Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Sarah Daggett Morrison
Referred: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Case #: 2:24-cv-01467
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Mar 29, 2024
Terminated:Jul 11, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Sep 26, 2024 6:25 AM EDT
Defendant
Dollar General Corporation
Represented By
Karen Adinolfi
Roetzel & Andress Co. Lpa
contact info
Plaintiff
Toshiba Sullivan
2923 Azelda Street
Columbus, OH 43224


Docket last updated: 42 minutes ago
Thursday, July 11, 2024
18 18 order Judgment Thu 07/11 12:44 PM
JUDGMENT per order signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 7/11/2024. (merc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 07/11 12:35 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. This case is Dismissed Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 7/11/2024. (merc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
16 16 respm Response to Motion Mon 07/08 4:15 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff Toshiba Sullivan (kk2)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 06/05 4:31 PM
ORDER granting in part ECF12 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to the pending Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall have until 6/19/2024 to respond to the Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff is ADVISED that witness statements, photos, and documents are NOT necessary or permissive in responding to the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 6/5/2024. (vb) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 06/05 4:36 PM
Set Deadline: Plaintiff's responses due by 6/19/2024. (vb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 06/04 12:13 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 7/3/2024. filed by Defendant Dollar General Corporation. (Adinolfi, Karen)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
13 13 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 06/03 3:53 PM
MOTION to Receive Service by Email through the Electronic Case Filing System by Plaintiff Toshiba Sullivan (kk2)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
12 12 motion Extension of Time Mon 06/03 3:51 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Toshiba Sullivan (kk2)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 05/22 4:49 PM
ORDER Denying10 Motion for Electronic Filing. To date, Plaintiff still has neither responded to the Motion to Dismiss ECF5 nor moved for an extension of time to do so. Accordingly, Plaintiff is AGAIN DIRECTED to either respond to the Motion to Dismiss or seek an extension of time to do so by no later than 6/6/2024. Plaintiff is CAUTIONED that failure to timely comply with this Order may result in Plaintiff's claims being dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 5/22/2024. (vb) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 05/22 4:52 PM
Set Deadline: Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss due by 6/6/2024. (vb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
10 10 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 05/20 2:53 PM
MOTION for Electronic Filing by Plaintiff Toshiba Sullivan (kk2)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, April 29, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order Mon 04/29 4:58 PM
ORDER: re5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff had 21 days after the date of service to respond to the Motion to Dismiss. To date, Plaintiff has neither responded to the Motion to Dismiss nor moved for an extension of time to do so. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to either respond to the Motion to Dismiss or seek an extension of time to do so by no later than 5/6/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/29/2024. (vb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order Mon 04/29 1:01 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Joinder of Parties and Motions to Amend due by 6/2/2024. Initial Disclosures due by 5/16/2024. Discovery due by 11/2/2024. If the parties are unable to reach an agreement on any matter related to discovery, they are directed to arrange a conference with the Court. Clawback Agreement Deadline due by 6/15/2024. Dispositive motions due by 12/2/2024. Primary Expert due by 9/1/2024. Rebuttal Expert due by 10/1/2024. Settlement Demand due by 6/1/2024. Response to Settlement Demand due by 7/1/2024. Mediation Deadline: 9/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 4/29/2024. (mas)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
notice Notice Terminating Deadlines/Hearings Fri 04/26 11:12 AM
NOTICE : The Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/2/2024 10:00 AM is VACATED. (See ECF No.7 .) (sln)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
7 7 misc Rule 26(f) Report Thu 04/25 10:15 AM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant Dollar General Corporation. (Adinolfi, Karen)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 04/01 1:52 PM
NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/2/2024 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 04/01 1:47 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Dollar General Corporation. (Adinolfi, Karen)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/01 1:02 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Dollar General Corporation Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet (Adinolfi, Karen)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Complaint Mon 04/01 11:58 AM
ORIGINAL COMPLAINT filed in Franklin County Ohio, Court of Common Pleas against Dollar General Corporation, filed by Toshiba Sullivan. (jlk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/29 11:55 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Dollar General Corporation. (Adinolfi, Karen)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 03/29 11:53 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Common Pleas Court, case number 24CV 02-1602 ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9894542), filed by Dollar General Corporation. (Adinolfi, Karen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Removal to State Court,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet