Missouri Eastern District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-00083
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2024
Last checked: Friday Mar 29, 2024 2:48 AM CDT
Defendant
Rachel Burns (2)
Represented By
St. Louis Fed Public Defender
Federal Public Defender - St Louis
contact info
Eric M. Selig
Federal Public Defender - St Louis
contact info
Defendant
William Burns (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Michael K. Hayes
United States Attorneys Office - St. Louis
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/25/2024 7:14 AM CDT
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
Warrant Issued as to Indictment in case as to William Burns, Rachel Burns. (JKL)
Related: [-]
1 1 INDICTMENT returned in open court on 2/28/2024 to Judge Patricia L. Cohen by the Foreperson of the Grand Jury. Referred to Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen as to William Burns (1) count(s) 1, 2-5, Rachel Burns (2) count(s) 1, 2-4. FORFEITURE ALLEGATION. (JKL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet
2 2 7 pgs REDACTED INDICTMENT returned in open court on 2/28/2024 to Judge Patricia L. Cohen by the Foreperson of the Grand Jury. Referred to Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen as to William Burns (1): Former count 1 is now count 1r. Former count 2-5 is now count 2r-5r. Rachel Burns (2): Former count 1 is now count 1r. Former count 2-4 is now count 2r-4r.. (JKL)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Michael K. Hayes appearing for USA. (JKL)
Related: [-]
4 4 3 pgs MOTION for Pretrial Detention and Hearing by USA as to William Burns. (JKL)
Related: [-]
5 5 3 pgs MOTION for Pretrial Detention and Hearing by USA as to Rachel Burns. (JKL)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs Order:...IT IS BY THE COURT ORDERED that said indictment shall be sealed and suppressed by the Clerk of the Court until said defendant is in custody or has given bail for the defendant's final appearance. Order as to William Burns, Rachel Burns. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 2/28/2024. (JKL)
Related: [-]
7 7 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
Related: [-]