North Carolina Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:George R Hodges
Case #: 3:24-bk-30289
Case Filed:Mar 29, 2024

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
District 9 Brewing Company, LLC
11138 Treynorth Dr Ste A
Cornelius, NC 28031-8186
Represented By
John C. Woodman
Essex Richards
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Bankruptcy Administrator Office
401 W. Trade Street Suite 2400
Charlotte, NC 28202


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 12:01 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
260 260 motion Compensation Fri 05/09 8:49 AM
Application for Compensation to: Essex Richards, P.A. as attorney for Debtor , Fee: $3,100.00 , Expenses: $2,584.87 . If a response or objection is filed - DUE: 5/23/2025, a hearing will be held on DATE: 6/5/2025, TIME: 9:30 AM, LOCATION: 2A filed by John C. Woodman on behalf of District 9 Brewing Company. (Woodman, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
259 259 audio Audio MP3 Fri 05/02 2:20 AM
Related: [-]