California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referred: David T Bristow
Case #: 5:24-cv-00666
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2024
Terminated:Sep 09, 2024
Case in other court:Superior Court State of CA, County of Riverside, CVPS2401780
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 24, 2024 1:24 AM PDT
Defendant
Altera Digital Health Inc.
Represented By
Robert C. Little
Buchalter, Apc
contact info
Eric M Kennedy
Buchalter Apc
contact info
Brian Robert Satter Shaw
Payne And Fears
contact info
Molly Anne Jones
Crowell And Moring LLP
contact info
Jennifer S Romano
Crowell And Moring LLP
contact info
Danielle Michelle Mayer
Buchalter Apc
contact info
Pooya E Sohi
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Palo Verde Healthcare District
Represented By
Maria C Roberts
Greene And Roberts
contact info
Nicolas Joshua Echevestre
Green And Roberts
contact info
Noel J Meza, III
Greene And Roberts
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, October 17, 2024
88 88 textonly Notice of Filing Transcript - Redacted Thu 10/17 2:54 PM
NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 9/05/2024 re Transcript87 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ls)
Related: [-]
87 87 transcript -Transcript - Redacted Thu 10/17 2:51 PM
REDACTED TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/05/2024, re: Transcript 80 . Redaction Request due 11/7/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/18/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/15/2025. (ls)
Related: [-]