COMPLETE COMMERCIAL INNOVATIONS
Nevada Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Hilary L Barnes |
Case #: | 3:24-bk-50308 |
Case Filed: | Mar 29, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | May 06, 2024 |
Claims Deadline: | Jun 07, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $500,001 to $1 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
COMPLETE COMMERCIAL INNOVATIONS
5688 Conte Dr
Carson City, NV 89701-6747 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
CHAPTER 11 - RN
300 BOOTH STREET, STE 3009
RENO, NV 89509 |
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE - RN - 11
300 BOOTH STREET, STE 3009
RENO, NV 89509 |
Docket last updated: 3 minutes ago |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing
Fri 04/12 4:20 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by STEPHEN R HARRIS on behalf of COMPLETE COMMERCIAL INNOVATIONS (HARRIS, STEPHEN) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Declaration under Penalty of Perjury (Non-Individual Debtor)
Fri 04/12 4:18 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury on Behalf of a Corporation or Partnership , Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor , List of Equity Security Holders, Non-Individual Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Schedule[s] A/B, Real Property Amount: $ 0, Personal Property Amount: $ 303158.78, D, Creditors Holding Secured Claims Amount: $ 0, E/F, Creditors Holding Unsecured Priority Claims Amount: $ 0, Creditors Holding Unsecured Nonpriority claims Amount: $ 902753.09, G, H, Declaration Concerning Debtor[s] Schedules, , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual , Resolution of Board of Directors, Verification of Creditor Matrix Filed by STEPHEN R HARRIS on behalf of COMPLETE COMMERCIAL INNOVATIONS (HARRIS, STEPHEN) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
utility
Add Trustee
Thu 04/04 10:58 AM
BRIAN D. SHAPIRO added to case, Terminated Trustee CHAPTER 11 - RN (mmm) |
||
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Wed 04/03 9:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 04/03/2024. (Admin.) |
|
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Wed 04/03 9:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/03/2024. (Admin.) |
|
9 | 9
2
pgs
trustee
Appointment of Trustee
Wed 04/03 7:34 AM
Appointment of Trustee Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee and Verified Statement . (DIDION, TERRI) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Notice of Appearance (BK)
Tue 04/02 12:38 PM
Notice of Appearance AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE Filed by U.S. TRUSTEE - RN - 11 (DAY, JARED) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Set Hearing (BK)
Mon 04/01 11:58 AM
Order to Set Hearing. Status Hearing to be held on 6/12/2024 at 02:30 PM at HLB Zoom Teleconference Line. Pre-Status Report Due By 5/29/2024. (dcl) |
|
6 | 6
court
Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing-Ch 11 Non-Individual (BNC)
Mon 04/01 11:55 AM
Notice of Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing. (dcl) |
|
5 | 5
utility
Set Deficient Filing Deadlines-11
Mon 04/01 11:52 AM
Set Deficient Filing Deadlines. Incomplete Filings due by 4/15/2024. Verification of Creditor Matrix due by 4/15/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due by 4/15/2024. Schedule A/B due by 4/15/2024. Schedule D due by 4/15/2024.Schedule E/F due by 4/15/2024. Schedule G due by 4/15/2024. Schedule H due by 4/15/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury due by 4/15/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due by 4/15/2024. Atty Disclosure Statement due by 4/15/2024. Declaration Re: E-Filing due by 4/15/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due by 4/15/2024. (dcl) |
|
Sunday, March 31, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
Sun 03/31 9:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 03/31/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Non-Individual (BNC-auto assignment)
Fri 03/29 11:34 AM
|
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-docket of online payment
Fri 03/29 11:33 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-50308 ) [misc,volp11pb] (1738.00). Receipt number A21685596, fee amount $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
8
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition - Chapter 11
Fri 03/29 11:32 AM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738. Filed by STEPHEN R HARRIS on behalf of COMPLETE COMMERCIAL INNOVATIONS Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 06/27/2024. (HARRIS, STEPHEN) |