Winter Garden Health and Wellness LLC
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Tiffany P Geyer |
Case #: | 6:24-bk-01581 |
Case Filed: | Mar 29, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $500,001 to $1 million |
Nature of Business | Health Care Business |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Winter Garden Health and Wellness LLC
15122 Heron Hideaway Cir
Winter Garden, FL 34787-1707 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - ORL
Office of the United States Trustee George C Young Federal Building 400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100
Orlando, FL 32801 |
Docket last updated: 8 minutes ago |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
41 | 41
motion
Motion to Determine Secured Status/Value (and Strip Lien if applicable)
Mon 04/29 2:48 PM
|
|
40 | 40
motion
Motion to Determine Secured Status/Value (and Strip Lien if applicable)
Mon 04/29 2:46 PM
|
|
39 | 39
motion
Motion to Determine Secured Status/Value (and Strip Lien if applicable)
Mon 04/29 2:44 PM
|
|
38 | 38
misc
Small Business Monthly Operating Report
Mon 04/29 1:30 PM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period March 29, 2024 to March 31 2024 Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Winter Garden Health and Wellness LLC. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Application to Employ/Retain
Wed 04/24 4:50 PM
|
|
36 | 36
misc
Statement/Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney
Wed 04/24 4:42 PM
Statement/Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Winter Garden Health and Wellness LLC. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Cash Flow Statement
Tue 04/23 7:30 AM
Cash Flow Statement for Small Business "Corrected" Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Winter Garden Health and Wellness LLC. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) |
|
Sunday, April 21, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order
Mon 04/22 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order . Notice Date 04/21/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
answer
Objection
Fri 04/19 4:21 PM
Objection to Filed by Jay Thornton on behalf of Creditor Wells Fargo Practice Finance, a division of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. . (Thornton, Jay) |
|
32 | 32
misc
Proof of Service (BK)
Fri 04/19 2:03 PM
Proof of Service of Preliminary Order Granting Motion By Debtor -In-Possession For Authority To Use Cash Collateral And Emergency Hearing Requested Through May 15, 2024; A Further Preliminary Hearing On This Matter Will Be Held On May 15, 2024. Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Winter Garden Health and Wellness LLC . (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) |
|
31 | 31
misc
Proof of Service (BK)
Fri 04/19 1:57 PM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Debtors Motion For Authority To Pay Employees For Prepetition Wages And Certificate Of Necessity And Request For Emergency Hearing. Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Winter Garden Health and Wellness LLC . (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) |
|
30 | 30
order
Appear pro hac vice
Fri 04/19 1:23 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice of Scott D Cousins for Wells Fargo Practice Finance, a division of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Upon completion of the required registration form, a temporary login and password will be issued. Filing privileges are limited to this case and any related adversary proceedings. The attorney is directed to file a statement notifying the Clerk when Attorneys involvement in this case is concluded . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Ryan S.) |
|
29 | 29
misc
Proof of Service (BK)
Fri 04/19 11:18 AM
Proof of Service of Preliminary Order Granting Debtors Motion For Authority To Pay Affiliate Officer And Insider Salaries And Request For Emergency Hearing Through May 15, 2024, a Further Hearing On This Matter Will Be Held On May 15, 2024. Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Winter Garden Health and Wellness LLC . (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) |
|
court
Corrective Entry - Corrective Action Required (SB)
Fri 04/19 1:27 PM
ERROR NOTIFICATION to David Haft. The event you selected does not match the Pdf image you filed. NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN BY THE COURT ON THIS FILING, . (Ryan S.) |
||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
court
ADI - Proof of Service Reminder - 3-day
Thu 04/18 12:16 AM
A properly docketed and related Proof or Certificate of Service for Order23 is not indicated on the docket. Jeffrey Ainsworth is reminded to serve the order and to file a properly docketed and related Proof of Service indicating service or contact the Court if this reminder entry appears to be entered in error. Failure to do so may result in further action. (ADIclerk) |
||
court
ADI - Proof of Service Reminder - 3-day
Thu 04/18 12:17 AM
A properly docketed and related Proof or Certificate of Service for Order24 is not indicated on the docket. Jeffrey Ainsworth is reminded to serve the order and to file a properly docketed and related Proof of Service indicating service or contact the Court if this reminder entry appears to be entered in error. Failure to do so may result in further action. (ADIclerk) |
||
court
ADI - Proof of Service Reminder - 3-day
Thu 04/18 12:17 AM
A properly docketed and related Proof or Certificate of Service for Order25 is not indicated on the docket. Jeffrey Ainsworth is reminded to serve the order and to file a properly docketed and related Proof of Service indicating service or contact the Court if this reminder entry appears to be entered in error. Failure to do so may result in further action. (ADIclerk) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Motion to Prohibit Use of Cash Collateral
Tue 04/16 1:48 PM
|
|
27 | 27
motion
Motion to Appear pro hac vice (BK)
Tue 04/16 12:40 PM
|
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 04/12 2:33 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by David H Haft on behalf of Interested Party Wells Fargo Practice Finance, a division of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Haft, David) |
|
25 | 25
4
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Fri 04/12 2:07 PM
Preliminary Order Granting Motion by Debtor-In-Possession for Authority to Use Cash Collateral and Emergency Hearing Requested through May 15, 2024; A Further Preliminary Hearing on this Matter will be held on May 15, 2024 . Hearing scheduled for 5/15/2024 at 10:00 AM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street . Service Instructions: Jeffrey Ainsworth is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Nadia) Modified on 4/12/2024 (Nadia) |
|
24 | 24
order
Authority to Pay Pre-Petition Wages
Fri 04/12 12:49 PM
Order Granting Motion For Authority to Pay Pre-Petition Wages on a Final Basis . Service Instructions: Jeffrey Ainsworth is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Nadia) |
|
23 | 23
2
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Fri 04/12 9:27 AM
Preliminary Order Granting Debtor's Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer and Insider Salaries and Request for Emergency Hearing through May 15, 2024. A Further Hearing on this matter will be held on May 15, 2024 . Hearing scheduled for 5/15/2024 at 10:00 AM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street . Service Instructions: Jeffrey Ainsworth is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Nadia) Modified on 4/12/2024 (Nadia) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Chapter 11 Case Management Summary
Tue 04/09 1:44 PM
Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Winter Garden Health and Wellness LLC. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Sat 04/06 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. . Notice Date 04/05/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order
Fri 04/05 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order . Notice Date 04/04/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
court
CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held
Wed 04/03 5:32 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: APPEARANCES : Jeffrey Ainsworth: Debtor Attorney; Dr. Melodie Mope: Debtor Principal; L. Todd Budgen: Trustee; Scott Bomkamp: US Trustee; RULING: Preliminary Hearing: 1) Debtor's Motion to Use Cash Collateral (Doc #9) -Granted on Interim Basis through continued hearing on May 15, 2024, at 10:00AM; Order by Ainsworth; 2) Debtor's Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries (Doc #10) - Granted on Interim Basis through continued hearing on May 15, 2024, at 10:00AM; Order by Ainsworth; 3) Debtor's Motion for Authority to Pay Pre-Petition Wages (Doc #11) - Granted on Final Basis; Order by Ainsworth; 4) Debtor's Motion to Dispense with Requirement to Appoint an Ombudsman (Doc #12) -Granted; Order by Ainsworth; **Note: the Initial Status Conference currently set for April 23, 2024, at 1:45PM is rescheduled for May 15, 2024, at 10:00AM (AOCNFNG); (dh). Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill) |
|
18 | 18
court
341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 11 Corp w/Claim Deadline
Wed 04/03 10:24 AM
Notice of Bankruptcy Case . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/6/2024 at 10:00 AM. U.S. Trustee (Orl) will hold the meeting telephonically. Call in Number: 877-801-2055. Passcode: 8940738#. Proofs of Claims due by 6/7/2024. (Juan) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
trustee
Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee
Tue 04/02 3:53 PM
Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11, Subchapter V Trustee . L. Todd Budgen added to the case. Meeting of Creditors scheduled for May 6, 2024 at 10 a.m. in Room N/A. The meeting will be conducted by telephone.. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. (Bomkamp, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit A: Statement of L. Todd Budgen | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Hearing (BK)
Tue 04/02 3:49 PM
Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Motion to Use Cash Collateral; Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries; Motion for Authority to Pay Pre-Petition Wages; & Motion to Dispense with Requirement to Appoint an Ombudsman Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Winter Garden Health and Wellness LLC . Hearing scheduled for 4/3/2024 at 02:30 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street . (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) |
|
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order Prescribing Procedures - Ch. 11 SubV Case, Setting Deadline for Filing Plan, Set Status Conf
Tue 04/02 1:41 PM
Order Prescribing Procedures in Chapter 11 Subchapter V Case, Setting Deadline for Filing Plan, and Setting Status Conference . Hearing scheduled for 4/23/2024 at 01:45 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Juan) |
|
court
Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only
Tue 04/02 8:59 AM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 04/03/2024 02:30 PM Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Re: Motion to Use Cash Collateral Doc9 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions : The Court directs Jeffrey Ainsworth to prepare, file, and serve a notice of hearing that includes the information on the Notice of Hearing Sample Form available at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/proguide/documents/Samples/Notice_of_Hearing_Bankruptcy_Sample_Form.pdf?id=1 Counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, then counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing immediately upon receipt of this directive. If the notice of hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. If notice of the hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. . (Bill) |
||
court
Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only
Tue 04/02 9:00 AM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 04/03/2024 02:30 PM Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Re: Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries Doc10 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions : The Court directs Jeffrey Ainsworth to prepare, file, and serve a notice of hearing that includes the information on the Notice of Hearing Sample Form available at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/proguide/documents/Samples/Notice_of_Hearing_Bankruptcy_Sample_Form.pdf?id=1 Counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, then counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing immediately upon receipt of this directive. If the notice of hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. If notice of the hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. . (Bill) |
||
court
Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only
Tue 04/02 9:00 AM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 04/03/2024 02:30 PM Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Re: Motion for Authority to Pay Pre-Petition Wages Doc11 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions : The Court directs Jeffrey Ainsworth to prepare, file, and serve a notice of hearing that includes the information on the Notice of Hearing Sample Form available at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/proguide/documents/Samples/Notice_of_Hearing_Bankruptcy_Sample_Form.pdf?id=1 Counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, then counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing immediately upon receipt of this directive. If the notice of hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. If notice of the hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. . (Bill) |
||
court
Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only
Tue 04/02 9:04 AM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 04/03/2024 02:30 PM Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Re: Motion to Dispense with Requirement to Appoint an Ombudsman Doc12 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions : The Court directs Jeffrey Ainsworth to prepare, file, and serve a notice of hearing that includes the information on the Notice of Hearing Sample Form available at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/proguide/documents/Samples/Notice_of_Hearing_Bankruptcy_Sample_Form.pdf?id=1 Counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, then counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing immediately upon receipt of this directive. If the notice of hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. If notice of the hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. . (Bill) |
||
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Certificate Of Service (BK)
Mon 04/01 5:47 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Motion to Use Cash Collateral; Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer and Insider Salaries and Request for Emergency Hearing; Motion for Authority Pay Pre-Petition Wages and Motion to Dispense with Requirement to Appoint and Ombudsman. Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Winter Garden Health and Wellness LLC . (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Certificate Of Service (BK)
Mon 04/01 5:41 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer and Insider Salaries and Request for Emergency Hearing (Doc. No. 10); Motion for Authority Pay Pre-Petition Wages (Doc. No. 11) and Motion to Dispense with Requirement to Appoint and Ombudsman (Doc. No. 12) Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Winter Garden Health and Wellness LLC . (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Z - Generic Motion (use only when there is no specific motion event) (BK)
Mon 04/01 5:32 PM
|
|
11 | 11
motion
Motion for Authority to Pay Pre-Petition Wages
Mon 04/01 5:28 PM
|
|
10 | 10
motion
Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries
Mon 04/01 5:25 PM
|
|
9 | 9
motion
Motion to Use Cash Collateral
Mon 04/01 5:24 PM
|
|
misc
Emergency Matters Submission Notification
Mon 04/01 5:50 PM
Emergency Matters Submission Notification Re: Motion to Use Cash Collateral;Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer and Insider Salaries and Request for Emergency Hearing; Motion for Authority Pay Pre-Petition Wages and Motion to Dispense with Requirement to Appoint and Ombudsman to be heard on or before April 4, 2024 Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Winter Garden Health and Wellness LLC . (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) |
||
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Chapter 11 Case Management Summary
Fri 03/29 4:10 PM
Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Winter Garden Health and Wellness LLC. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 03/29 3:55 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice as Additional Counsel Filed by Robert B Branson on behalf of Debtor Winter Garden Health and Wellness LLC. (Branson, Robert) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Balance Sheet
Fri 03/29 3:28 PM
Balance Sheet Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Winter Garden Health and Wellness LLC. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Cash Flow Statement
Fri 03/29 3:27 PM
Cash Flow Statement for Small Business Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Winter Garden Health and Wellness LLC. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Tax Documents
Fri 03/29 3:27 PM
Tax Documents for the Year 2023 Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Winter Garden Health and Wellness LLC. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Authorization to File Bankruptcy Petition
Fri 03/29 3:24 PM
Certificate of Authorization to File Bankruptcy Petition Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Winter Garden Health and Wellness LLC. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Statement of Corporate Ownership
Fri 03/29 3:14 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Winter Garden Health and Wellness LLC. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) |
|
1 | 1
30+
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Fri 03/29 3:13 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. SubchapterV. Health Care Business. (Verify Fee). Schedules and Summary of Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs Disclosure of Compensation, Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Winter Garden Health and Wellness LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 06/27/2024. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) |
|
crditcrd
Receipt of Filing Fee
Fri 03/29 3:16 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:6:24-bk-01581] ) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number A74960125, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
ADI - Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry)
Fri 03/29 9:00 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk) |