25
|
|
25
notice
CerDocTyp - Notice of Rescheduled Hearing
Thu 04/25 12:14 AM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s) 24 Request for Notice of Rescheduled Hearing
|
24
|
|
24
court
BNC Forms Request (VAN-024) Notice of Rescheduled Hearing
Mon 04/22 2:16 PM
Request for Notice of Rescheduled Hearings ***Hearings rescheduled as to time only*** Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 5/7/2024 at 10:00 AM at Chief Judge Santoro's Courtroom, 600 Granby Street, 4th Floor, Courtroom Two, Norfolk, Virginia. (Hinkle, Jennie)
|
23
|
|
23
court
Returned Mail
Thu 04/18 12:27 PM
Returned Mail for EXTENDED FAMILY MEDICAL TRANSPORTATION LLC, 1107 Hugo Street Norfolk, VA 23513 - Not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward Related [+] (Hinkle, Jennie)
|
22
|
|
22
court
Entered in Error to Wrong Case Number: See entry
Wed 04/10 9:45 AM
Entered in Error: See entry Related [+] (Gibbs, Latanya)
Related: [-] related document(s) 16 3016-1 Case Filing/Plan Deficiency
|
21
|
|
21
notice
CerDocTyp - Notice of Electronic Filing Procedure
Sun 04/07 12:15 AM
Notice of Electronic Filing Procedure (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
20
|
|
20
notice
CerDocTyp - Notice of Meeting of Creditors
Sun 04/07 12:15 AM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s) 17 Request for Notice of Meeting of Creditors
|
19
|
|
19
plan
CerDocTyp - Notice of LBR 3015-1 Deficiency
Sun 04/07 12:15 AM
Notice of LBR 3015-1 Deficiency Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s) 16 3016-1 Case Filing/Plan Deficiency
|
18
|
|
18
court
BNC certificate of mailing of order
Sat 04/06 12:14 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
|
17
|
|
17
court
BNC Forms Request for Notice of Meeting of Creditors
Thu 04/04 11:06 AM
Request for Notice of Meeting of Creditors. 341 meeting to be held on 5/7/2024 at 01:00 PM at Norfolk-NN Divisions (11): Office of the U.S. Trustee, Telephonic meeting - see notice for details. Proof of Claims due by 8/5/2024. Complaint for Determination of Dischargeability of Debt due by 7/8/2024. (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-]
|
16
|
|
16
court
3016-1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Plan Deficiency
Thu 04/04 11:06 AM
LBR 3016-1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Plan Deficiency; and Hearing Thereon. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 6/27/2024. Hearing scheduled for 5/7/2024 at 11:00 AM at Chief Judge Santoro's Courtroom, 600 Granby Street, 4th Floor, Courtroom Two, Norfolk, Virginia. (Jones, Mozelle)
Related: [-]
|
15
|
|
15
court
BNC certificate of mailing
Thu 04/04 12:18 AM
BNC certificate of mailing Related [+] (Admin.)
|
14
|
|
14
notice
CerDocTyp - Notice of Deficient Filing
Thu 04/04 12:18 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s) 8 Deficient Filing Notice Request No VS Gorman
|
13
|
|
13
notice
CerDocTyp - Notice of LBR 1007-1 Deficiency
Thu 04/04 12:18 AM
Notice of LBR 1007-1 Deficiency Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s) 7 LBR 1007-1, and/or 1007-3, and/or 3015 Case Filing/Plan Deficiency
|
12
|
|
12
notice
CerDocTyp - Notice of LBR 1007-1 Deficiency
Thu 04/04 12:18 AM
Notice of LBR 1007-1 Deficiency Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s) 6 LBR 1007-1, and/or 1007-3, and/or 3015 Case Filing/Plan Deficiency
|
11
|
|
11
notice
CerDocTyp - Notice of LBR 1007-1 Deficiency
Thu 04/04 12:18 AM
Notice of LBR 1007-1 Deficiency Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s) 5 LBR 1007-1, and/or 1007-3, and/or 3015 Case Filing/Plan Deficiency
|
10
|
|
10
order
Designation
Wed 04/03 8:03 AM
Order of Designation; designating Patricia Edwards, Owner to perform duties imposed upon the debtor by the Bankruptcy Code (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
notice
Notice to Cure Filing Fee Deficiency No VS Gorman
Mon 04/01 11:08 AM
Notice to Cure Filing Fee Deficiency; and Hearing Thereon. Related [+] Filing Fee Due in the amount of $1,738.00 due by 4/2/2024. Hearing scheduled for 5/7/2024 at 11:00 AM at Chief Judge Santoro's Courtroom, 600 Granby Street, 4th Floor, Courtroom Two, Norfolk, Virginia. (Jones, Mozelle)
|
8
|
|
8
court
Deficient Filing Notice Request No VS Gorman
Mon 04/01 10:49 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing Issued to Patricia Edwards regarding Requirement of Counsel: filed on behalf of an entity not a natural person acting on own behalf and not signed by counsel permitted to appear under LBR 2090-1. [See LBR 9010-1]; and Hearing Thereon. Related [+] Document(s) due by 4/15/2024. Hearing scheduled for 5/7/2024 at 11:00 AM at Chief Judge Santoro's Courtroom, 600 Granby Street, 4th Floor, Courtroom Two, Norfolk, Virginia. (Jones, Mozelle)
|
7
|
|
7
court
1 - Case Filing/Plan Deficiency
Mon 04/01 10:35 AM
LBR 1007-1 Schedule(s) and/or Statement Deficiency; and Hearing Thereon. Incomplete Filings due by 4/12/2024. Hearing scheduled for 5/7/2024 at 11:00 AM at Chief Judge Santoro's Courtroom, 600 Granby Street, 4th Floor, Courtroom Two, Norfolk, Virginia. (Jones, Mozelle)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
court
1 - Case Filing/Plan Deficiency
Mon 04/01 10:31 AM
LBR 1007-1 Schedule(s) and/or Statement Deficiency; and Hearing Thereon. Incomplete Filings due by 4/12/2024. Hearing scheduled for 5/7/2024 at 11:00 AM at Chief Judge Santoro's Courtroom, 600 Granby Street, 4th Floor, Courtroom Two, Norfolk, Virginia. (Jones, Mozelle)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
court
1 - Case Filing/Plan Deficiency
Mon 04/01 10:27 AM
LBR 1007-1 Schedule(s) and/or Statement Deficiency; and Hearing Thereon. Incomplete Filings due by 4/12/2024. Hearing scheduled for 5/7/2024 at 11:00 AM at Chief Judge Santoro's Courtroom, 600 Granby Street, 4th Floor, Courtroom Two, Norfolk, Virginia. (Jones, Mozelle)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
misc
Debtor's Electronic Noticing Request (DeBN)
Fri 03/29 10:48 AM
Debtor's Electronic Noticing Request - Initial Request filed by Extended Family Medical Transportation LLC. (Hall, Linda)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
misc
Cover Sheet for List of Creditors
Fri 03/29 10:44 AM
Cover Sheet for List of Creditors and list of creditors , Creditor Matrix Uploaded/Flash Drive Received filed by Extended Family Medical Transportation LLC. (Hall, Linda)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
misc
Certificate of Credit Counseling
Fri 03/29 10:42 AM
Certificate of Credit Counseling filed by Extended Family Medical Transportation LLC. (Hall, Linda)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
8
pgs
misc
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition
Fri 03/29 10:37 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual [Fee Not Paid] Filed by Extended Family Medical Transportation LLC. (Hall, Linda)
Related: [-]
|