California Central District Court
Judge:Monica Ramirez Almadani
Referred: Pedro V Castillo
Case #: 2:22-cv-08928
Nature of Suit376 Other Statutes - Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause31:3729 False Claims Act
Case Filed:Dec 07, 2022
Terminated:Apr 09, 2024
Last checked: Friday Mar 29, 2024 8:05 PM PDT
Defendant
PBS Food, LLC
Defendant
SB Diner LLC
Defendant
SNS Diner LLC
Plaintiff
GNGH2 Inc.
Represented By
Yael Lerman
Yael Lerman
contact info
Plaintiff
United States
Represented By
Ross McDougall Cuff
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 12, 2024
21 21 2 pgs order Order Fri 04/12 11:03 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE20 by Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani. IT IS ORDERED that this action is dismissed without prejudice as to Relator GNGH2 Inc. and as to the United States. (lom)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/11 5:26 PM
Notice of Consent to Dismissal by the United States.(Cuff, Ross)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
19 19 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Tue 04/09 4:16 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff GNGH2 Inc.. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Lerman, Yael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
18 18 order Unseal Case Thu 03/28 12:01 PM
ORDER RE UNSEALING OF CASE by Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani. (bm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
17 17 NOTICE OF ELECTION BY THE UNITED STATES TO DECLINE INTERVENTION (bm) Modified on 3/28/2024 (bm).
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
16 16 SEALED - ORDER EXTENDING SEAL AND UNITED STATES' ELECTION PERIOD (bm)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
15 15 SEALED - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION REQUESTING EXTENSION OF SEAL AND UNITED STATES' ELECTION PERIOD; DECLARATION OF ROSS M. CUFF IN SUPPORT THEREOF (bm)
Related: [-]
14 14 SEALED - STIPULATION REQUESTING EXTENSION OF SEAL AND UNITED STATES' ELECTION PERIOD(bm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, February 23, 2024
13 13 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#24-028) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani, this case is transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee to the calendar of Monica Ramirez Almadani for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-08928-MRA (PVCx). (et)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
12 12 SEALED - ORDER EXTENDING SEAL AND UNITED STATES' ELECTION PERIOD (bm)
Related: [-]
11 11 SEALED - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION REQUESTING EXTENSION OF SEAL AND UNITED STATES' ELECTION PERIOD; DECLARATION OF ROSS M. CUFF IN SUPPORT THEREOF (bm)
Related: [-]
10 10 SEALED - STIPULATION REQUESTING EXTENSION OF SEAL AND UNITED STATES' ELECTION PERIOD (bm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
9 9 SEALED - ORDER EXTENDING SEAL AND UNITED STATES' ELECTION PERIOD (bm)
Related: [-]
8 8 SEALED - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION REQUESTING EXTENSION OF SEAL AND UNITED STATES' ELECTION PERIOD; DECLARATION OF ROSS M. CUFF IN SUPPORT THEREOF (bm)
Related: [-]
7 7 SEALED - STIPULATION REQUESTING EXTENSION OF SEAL AND UNITED STATES' ELECTION PERIOD (bm)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2022
6 6 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2022
5 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (sh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
2 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff GNGH2 Inc., (sh)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants PBS Food, LLC, SB Diner LLC, SNS Diner LLC.Case assigned to Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo.(Filing fee $ 402 FEE PAID), filed by Plaintiff GNGH2 Inc.. (sh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet