New Jersey District Court
Judge:Edward S Kiel
Referred: Matthew J Skahill
Case #: 1:21-cv-20495
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Dec 14, 2021
Last checked: Friday Mar 29, 2024 11:16 PM EDT
Counter Claimant
SENERGENE SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By
EMERY Z. TOTH
contact info
Counter Defendant
IGENOMIX USA, LLC
Represented By
SALVATORE A. GIAMPICCOLO
Stevens & Lee
contact info
NICHOLAS P. ELIADES
Stevens & Lee, PC
contact info
Defendant
SENERGENE SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By
EMERY Z. TOTH
contact info
DAVID W. FASSETT
Arseneault & Fassett, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
IGENOMIX USA, LLC
Represented By
SALVATORE A. GIAMPICCOLO
Stevens & Lee
contact info
NICHOLAS P. ELIADES
Stevens & Lee, PC
contact info
Third Party Defendant
HISCOX INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.
Represented By
LAURA BEA DOWGIN
Kennedys Cmk LLP
contact info
Third Party Plaintiff
SENERGENE SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By
DAVID W. FASSETT
Arseneault & Fassett, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
160 160 minutes Motion Hearing Status Conference Thu 05/15 9:17 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill: In-Person Status Conference/Motion Hearing held on 5/14/2025 re Plaintiff's132 and147 Motions to withdraw as counsel. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter, ECR) (sms2)
Related: [-]
159 159 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 05/15 9:14 AM
Text Order: Having held an in-person on the record conference, and for all the reasons set forth on the record, the motions to withdraw [ECF Nos.132 and147 ] are terminated. The client representative for Senergene Solutions, LLC ("Senergene") has represented to the Court that additional time is needed to secure new counsel. Therefore, Senergene shall have an additional 60 days to secure new counsel in this case. New counsel must enter an appearance by no later than July 14, 2025. If new counsel has not entered an appearance at that time: (1) Mr. Fassett shall either file a letter indicating that he intends to continue in this case as counsel for Senergene's potential third party claims or he may submit a letter renewing his motion to withdraw and incorporating his previous filing and (2) Mr. Toth may likewise renew any application with additional information for the Court's consideration. Any renewed motion to withdraw that is based on Senergene discharging Mr. Toth must provide sufficient evidence to the Court that the appropriate decisions makers and stakeholders at Senergene agree with the decision to discharge and understand that since a corporate entity must be represented by counsel that by discharging counsel and not retaining a new attorney that Senergene faces default and default judgment. There will be an in-person status conference with all counsel and the client representative for Senergene on July 23, 2025 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 3C. If new counsel appears, this conference will likely be converted to a telephone conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 5/15/2025. (rss, )
Related: [-]