, (b) setting forth any proposedlimitations or modifications of the discovery rules, (c) indicating that the parties have reviewedand discussed the Northern District of Californias Electronically Stored Information (ESI)guidelines, and (d) any identified discovery disputes. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lisa-j-cisneros/ General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Status Report due by 7/25/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2024 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only.(bns, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/27/2024)
Related: [-]
15 15 14 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 06/27 10:43 AM
Order by Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros granting 8 Stipulated Protective Order.(bns, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
14 14 oth_sup Declaration in Support Thu 06/27 9:54 AM
Declaration of SHAHANE A. MARTIROSYAN IN SUPPORT OF USING PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed byYAMANI VINSON. (Martirosyan, Shahane)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/27 8:34 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Marcy Lynn Gribin Sanchez (Gribin Sanchez, Marcy)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
12 12 order Order Mon 06/24 11:44 AM
ORDER by Judge Lisa J. Cisneros: The parties are instructed to submit a declaration in support of their 8 Stipulated Protective Order as required by section F.6 of this Court's Standing Order no later than June 27, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ljclc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 06/21 10:12 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . [err102] NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Natalie P. Vance- The docket shows a different phone number from what is appearing on the document. Please update your personal profile on ECF. Re: 9 Answer to Complaint filed by CAREY JENKINS, CENTER FOR THIRD WORLD ORGANIZING, CHINYERE TUTASHINDA (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
11 11 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 06/20 5:17 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by CENTER FOR THIRD WORLD ORGANIZING, CAREY JENKINS, CHINYERE TUTASHINDA.. (Vance, Natalie)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 06/20 5:14 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CENTER FOR THIRD WORLD ORGANIZING, CAREY JENKINS, CHINYERE TUTASHINDA (Vance, Natalie)
Related: [-]
9 9 15 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Thu 06/20 5:10 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by CENTER FOR THIRD WORLD ORGANIZING, CAREY JENKINS, CHINYERE TUTASHINDA. (Vance, Natalie)
Related: [-]
8 8 14 pgs motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 06/20 4:51 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER MODEL STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by YAMANI VINSON. (Martirosyan, Shahane)
Related: [-]
7 7 6 pgs misc Joint Case Management Statement Thu 06/20 4:45 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by YAMANI VINSON. (Martirosyan, Shahane)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
6 6 1 pgs misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 04/04 1:31 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by YAMANI VINSON.. (Martirosyan, Shahane)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 03/29 9:18 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 6/20/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/27/2024 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 03/29 9:15 AM
Summons Issued as to CENTER FOR THIRD WORLD ORGANIZING, CAREY JENKINS, CHINYERE TUTASHINDA. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 03/28 3:43 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/11/2024. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs misc Proposed Summons Thu 03/28 3:01 PM
Proposed Summons. (Martirosyan, Shahane)
Related: [-]
1 1 24 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 03/28 2:59 PM
COMPLAINT for Damages against CENTER FOR THIRD WORLD ORGANIZING, CAREY JENKINS, CHINYERE TUTASHINDA ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19269657.). Filed by YAMANI VINSON.(Martirosyan, Shahane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet