Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Paul L Maloney
Referred: Phillip J Green
Case #: 1:24-cv-00324
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Cause42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 29, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Sep 26, 2024 5:57 AM EDT
defendant
Kent, County of
Represented By
Matthew T. Nelson
Warner Norcross & Judd Llp (grand Rapids)
contact info
intervenor-defendant
State of Michigan Office of Attorney General
Revenue and Tax Division P.O. Box 30754
Lansing, MI 48909
Represented By
Brian Kenneth McLaughlin
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Matthew B. Hodges
Mi Dept Attorney General (revenue/coll-Lans)
contact info
Bert Thomas Golden
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
plaintiff
Ronald A. Fox
Represented By
Ronald W. Ryan
Lewis Reed & Allen PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
defendant
Peter MacGregor
Terminated: 07/29/2024
Represented By
Matthew T. Nelson
Warner Norcross & Judd Llp (grand Rapids)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, February 06, 2025
notice Attorney Appearance Thu 02/06 3:25 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of David H. Fink on behalf of plaintiff Ronald A. Fox (Fink, David)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Thu 02/06 3:43 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Nathan J. Fink on behalf of plaintiff Ronald A. Fox (Fink, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
23 23 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 12/09 4:09 PM
REPLY to response to motion19 with word count statement filed by State of Michigan Office of Attorney General (Hodges, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
22 22 respm Response to Motion Mon 11/25 4:42 PM
RESPONSE TO MOTION to dismiss and Brief in support of Motion 19 filed by Ronald A. Fox (Ryan, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
21 21 respm Certificate of Compliance Regarding Word Count Fri 11/08 10:55 PM
CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Reply to Response to Motion20 filed by Kent, County of (Nelson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 11/08 10:53 PM
REPLY to response to motion7 filed by Kent, County of (Nelson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
19 19 motion Dismiss Mon 10/28 2:26 PM
MOTION to dismiss and Brief in support of Motion by intervenor-defendant State of Michigan Office of Attorney General; (Hodges, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss
Friday, October 25, 2024
18 18 respm Response in Opposition Fri 10/25 9:08 PM
RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim 7 filed by Ronald A. Fox (Ryan, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order Lifting Stay Fri 09/27 11:29 AM
ORDER LIFTING STAY; response to pending motion to dismiss7 due within 28 days; reply due within 14 days of service of response; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Intervene Thu 09/26 1:26 PM
ORDER granting15 motion to intervene; Michigan Attorney General must file a responsive pleading within 30 days; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
15 15 motion Intervene Mon 09/23 4:21 PM
MOTION to intervene intervenor-defendant State of Michigan Office of Attorney General by intervenor-defendant State of Michigan Office of Attorney General; (Hodges, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Intervene,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
notice Attorney Appearance Mon 09/23 4:30 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Brian Kenneth McLaughlin on behalf of intervenor-defendant State of Michigan Office of Attorney General (McLaughlin, Brian)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Mon 09/23 4:32 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Bert Thomas Golden on behalf of intervenor-defendant State of Michigan Office of Attorney General (Golden, Bert)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
14 14 order Stipulation and Order Mon 07/29 3:51 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER to stay case; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Stipulation and Order Mon 07/29 3:51 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing claims against defendant Peter MacGregor with prejudice; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
12 12 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Fri 07/26 8:17 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Stay Matter by plaintiff Ronald A. Fox (Ryan, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
11 11 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Thu 07/25 3:10 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER dismissing the County Treasurer by defendants Kent, County of, Peter MacGregor (Nelson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause (Deadline) Fri 07/19 4:19 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Parties to show cause by 07/26/2024; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
9 9 respm Certificate of Compliance Regarding Word Count Mon 06/10 7:53 PM
CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion8 filed by Kent, County of, Peter MacGregor (Nelson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
8 8 respm Brief in Support of a Motion Mon 06/10 7:52 PM
BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim 7 filed by Kent, County of, Peter MacGregor (Nelson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
7 7 motion Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim Mon 06/10 7:50 PM
MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendants Kent, County of, Peter MacGregor; (Nelson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/11 3:55 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Ronald A. Fox as to Peter MacGregor waiver sent on 4/9/2024, answer due 6/10/2024 (Ryan, Ronald)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/11 3:54 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Ronald A. Fox as to Kent, County of waiver sent on 4/9/2024, answer due 6/10/2024 (Ryan, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
4 4 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Mon 04/01 3:36 PM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Paul L. Maloney (slk)
Related: [-]
service Summons Not Issued Mon 04/01 3:41 PM
SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Kent, County of, Peter MacGregor (not provided) (slk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/29 8:23 AM
COMPLAINT against County of Kent filed by Ronald A Fox (Ryan, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Fri 03/29 8:26 AM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Ronald A Fox in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7333467 (Ryan, Ronald)
Related: [-]