Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00663
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2024
Last checked: Friday Mar 29, 2024 2:27 AM CDT
Defendant
Carric Lee Mercer, Jr. (1)
Represented By
David N. Thomas
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Mary Carol Pietrazek
Pietrazek Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Matt Ian Kass
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/29/2024 3:23 AM CDT
Monday, February 26, 2024
Arrest of Carric Lee Mercer, Jr (drda) Arrest of Carric Lee Mercer, Jr (drda) [2:24-mj-00555-HJB] [2:24-mj-00555-HJB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
Warrant Returned Executed as to Carric Lee Mercer. (drda) [2:24-mj-00555-HJB]
Related: [-]
Warrant Returned Executed as to Carric Lee Mercer, Jr. (drda) [2:24-mj-00555-HJB]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad as to Carric Lee Mercer, Jr. (drda) COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad as to Carric Lee Mercer, Jr. (drda) [2:24-mj-00555-HJB] [2:24-mj-00555-HJB]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Henry J. Bemporad as to Carric Lee Mercer, Jr. (drda) [2:24-mj-00555-HJB]
Related: [-]
3 3 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Henry J. Bemporad as to Carric Lee Mercer. (drda) [2:24-mj-00555-HJB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to USA as to Carric Lee Mercer. (drda) [2:24-mj-00555-HJB]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Carric Lee Mercer (2); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Carric Lee Mercer (2).By Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (drda) [2:24-mj-00555-HJB]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to USA as to Carric Lee Mercer, Jr. (drda) [2:24-mj-00555-HJB]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Carric Lee Mercer Jr. (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Carric Lee Mercer Jr. (1).By Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (drda) [2:24-mj-00555-HJB]
Related: [-]
4 4 Proceedings held before Judge Joseph A Cordova:Initial Appearance as to Carric Lee Mercer Jr. held on 2/29/2024 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 3/12/2024 2:00PM before Judge Joseph A Cordova, Interpreter NOT required as to Carric Lee Mercer Jr. (Court Reporter FTR GOLD-MG CIENEGA.) (drda) [2:24-mj-00555-HJB]
Related: [-]
5 5 Proceedings held before Judge Joseph A Cordova:Initial Appearance as to Carric Lee Mercer held on 2/29/2024 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 3/12/2024 2:00PM before Judge Joseph A Cordova, Interpreter NOT required as to Carric Lee Mercer (Court Reporter FTR GOLD-MG CIENEGA.) (drda) [2:24-mj-00555-HJB]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Attorney Mary Carol Pietrazek for Carric Lee Mercer appointed. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (ic) [2:24-mj-00555-HJB]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Carric Lee Mercer, Jr; Attorney David N. Thomas for Carric Lee Mercer, Jr appointed.. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (ic) [2:24-mj-00555-HJB]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
8 8 NOTICE Assertion of Rights by Carric Lee Mercer, Jr (Thomas, David) [2:24-mj-00555-HJB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
9 9 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Carric Lee Mercer (Pietrazek, Mary) [2:24-mj-00555-HJB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
10 10 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond as to Carric Lee Mercer, Jr. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (bot1) [2:24-mj-00555-HJB]
Related: [-]
11 11 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Carric Lee Mercer, Jr (Thomas, David) [2:24-mj-00555-HJB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
12 12 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to NO BOND as to Carric Lee Mercer, Jr. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ic) [2:24-mj-00555-HJB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
13 13 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Carric Lee Mercer, Jr (1) count(s) 1, 2. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
15 15 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Carric Lee Mercer, Jr (bot2)
Related: [-]
16 16 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Carric Lee Mercer, Jr (bot2)
Related: [-]