New York Southern District Court
Judge:Vernon S Broderick
Case #: 1:24-cv-02401
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Mar 29, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Sep 26, 2024 6:13 AM EDT
Defendant
William M. Pinzler
Represented By
William M Pinzler
William M Pinzler
contact info
Plaintiff
SilentSeas S.A.
Represented By
Stephen Wagner
Cohen Tauber Spievack & Wagner, P.C.,
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, December 16, 2024
19 19 3 pgs respm Affirmation in Opposition to Motion Mon 12/16 6:01 PM
AFFIRMATION of William M Pinzler in Opposition re:14 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by William M. Pinzler..(Pinzler, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
18 18 8 pgs respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 11/25 6:32 PM
DECLARATION of Stephen Wagner in Support re:14 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by SilentSeas S.A...(Wagner, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 9 pgs Exhibit 1 - complaint,
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit 2 - answer and pro se notice,
Att: 3 23 pgs Exhibit 3 - existing letter of intent,
Att: 4 22 pgs Exhibit 4 - LOI,
Att: 5 8 pgs Exhibit 5 - escrow agreement,
Att: 6 12 pgs Exhibit 6 - bank statements,
Att: 7 3 pgs Exhibit 7 - Dec. 18, 2023 email and letter of directions,
Att: 8 4 pgs Exhibit 8 - 12/28/2023 email correspondence between Mamakos and Pinzler,
Att: 9 8 pgs Exhibit 9 - 1/3/24 email,
Att: 10 7 pgs Exhibit 10 - Akin emails,
Att: 11 13 pgs Exhibit 11 - Emails between Feb. 14 an Feb 21,
Att: 12 15 pgs Exhibit 12 - 2/29/24 emails,
Att: 13 13 pgs Exhibit 13 - March 3 March 7 emails,
Att: 14 19 pgs Exhibit 14 - 3/8/24 email,
Att: 15 4 pgs Exhibit 15 - 5/13/24 joint letter to court,
Att: 16 12 pgs Exhibit 16 - 5/31/24 email enclosing discovery requests,
Att: 17 6 pgs Exhibit 17 - 8/9/24 emails,
Att: 18 3 pgs Exhibit 18 - 5/31/24-8/9/24 emails,
Att: 19 9 pgs Exhibit 19 - 9/17/24 emails,
Att: 20 15 pgs Exhibit 20 - 9/18/24 emails,
Att: 21 3 pgs Exhibit 21 - 11/12/24 status letter,
Att: 22 3 pgs Exhibit 22 - 11/13/24 court order
17 17 7 pgs respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 11/25 6:22 PM
DECLARATION of Nicholas Mamakos in Support re:14 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by SilentSeas S.A...(Wagner, Stephen)
Related: [-]
16 16 9 pgs misc Rule 56.1 Statement Mon 11/25 6:20 PM
RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by SilentSeas S.A...(Wagner, Stephen)
Related: [-]
15 15 20 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 11/25 6:16 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:14 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by SilentSeas S.A...(Wagner, Stephen)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs motion Summary Judgment Mon 11/25 6:14 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by SilentSeas S.A...(Wagner, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 11/13 2:35 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:12 Letter, filed by SilentSeas S.A. ENDORSEMENT: Any motions for summary judgment are due by November 25, 2024. Oppositions are due December 16, 2024. No reply briefs may be filed. The post-discovery conference currently scheduled for December 13, 2024 is ADJOURNED sine die. ( Motions due by 11/25/2024., Responses due by 12/16/2024) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 11/13/2024) (sgz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
12 12 2 pgs misc Letter Tue 11/12 11:53 AM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Stephen Wagner dated November 12, 2024 re: joint status letter as set forth in Paragraph 11 of the Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order that was So Ordered on May 14, 2024. Document filed by SilentSeas S.A...(Wagner, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
11 11 3 pgs order Scheduling Order Tue 05/14 3:47 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). This is not to be tried to a jury. Deposition due by8/9/2024. Expert Deposition due by 11/15/2024. Fact Discovery due by 8/21/2024. Expert Discovery due by 11/15/2024. Discovery due by 11/29/2024. Telephone Conference set for 12/13/2024 at 02:00 PM before Judge Vernon S. Broderick. The dial-in number is 888-363-4749 and the conference code is 2682448. The parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 2 days. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/14/2024) (ks) Modified on 5/14/2024 (ks)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
10 10 3 pgs misc Letter Mon 05/13 9:47 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Stephen Wagner dated May 13, 2024 re: parties' joint letter pursuant to this court's order and notice of initial conference. Document filed by SilentSeas S.A...(Wagner, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order (Proposed)
Monday, April 29, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Mon 04/29 2:34 PM
ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that the Court will not be holding an initial pretrial conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by May 13, 2024, the parties submit a joint letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs: and further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 4/29/2024) (rro)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
8 8 2 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/26 4:42 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,. Document filed by William M. Pinzler..(Pinzler, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 04/10 4:34 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. William M. Pinzler served on 4/3/2024, answer due 4/24/2024. Service was accepted by William M. Pinzler. Document filed by SilentSeas S.A...(Wagner, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Mon 04/01 3:15 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. William M. Pinzler served on 4/1/2024, answer due 4/22/2024. Service was made by E-mail. Document filed by SilentSeas S.A...(Wagner, Stephen)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs service Summons Issued Mon 04/01 2:08 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to William M. Pinzler..(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 04/01 10:49 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 04/01 10:50 AM
Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 04/01 10:50 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Mon 04/01 10:51 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Stephen Wagner. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: William M. Pinzler. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 04/01 10:51 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Stephen Wagner. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $899,576,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $900,000;. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
4 4 2 pgs misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/29 2:37 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by SilentSeas S.A...(Wagner, Stephen)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/29 2:36 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wagner, Stephen)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 03/29 2:35 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to William M. Pinzler, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by SilentSeas S.A...(Wagner, Stephen)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/29 2:31 PM
COMPLAINT against William M. Pinzler. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29151296)Document filed by SilentSeas S.A...(Wagner, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Exhibit 1 - LOI,
Att: 2 8 pgs Exhibit 2 - loan agreement,
Att: 3 8 pgs Exhibit 3 - escrow agreement,
Att: 4 2 pgs Exhibit 4 - transfer,
Att: 5 3 pgs Exhibit 5 - 12/18/23 email,
Att: 6 3 pgs Exhibit 6 - 12/18/23 email,
Att: 7 4 pgs Exhibit 7 - 12/28/23 email,
Att: 8 6 pgs Exhibit 8 - 1/3/24 email