New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Orelia E Merchant
Case #: 1:24-cv-02369
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Mar 29, 2024
Terminated:Sep 03, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Sep 26, 2024 6:05 AM EDT
Defendant
U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By
Kimberly Francis
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By
Kimberly Francis
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
Jaswinder Sachdeva
Represented By
Dalbir Singh
Dalbir Singh And Associates PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Satpal Sachdeva
Represented By
Dalbir Singh
Dalbir Singh And Associates PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 15 minutes ago
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 09/03 4:55 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (GM)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 08/30 12:44 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jaswinder Sachdeva, Satpal Sachdeva (Singh, Dalbir)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Immigration/Social Security Cases Tue 07/09 3:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Francis on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Francis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 06/11 11:13 AM
Summons Issued as to US Citizenship & Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (JVC)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 04/01 9:36 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (CV)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 04/01 9:32 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (CV)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/29 3:46 PM
COMPLAINT First against US Citizenship & Immigration Services, US Department of Homeland Security filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17723070 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Jaswinder Sachdeva, Satpal Sachdeva. (Singh, Dalbir)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons