Herrera et al v. Swift Transportation Company et al
New Mexico District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer M Rozzoni |
Referred: | Laura Fashing |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00305 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.) |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2024 |
Case in other court: | First Judicial District Court, D-101-CV-23-01086 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 28, 2024 6:06 PM MDT |
Defendant
Swift Transportation Company of Arizona LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Swift Transportation Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John 1-10 Does
|
|
Defendant
Rafael Rodarte
|
|
Defendant
Knight Swift Transportation Holding, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Estate of
Peter Wirth
|
|
Estate of
Cullen Hallmark
|
|
Plaintiff
Emily Calderon
|
|
Plaintiff
Cynthia Guerrero Rodarte
|
|
Plaintiff
Aradai Rodarte
|
|
Plaintiff
Raymundo Cruz Herrera
|
|
Plaintiff
Marisela Guerrero
|
|
Plaintiff
Jose Luis Guerrero
|
|
Plaintiff
Gael Guerrero
|
|
Plaintiff
Luciana Guerreo
|
|
Plaintiff
Barry Green
|
|
Plaintiff
Juliana Flores
|
|
Plaintiff
Malie Calderon
|
|
Plaintiff
Isaiah Calderon
|
|
Plaintiff
Isaac Calderon
|
|
Plaintiff
Abraham Calderon
|
GPO
Apr 01 2024
ORDER for Further Rule 7.1 Disclosure by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Defendants shall file their Rule 7.1 statement by 4/22/24. (lj) |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
7 | 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian G. Grayson on behalf of Barry Green, Cynthia Guerrero Rodarte, Marisela Guerrero, Gael Guerrero (Grayson, Brian) | |
6 | 6 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court by Barry Green, Luciana Guerreo, Cullen Hallmark, Aradai Rodarte, Cynthia Guerrero Rodarte, Peter Wirth. (Grayson, Brian) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Docket as of April 4, 2024, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Inmate Locator - Rodarte | ||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Knight Swift Transportation Holding, Inc., Swift Transportation Company of Arizona LLC (Hernandez, Daniel) | |
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 3 pgs ORDER for Further Rule 7.1 Disclosure by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Defendants shall file their Rule 7.1 statement by 4/22/24. (lj) | |
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re1 Notice of Removal Exhibits by Knight Swift Transportation Holding, Inc., Swift Transportation Company, Swift Transportation Company of Arizona LLC (Schmehl, Jeramy) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A-1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A-2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A-3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit A-4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit A-5, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit A-6, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit A-7, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit A-8, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit A-9, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit A-10, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit B | ||
United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg) | ||
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) | ||
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Swift Transportation Company Notice of Removal from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2023-01086. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Swift Transportation Company. (Tebo, Christopher) | |
Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9287465 re1 Notice of Removal filed by Swift Transportation Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Tebo, Christopher) |