California Central District Court
Judge:Steve Kim
Case #: 2:24-cv-02594
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 29, 2024
Terminated:Jun 04, 2024
Case in other court:Los Angeles County Superior Court, 23STCV31772
Last checked: Thursday Sep 26, 2024 3:04 AM PDT
Defendant
Imperfect Foods, Inc.
Represented By
Janelle Jad Sahouria
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Garry Armstrong
Represented By
Angela Leong
Blanco And Arias Apc
contact info
Janeth Arias
Blanco And Arias Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
17 17 order Dismiss Case Tue 06/04 11:26 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL15 by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. Pursuant to the stipulation of Plaintiff GARRY ARMSTRONG ("Plaintiff") (ECF No. 15), this action is dismissed without prejudice as to all claims, causes of action, and parties. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated). (clee) (Main Document 17 replaced on 6/4/2024) (clee)
Related: [-]
16 16 2 pgs stip Order Tue 06/04 10:38 AM
STIPULATION for Order Grating Joint Stipulation to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Garry Armstrong.(Arias, Janeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
15 15 stip Dismiss Case Mon 06/03 3:23 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to 41(a)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Garry Armstrong.(Arias, Janeth)
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 06/03 1:37 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. For these reasons, the parties and their counsel are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing by no later than 3 pm PT on June 5, 2024, why they should not be sanctioned under Rule 16(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to obey the courts orders. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (clee)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
13 13 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/15 1:52 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. The matter is set for a scheduling conference on Wednesday, June 5, 2024 at 10:00 AM via Zoom videoconference. (see document for further details) (hr)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
12 12 notice Notice from Clerk re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program (CV-11) Final Consent to Proceed Fri 04/12 3:38 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, this case remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for final disposition. (et)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Non-Final Fri 04/12 10:34 AM
STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Sahouria, Janelle)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
10 10 misc Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA) Fri 04/05 5:09 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Leong, Angela)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-14) Reminder re MJ Civil Consent Pilot Project-optional html form Fri 04/05 4:35 PM
REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (et)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
8 8 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Wed 04/03 9:58 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) STANDING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (see document for details) (hr)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Tue 04/02 4:57 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Imperfect Foods, Inc., re Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form6 , Declaration2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties4 , Corporate Disclosure Statement3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)5 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 served on 04/02/2024. (Sahouria, Janelle)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Tue 04/02 10:33 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV-11C Statement of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge
Friday, March 29, 2024
5 5 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 03/29 5:25 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Imperfect Foods, Inc.. (Sahouria, Janelle)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 03/29 5:23 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Imperfect Foods, Inc., identifying Plaintiff Garry Armstrong; Defendant Imperfect Foods, Inc.. (Sahouria, Janelle)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/29 5:21 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Imperfect Foods, Inc. identifying Misfits Market Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Sahouria, Janelle)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration Fri 03/29 5:18 PM
DECLARATION of Marbeda St. Hilaire re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Defendant Imperfect Foods, Inc.. (Sahouria, Janelle)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/29 5:14 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior, case number 23STCV31772 Receipt No: ACACDC-37195782 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Imperfect Foods, Inc.. (Attorney Janelle Jad Sahouria added to party Imperfect Foods, Inc.(pty:dft))(Sahouria, Janelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Civil Case Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Summons,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - ADR Packet,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - First Amended General Order,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulations,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Notice of Case Assignment,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Notice of Case Management Conference,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Order to Show Cause,
Att: 10 Exhibit Answer to Complaint
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Tue 04/02 10:36 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 20, inclusive, Imperfect Foods, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Garry Armstrong. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/28/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Tue 04/02 10:38 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Imperfect Foods, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/28/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT J)(ghap)
Related: [-]