New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Eric N Vitaliano
Referred: Marcia M Henry
Case #: 1:24-cv-02386
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Mar 29, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Sep 26, 2024 6:08 AM EDT
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Christopher Zepf
Jones Day - New York
contact info
Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By
Arjun P. Rao
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Lauren McCabe
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Defendant
Trans Union, LLC
Represented By
Robert John Murdoch
Robert John Murdoch
contact info
Andrew George Hope
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Jacqueline M. Weyand
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By
Heather H. Sharp
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Joshua Allen Stiers
Trans Union, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Igor Sorkin
Represented By
Abel L. Pierre
Law Office Of Abel L. Pierre, Attorney At Law, P.C.
contact info
Ross Howard Schmierer
Kazerouni Law Group, Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
40 40 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 02/18 3:29 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Igor Sorkin (Schmierer, Ross)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
39 39 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 12/04 5:31 PM
ORDER granting 38 : The parties' first motion for an extension of time to complete discovery is granted. The deadlines to complete discovery are revised as follows: All fact discovery shall be completed by 02/14/2025 with a joint status report due on 02/21/2025 certifying the close of fact discovery. Expert discovery shall be completed by 04/25/2025 . All discovery shall be completed by 04/25/2025 with a joint status report due on 05/02/2025 certifying the close of all discovery. By 05/09/2025 , the parties shall take the first step to initiate any dispositive motion practice. If none, the parties shall file a Joint Pre-Trial Order by 05/23/2025 . Parties shall consult the presiding district judge's individual rules before filing dispositive motions or a Joint Pre-Trial Order. See attached for all deadlines . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 12/04/2024. (YHW)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
38 38 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 12/02 5:57 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Zepf, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order
Thursday, November 14, 2024
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 11/14 11:39 AM
ORDER granting34 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jacqueline M. Weyand terminated. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 11/14/2024. (SY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
37 37 11 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Wed 11/06 11:51 AM
ORDER granting 36 and denying as moot 35 : The parties' proposed protective order is So Ordered. See attached. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 11/06/2024. (YHW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
36 36 motion Protective Order Tue 11/05 9:12 AM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Sharp, Heather)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, November 04, 2024
order Order(Other) Mon 11/04 3:02 PM
ORDER deferring decision 35 : The proposed stipulation for entry of protective order at ECF No. 35 does not include signatures of the parties' counsel. By 11/07/2024 , the parties shall file a signed stipulation. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 11/04/2024. (YHW)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
35 35 motion Protective Order Mon 09/30 4:20 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Sharp, Heather)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
34 34 notice Notice(Other) Tue 09/03 5:38 PM
NOTICE by Trans Union, LLC Withdrawal of Appearance (Weyand, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
33 33 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/03 4:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew George Hope on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Hope, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 08/12 3:16 PM
ORDER granting 31 32 : Attorney Joshua A. Stiers is terminated as counsel of record for Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. So Ordered by Magistrate Marcia M. Henry on 08/12/2024. (RA)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
32 32 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 08/09 9:54 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Stiers, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Joshua A. Stiers
31 31 notice Notice of Consent to Change Attorney Fri 08/09 9:52 AM
NOTICE of Consent to Change Attorney by Heather H. Sharp (Sharp, Heather)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/09 9:51 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Heather H. Sharp on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC (aty to be noticed) (Sharp, Heather)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Fri 08/09 2:38 PM
ORDER granting in part 27 : Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank ("Chase") and Plaintiff's request to stay the action as to Defendant Chase pending arbitration is granted . By 10/18/2024 the parties shall file a joint status report indicating their progress with arbitration and settlement discussions. All deadlines in the Court's 08/07/2024 Order remain in effect. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 08/09/2024. (RA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/08 4:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Zepf on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Zepf, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
28 28 minutes Initial Conference Hearing Wed 08/07 5:32 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry: An video initial conference was held on 08/07/2024 . Ross Schmierer appeared on behalf of the Plaintiff. Lauren McCabe appeared on behalf of the Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Christopher Zepf appeared on behalf of Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Robert Murdoch appeared on behalf of Defendant Trans Union, LLC. Joshua Stiers appeared on behalf of Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC. The Court directed specific counsel to file formal notices of appearances (and three of the four counsel did so file). The parties' proposed discovery plan is So Ordered as amended. The parties shall complete fact discovery by 12/05/2024 with a joint status report certifying the close of fact discovery due by 12/12/2024 . The parties shall complete all discovery by 01/20/2025 with a joint status report certifying the close of all discovery due by 01/27/2025 . See attached for all deadlines. By 10/18/2024 the parties shall file a joint status report (not exceeding three pages) on their progress with discovery, and settlement discussions. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 08/07/2024. (Zoom Log # 12:06PM-12:34PM) (SY)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Stipulation Wed 08/07 3:11 PM
STIPULATION to Stay Action Pending Arbitration by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Rao, Arjun)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/07 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren McCabe on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (notification declined or already on case) (McCabe, Lauren)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/07 3:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Arjun P. Rao on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (notification declined or already on case) (Rao, Arjun)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/07 12:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert John Murdoch on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Murdoch, Robert)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/07 8:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Abel L. Pierre on behalf of Igor Sorkin (aty to be noticed) (Pierre, Abel)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 08/07 8:49 AM
ORDER GRANTING 22 MOTION TO APPEAR Pro Hac Vice . Attorney Robert J. Murdoch is granted permission to appear pro hac vice on behalf Defendant Trans Union, LLC. The attorney shall register for ECF at[LINK:www.pacer.gov] . Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 200 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 08/07/2024. (SY)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
22 22 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 08/05 9:43 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 200, receipt number ANYEDC-18137958 by Trans Union, LLC. (Murdoch, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Admission Information,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
21 21 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Wed 07/31 4:17 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Igor Sorkin (Pierre, Abel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
20 20 order Scheduling Order Thu 06/27 9:44 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER : A video initial conference is scheduled for 08/07/2024 at 12:00PM before Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry. Pro se litigants and counsel for each represented party shall appear via video. Case participants shall join the video call ten (10) minutes before the conference and shall use the Zoom invitation link sent to the email addresses listed on the docket. Counsel are directed to review the attached Initial Conference Order and this Court's Individual Practice Rules for instructions. By 07/31/2024 , the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the attached Proposed Discovery Plan (also available in PDF format at: [LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/local_rules/ProposedDiscoveryPlanMMH.pdf] ). To access this conference telephonically, the phone number 646-828-7666 and follow these steps: (1) Enter the meeting ID number: 160 326 7077 and then press #. (2) Press # again. (3) Enter the passcode: 711582 . Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of any court proceeding or communication with the Court are prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions. A transcript of the proceedings may be ordered from the Clerk's Office or the assigned Court Reporter. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 06/27/2024. (SY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Individual Practice Rules,
Att: 2 Proposed Discovery Plan
Monday, June 24, 2024
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 06/24 11:36 AM
Experian's ANSWER to1 Complaint, and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Zepf, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Sorkin_Experian_Corporate_Disclosure_Statement
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 06/24 11:12 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Rao, Arjun)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 06/24 11:08 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Rao, Arjun)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/21 9:59 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline M. Weyand on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Weyand, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/21 9:53 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Stiers, Joshua)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 06/21 9:45 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., Other Affiliate TransUnion for Trans Union, LLC. (Weyand, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/21 9:37 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Trans Union, LLC. (Weyand, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, May 23, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 05/23 9:41 AM
ORDER granting 12 : The deadline for Defendant Trans Union, LLC to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 06/24/2024 , on consent. Any dispositive motions shall be made pursuant to the presiding district judge's individual rules. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 05/23/2024. (RA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 05/22 11:35 AM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Trans Union, LLC. (Weyand, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 05/22 9:55 AM
ORDER granting 11 : The deadline for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 06/24/2024 , on consent. Any dispositive motions shall be made pursuant to the presiding district judge's individual rules. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 05/22/2024. (RA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 05/21 4:05 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Zepf, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 05/17 10:36 AM
ORDER granting 10 : The deadline for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to answer or respond to the Complaint is extended to 06/24/2024 , on consent. Any dispositive motions shall be made in accordance with the presiding district judge's individual rules. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 05/17/2024. (RA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 05/16 1:16 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, to June 24, 2024 by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (McCabe, Lauren)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 05/16 9:58 AM
ORDER granting 9 : The deadline for Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC to answer or respond to the Complaint is extended to 06/23/2024 , on consent. Any dispositive motions shall be made in accordance with the presiding district judge's individual rules. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 05/16/2024. (RA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 05/15 2:02 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, - stipulated by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Stiers, Joshua)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 05/15 2:01 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Stiers, Joshua)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/15 2:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Allen Stiers on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Stiers, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 05/06 2:08 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Igor Sorkin. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 5/2/2024, answer due 5/23/2024. (Schmierer, Ross)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 05/06 2:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Igor Sorkin. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. served on 5/2/2024, answer due 5/23/2024. (Schmierer, Ross)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 04/30 10:47 AM
Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Trans Union, LLC. (JP)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 04/29 1:43 PM
Proposed Summons. by Igor Sorkin (Schmierer, Ross)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
order Order Reassigning Case Tue 04/02 10:55 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano for all further proceedings. Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 4/2/2024. (SDM)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 04/01 11:11 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDM)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Mon 04/01 11:11 AM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: If multiple defendants, there must me a rider attached to the summons with the name and addresses of all defendants included., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (SDM)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/29 7:58 PM
COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Trans Union, LLC filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17723971 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Igor Sorkin. (Schmierer, Ross)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons,
Att: 5 Proposed Summons