New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Frederic Block
Referred: Vera M Scanlon
Case #: 1:24-cv-02367
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:1201 Civil Rights (Disability)
Case Filed:Mar 29, 2024
Terminated:Sep 27, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Sep 26, 2024 6:05 AM EDT
Defendant
Technogym USA Corp.
Represented By
Mark Andrew Saloman
Fordharrison LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Derrick Anderson
Represented By
Mars Khaimov
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, September 27, 2024
13 13 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 09/27 12:42 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Derrick Anderson (Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
order Order Dismissing Case Fri 09/27 1:08 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER DISMISSING CASE: See entry13 . Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 9/27/2024. (MI)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Status Report Order Fri 09/13 4:29 PM
ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the parties' notice of settlement at ECF No.12 . The parties must file the necessary closing papers by 10/11/2024. All other deadlines and proceedings are adjourned sine die . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 9/13/2024. (JR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 09/04 2:14 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Derrick Anderson (Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
11 11 order Scheduling Order Tue 08/27 11:35 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 10/1/2024 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon via ZoomGov. To gain access to the ZoomGov audio conferencing system, the parties are to dial 1-646-828-7666; enter meeting ID 16121901090 and press the pound key; when asked for a participant ID, press the pound key; and enter passcode 091622 and press the pound key. The parties must complete the attached Joint Proposed Case Management Plan (CMP) and file it on ECF no later than 9/17/2024. In the event that any Defendant(s) has not answered or otherwise appeared, Plaintiff(s) must also mail a copy of this Order, its attachment and the full docket to the last known mailing address(es) for such Defendant(s) and file proof on ECF by the CMP filing date. The Court reminds the parties of their responsibility to file a disclosure statement under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, if applicable, within 30 days of appearing in this action. As to any LLC, the disclosure statement should identify all of the members and their respective citizenship. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 8/27/2024. (SH)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 24, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Sat 08/24 5:09 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, Technogym USA Corp. On consent, the answer is due 9/9/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 8/24/2024. (Scanlon, Vera)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 08/06 3:54 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Technogym USA Corp.. (Saloman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 07/15 3:14 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant is to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 8/8/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/15/2024. (JR)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 07/08 9:13 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Technogym USA Corp.. (Saloman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 06/04 12:24 PM
ORDER granting consent8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant is to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 7/8/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/4/2024. (JR)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 06/03 1:59 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by by Technogym USA Corp.. (Saloman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 05/08 3:05 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant is to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 6/6/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 5/8/2024. (JR)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 05/03 10:19 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Technogym USA Corp.. (Saloman, Mark)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/03 10:16 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Andrew Saloman on behalf of Technogym USA Corp. (aty to be noticed) (Saloman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 04/19 2:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Derrick Anderson. Technogym USA Corp. served on 4/16/2024, answer due 5/7/2024. (Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 04/01 9:15 AM
Summons Issued as to Technogym USA Corp.. (CV)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 04/01 9:14 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (CV)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 04/01 9:13 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (CV)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/29 3:36 PM
COMPLAINT Derrick Anderson against Technogym USA Corp. filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17723010 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Derrick Anderson. (Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 2 pgs Proposed Summons