California Eastern District Court
Judge:Jennifer L Thurston
Referred: Erica P Grosjean
Case #: 1:24-cv-00371
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Mar 29, 2024
Terminated:Jan 10, 2025
Case in other court:Kings County Superior Court, 24CU0029
Last checked: Thursday Sep 26, 2024 2:56 AM PDT
Defendant
Leprino Foods Company
Represented By
Lisa M. Pooley
Hanson Bridgett LLP
contact info
Matthew B. Seipel
Hanson Bridgett LLP
contact info
Sandra L. Rappaport
Hanson Bridgett LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher Dominguez
Represented By
Kristen M. Agnew
Diversity Law Group, Apc
contact info
Larry W. Lee
Diversity Law Group
contact info
William Lucas Marder
Polaris Law Group, LLP
contact info

GPO Jul 02 2024
CLASS ACTION SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on July 2, 2024. The following deadlines are set with regard to the filing of class certification motions: Motion for Class Certification: May 30, 2025; Opposition: August 15, 2025; Reply: September 12, 2025. Status Conference set for 1/15/2025 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Motion Hearing for Class Certification set for 9/26/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Vue, Yee)
GPO Jan 10 2025
STIPULATION and ORDER for DISMISSAL of Action without Prejudice and DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to CLOSE the CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/10/2025. CASE CLOSED. (Deputy Clerk SSA)

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, January 10, 2025
11 11 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 01/10 3:06 PM
STIPULATION and ORDER for DISMISSAL of Action without Prejudice and DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to CLOSE the CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/10/2025. CASE CLOSED. (Deputy Clerk SSA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
10 10 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 01/08 1:59 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal by Christopher Dominguez. (Agnew, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
9 9 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Wed 12/18 2:17 PM
MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on December 18, 2024: To accommodate the Court's calendar, the Mid-Discovery Status Conference currently noticed for January 15, 2025 at 10:30 AM will now be held on January 27, 2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. The Court has switched to a different telephonic conference system and will no longer be using 1-888-251-2909 as the dial-in number. Instead, to connect to the conference via telephone, the parties shall (1 ) dial 1-669-254-5252 , (2) enter 161 733 0675 for the meeting ID followed by # , (3) enter # when asked for the participant ID, (4) enter 740484 for the meeting passcode followed by # , and (5) enter *6 to unmute. (Text Only Entry) (Navarro, F)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Related Case Fri 07/26 1:00 PM
NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 1:22-cv-01018-KES-EPG, 1:19-cv-00635-JLT-BAM by Leprino Foods Company. (Pooley, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Related Case,
Att: 2 Notice of Related Case
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Related Case Wed 07/10 4:33 PM
NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 1:22-cv-01018-KES-EPG, 22C-0317 by Christopher Dominguez. (Agnew, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
6 6 5 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Tue 07/02 2:04 PM
CLASS ACTION SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on July 2, 2024. The following deadlines are set with regard to the filing of class certification motions: Motion for Class Certification: May 30, 2025; Opposition: August 15, 2025; Reply: September 12, 2025. Status Conference set for 1/15/2025 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Motion Hearing for Class Certification set for 9/26/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Vue, Yee)
Related: [-]
5 5 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Tue 07/02 11:39 AM
MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held telephonically before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 7/2/2024 with an order to follow. Plaintiff agreed to file a notice of related cases under Local Rule 123 by 7/10/24. Plaintiffs Counsel Kristen Agnew telephonically present. Defendants Counsel Lisa Pooley telephonically present. (Vue, Yee)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
4 4 misc Scheduling Report Tue 06/25 2:25 PM
JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT filed by Christopher Dominguez. (Agnew, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
3 3 misc Civil New Case Documents for JLT Fri 03/29 3:30 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/2/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Marrujo, C)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order,
Att: 2 Consent Form,
Att: 3 VDRP
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/29 3:09 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Leprino Foods Company. (Seipel, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 03/29 3:07 PM
NOTICE of REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 24CU0029 by Leprino Foods Company. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11435487)(Seipel, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 Proof of Service