North Carolina Middle District Court
Judge:L Patrick Auld
Referred: L Patrick Auld
Case #: 1:24-cv-00285
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 29, 2024
Terminated:Aug 28, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Sep 26, 2024 6:12 AM EDT
Defendant
TAWA SERVICES, INC.
Represented By
ANDREW L. FITZGERALD
Fitzgerald, Hanna & Sullivan, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
TAWA SUPERMARKETS, INC.
Represented By
ANDREW L. FITZGERALD
Fitzgerald, Hanna & Sullivan, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
TAWA, INC.
Represented By
ANDREW L. FITZGERALD
Fitzgerald, Hanna & Sullivan, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
TOSHIBA GLOBAL COMMERCE SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By
CLARA NIEMAN
Robinson, Bradshaw And Hinson
contact info
HAMPTON HUNTER BRUTON
Robinson, Bradshaw And Hinson
contact info
EDWARD F. HENNESSEY, IV
Robinson Bradshaw & Hinson, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
23 23 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 08/28 2:38 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal [Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice] by TOSHIBA GLOBAL COMMERCE SOLUTIONS, INC.. (BRUTON, HAMPTON)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
utility Motions Referred Thu 06/20 8:13 AM
Motions Referred: RE:15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Partial , to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (kg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 19, 2024
22 22 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 06/19 3:46 PM
REPLY, filed by Defendants TAWA SERVICES, INC., TAWA SUPERMARKETS, INC., TAWA, INC., to Response to15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Partial filed by TAWA SERVICES, INC., TAWA SUPERMARKETS, INC., TAWA, INC.. (FITZGERALD, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 06/18 11:09 AM
MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD no longer assigned to case as referral judge. (ww)
Related: [-]
utility Case Reassigned Tue 06/18 11:11 AM
Case Reassigned to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD as presider. UNASSIGNED no longer assigned to the case. See21 Order of Reference. (ww)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 06/17 2:00 PM
ORDER of Reference to a United States Magistrate Judge signed by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 06/17/2024, that this case is referred to the presiding United States Magistrate Judge, the Honorable L. Patrick Auld or such other Magistrate Judge as may be assigned, to conduct all proceedings including a jury or nonjury trial, to order the entry of judgment, and to conduct all post-judgment proceedings therein. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall file the written consents on the docket. (lg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent to Jurisdiction
Thursday, June 13, 2024
20 20 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 06/13 11:28 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Partial filed by TAWA SERVICES, INC., TAWA SUPERMARKETS, INC., TAWA, INC. filed by TOSHIBA GLOBAL COMMERCE SOLUTIONS, INC.. Replies due by 6/27/2024 (BRUTON, HAMPTON)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
utility Case Referred to Judge Wed 06/12 3:23 PM
CASE REFERRED RE: Order of Reference to USMJ, to CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES (ww)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 06/11 10:53 AM
ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 6/11/2024; the Motion is hereby GRANTED. All further proceedings in this action beyond the Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings, including the deadline for the Parties' Rule 26(f) conference, the deadline for the Parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report, and all discovery, are hereby stayed until August 15, 2024. (sh)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
utility Motions Referred Mon 06/10 9:05 AM
Motions Referred: RE:18 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings , to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (kg)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
18 18 motion Stay Fri 06/07 2:29 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by TOSHIBA GLOBAL COMMERCE SOLUTIONS, INC.. Response to Motion due by 6/28/2024(BRUTON, HAMPTON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, May 30, 2024
17 17 notice Notice to Parties RE: SO30 Thu 05/30 3:15 PM
Notice to Parties RE: SO30.. Response due 7/1/2024 (ww)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
16 16 8 pgs respm Memorandum Tue 05/28 1:09 PM
MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants TAWA SERVICES, INC., TAWA SUPERMARKETS, INC., TAWA, INC. re15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Partial filed by TAWA SERVICES, INC., TAWA SUPERMARKETS, INC., TAWA, INC.. (FITZGERALD, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Tue 05/28 1:06 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Partial by TAWA SERVICES, INC., TAWA SUPERMARKETS, INC., TAWA, INC.. Response to Motion due by 6/18/2024 (FITZGERALD, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing Thu 05/16 1:10 PM
NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 6/24/2024 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (kg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/15 4:27 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by TAWA SERVICES, INC., TAWA SUPERMARKETS, INC., TAWA, INC.. (FITZGERALD, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 04/22 7:29 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for All Defendants. Answer due by 5/24/2024. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 4/22/2024. (jsb)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 20, 2024
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Sat 04/20 2:16 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Tawa Group Holdings, Inc for TAWA, INC... (FITZGERALD, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Sat 04/20 2:14 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Tawa Group Holdings, Inc for TAWA SUPERMARKETS, INC... (FITZGERALD, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Sat 04/20 2:12 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Tawa Group Holdings, Inc for TAWA SERVICES, INC... (FITZGERALD, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
9 9 2 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 04/19 3:43 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by TAWA SERVICES, INC., TAWA SUPERMARKETS, INC., TAWA, INC.. (FITZGERALD, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 04/19 3:39 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ANDREW L. FITZGERALD on behalf of Defendants TAWA SERVICES, INC., TAWA SUPERMARKETS, INC., TAWA, INC. (FITZGERALD, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Tue 04/16 2:42 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to TAWA SERVICES, INC. served on 4/3/2024, answer due 4/24/2024; TAWA SUPERMARKETS, INC. served on 4/3/2024, answer due 4/24/2024; TAWA, INC. served on 4/5/2024, answer due 4/26/2024.(BRUTON, HAMPTON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service - Tawa, Inc.,
Att: 2 Proof of Service - Tawa Services, Inc.,
Att: 3 Proof of Service - Tawa Supermarkets, Inc.
Thursday, April 04, 2024
6 6 service Summons Reissued Thu 04/04 9:49 AM
Summons Reissued as to TAWA, INC.. (cc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 04/01 11:50 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants.. (cc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons issued to Tawa Services, INC,
Att: 2 Summons Issued to Tawa Supermarkets, INC
utility Case Assigned Mon 04/01 9:51 AM
Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (cc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Mediation Mon 04/01 9:52 AM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (cc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Standing Order 30 Mon 04/01 11:45 AM
CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (cc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/29 1:10 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Toshiba Global Commerce Solutions Holdings Corporation, a Japanese entity for TOSHIBA GLOBAL COMMERCE SOLUTIONS, INC... (BRUTON, HAMPTON)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 03/29 1:05 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney CLARA NIEMAN on behalf of Plaintiff TOSHIBA GLOBAL COMMERCE SOLUTIONS, INC. (NIEMAN, CLARA)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 03/29 1:03 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney EDWARD F. HENNESSEY, IV on behalf of Plaintiff TOSHIBA GLOBAL COMMERCE SOLUTIONS, INC. (HENNESSEY, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
1 1 39 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/29 12:56 PM
COMPLAINT against TAWA SERVICES, INC., TAWA SUPERMARKETS, INC., TAWA, INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCMDC-3799931.), filed by TOSHIBA GLOBAL COMMERCE SOLUTIONS, INC..(BRUTON, HAMPTON)
Related: [-]