New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Nina R Morrison
Referred: Vera M Scanlon
Case #: 1:24-cv-02374
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Case Filed:Mar 29, 2024
Terminated:May 24, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Sep 26, 2024 6:07 AM EDT
Defendant
M&D Capital Premier Billing LLC
Represented By
Brian Middlebrook
Gordon & Rees LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Candice Facon
Represented By
James Jackson Bilsborrow
Weitz & Luxenberg, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Benjamin Kashvili
Represented By
James Jackson Bilsborrow
Weitz & Luxenberg, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, May 24, 2024
order Order Dismissing Case Fri 05/24 1:51 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal is So Ordered.Ordered by Judge Nina R. Morrison on 5/24/2024. (AKC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 05/15 6:29 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Candice Facon, Benjamin Kashvili (Bilsborrow, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
7 7 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/24 4:16 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is scheduled for 7/25/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon via ZoomGov. To gain access to the ZoomGov audio conferencing system, the parties are to dial 1-646-828-7666; enter meeting ID 16121901090 and press the pound key; when asked for a participant ID, press the pound key; and enter passcode 091622 and press the pound key. The parties must complete the attached Joint Proposed Case Management Plan (CMP) and file it on ECF no later than 7/09/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 4/24/2024. (CC)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 04/24 3:48 PM
ORDER. Defendant's6 Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer is granted. On consent, Defendant must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 6/25/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 4/24/2024. (CC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 04/23 8:54 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by M&D Capital Premier Billing LLC. (Middlebrook, Brian)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/23 8:46 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Middlebrook on behalf of M&D Capital Premier Billing LLC (aty to be noticed) (Middlebrook, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
4 4 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 04/01 10:11 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDM)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 04/01 10:08 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (SDM)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 04/01 10:06 AM
Summons Issued as to M&D Capital Premier Billing LLC. (SDM)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
1 1 36 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/29 4:12 PM
COMPLAINT against M&D Capital Premier Billing LLC filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17723266 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Candice Facon, Benjamin Kashvili. (Bilsborrow, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B