Dale Jones v. Goodleap, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen V Wilson |
Referred: | Alka Sagar |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-02574 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1601 Truth in Lending |
Case Filed: | Mar 29, 2024 |
Terminated: | Sep 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 26, 2024 2:58 AM PDT |
Defendant
California Efficiency Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Goodleap, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hartman Home Transformations LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dale Jones
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, September 23, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
![]() ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND TOLLING STATUE OF LIMITATIONS by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Based on the parties' stipulation, IT IS SO ORDERED. The matter is dismissed without prejudice. All other existing dates and deadlines in this matter are herby vacated. Each party shall bear their own costs, expenses, and fees. RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Case34 . (Case Terminated. Made JS-6.) (aco) |
|
Monday, September 16, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
![]() Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rule 41(A)(1)(A)(ii) without prejudice filed by Plaintiff Dale Jones.(Prescott, Pamela) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
minutes
Status Conference - optional html form
Wed 09/11 3:08 PM
MINUTES OF Further Status Conference held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The parties are granted one week to advise the Court if the case has settled. If no settlement has been reached, the matter will be set for trial. Attorney for Plaintiff(s): Kyle Norman Gurwell. Attorney for Defendant(s): Justin Jones Rodriguez, Jeffrey B. Bell, Charlas G. Bakaly, IV. Courtroom Deputy: Paul M. Cruz. Time in Court: 20 mins. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (pc) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
minutes
Status Conference - optional html form ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 08/29 12:16 PM
MINUTES OF New Case Status Conference held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Court bifurcates the truth and lending claim. The matter is submitted. A Further Status Conference is set for 9/9/2024 at 3:00 PM. Attorney for Plaintiff(s): Kyle N. Gurwell. Attorney for Defendant(s): Justin J. Rodriguez, Jeffrey Bell, Charles Bakaly, IV. Courtroom Deputy: Paul M. Cruz. Time in Court: 45 mins. Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger. (pc) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
![]() ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court has reviewed the parties' Stipulation to Continue Initial Status Conference scheduled, and finds that good cause for the requested continuance exists. The Court approves the Stipulation and continues the initial status conference from August 12, 2024 to August 26, 2024, at 3:00 p.m. RE: STIPULATION to Continue Initial Status Conference30 . (aco) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
![]() STIPULATION to Continue Initial Status Conference from 8/12/2024 to 8/26/2024 filed by Defendant Goodleap, LLC.(Rodriguez, Justin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
![]() PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar: granting28 Joint MOTION for Protective Order. (see document for details) (hr) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
![]() NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION for Protective Order Dale Jones. (Prescott, Pamela) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 08/01 10:19 AM
TEXT ONLY SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court GRANTS the Request25 in part. The Status Conference is continued to 8/12/2024 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dd) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
![]() NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance25 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
![]() NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeffrey B Bell on behalf of Defendants California Efficiency Group, Inc., Hartman Home Transformations LLC (Bell, Jeffrey) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
![]() NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants California Efficiency Group, Inc., Hartman Home Transformations LLC, identifying Dale Jones, Plaintiff; Goodleap, LLC, Defendant; California Efficiency Group, Inc., Defendant; Hartman Home Transformations LLC, Defendant. (Bell, Jeffrey) |
|
23 | 23
![]() ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants California Efficiency Group, Inc., Hartman Home Transformations LLC.(Attorney Jeffrey B Bell added to party California Efficiency Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey B Bell added to party Hartman Home Transformations LLC(pty:dft))(Bell, Jeffrey) |
|
Monday, June 10, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
![]() ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 8/5/2024 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) |
|
21 | 21
![]() Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Goodleap, LLC, identifying Paramount GR Holdings, LLC; Paramount Owner Holding Company, Inc.; BMK Holdings LLC. (Rodriguez, Justin) |
|
20 | 20
![]() NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco) |
|
Friday, June 07, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND and expressly reserving right to arbitrate filed by Defendant Goodleap, LLC.(Rodriguez, Justin) |
|
Monday, June 03, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 07/01/2024 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Goodleap, LLC.(Rodriguez, Justin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, May 31, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Dale Jones. upon California Efficiency Group, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/1/2024, answer due 7/1/2024. Waiver of Service signed by Jeffrey B. Bell, Esq.. (Prescott, Pamela) |
|
16 | 16
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Dale Jones. upon Hartman Home Transformations LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/1/2024, answer due 7/1/2024. Waiver of Service signed by Jeffrey B. Bell, Esq.. (Prescott, Pamela) |
|
Tuesday, May 14, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) |
|
Thursday, May 09, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),11 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number incomplete; incorrect initials of Judge. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) |
|
Wednesday, May 08, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Goodleap, LLC answer now due 6/7/2024, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Goodleap, LLC.(Rodriguez, Justin) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Justin Jones Rodriguez counsel for Defendant Goodleap, LLC. Adding Justin Jones Rodriguez as counsel of record for GoodLeap, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant GoodLeap, LLC. (Attorney Justin Jones Rodriguez added to party Goodleap, LLC(pty:dft))(Rodriguez, Justin) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John W. McGuinness counsel for Defendant Goodleap, LLC. Adding John W. McGuinness as counsel of record for GoodLeap, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant GoodLeap, LLC. (Attorney John W. McGuinness added to party Goodleap, LLC(pty:dft))(McGuinness, John) |
|
Monday, May 06, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:24-cv-02574 SVW(ASx). (rn) |
|
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Prescott, Pamela) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (es) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dale Jones, upon Defendant Goodleap, LLC served on 4/18/2024, answer due 5/9/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Goodleap, LLC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Prescott, Pamela) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants California Efficiency Group, Inc., Goodleap, LLC, Hartman Home Transformations LLC. (ghap) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (ghap) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Dale Jones, (McGlothlin, David) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Dale Jones.(McGlothlin, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dale Jones. (McGlothlin, David) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37191497 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Dale Jones. (Attorney David J McGlothlin added to party Dale Jones(pty:pla))(McGlothlin, David) |