District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Ana C Reyes
Case #: 1:24-cv-00918
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Mar 29, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Sep 26, 2024 5:59 AM EDT
Defendant
UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By
Alessandra Faso
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By
Alessandra Faso
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
UR MENDOZA JADDOU
Represented By
Alessandra Faso
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS
Represented By
Alessandra Faso
Doj-Civ
contact info
Plaintiff
INVEST IN THE USA
Represented By
Andrew A. Lyons-Berg
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info
Grace Wallack
Mcdermott Will & Emery
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Friday, March 21, 2025
26 26 7 pgs misc Status Report Fri 03/21 7:16 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UR MENDOZA JADDOU. (Faso, Alessandra)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
order .Order Fri 02/28 2:47 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court has reviewed the parties'25 Joint Status Report. The Court expects parties to be able to settle common issues like these amongst themselves. The Court ORDERS the parties to meet and confer regarding next steps in this litigation, including about whether to hold this case in abeyance and for how long. The Court ORDERS the parties to file a joint status report about the developments from the meet and confer and the parties' proposed next steps on or before March 21, 2025. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 2/28/2025. (lcacr3)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 02/28 4:11 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report from the parties due by 3/21/2025 (zakb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
25 25 5 pgs misc Status Report Thu 02/27 7:30 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UR MENDOZA JADDOU. (Faso, Alessandra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
order .Order Tue 01/28 3:47 PM
MINUTE ORDER. As stated on the record in today's hearings, the Court ORDERS the parties to meet and confer within 30 days and ORDERS the parties to submit a Joint Status Report on or before February 27, 2025. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 1/28/2025. (lcacr3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Wed 01/08 4:16 PM
NOTICE of Hearing on15 Motion for Summary Judgment and16 Cross Motion to Dismiss: Hearing set for 1/28/2025 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Ana C. Reyes. (zcdw)
Related: [-]
NOTICE of Hearing on15 Motion for Summary Judgment and16 Cross Motion to Dismiss: Hearing set for 1/28/2025 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Ana C. Reyes. Public access line will be available. Please use the following information to dial in: Toll Free Number: 833-990-9400 and Meeting ID: 787605272 (zcdw) Modified on 1/27/2025 (zcdw).
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
24 24 46 pgs misc Joint Appendix Thu 12/19 6:22 PM
JOINT APPENDIX by INVEST IN THE USA. (Hughes, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
23 23 23 pgs respm Reply to opposition to motion Thu 12/05 7:32 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re16 Motion to Dismiss filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UR MENDOZA JADDOU. (Faso, Alessandra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
22 22 43 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Thu 11/21 7:09 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re16 Motion to Dismiss filed by INVEST IN THE USA.(Hughes, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
21 21 43 pgs respm Reply to opposition to motion Thu 11/21 7:08 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re15 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by INVEST IN THE USA.(Hughes, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, November 18, 2024
20 20 misc Amicus Brief Wed 11/20 11:42 AM
AMICUS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS by AMERICAN IMMIGRANT INVESTOR ALLIANCE. (zdp)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 11/18 3:44 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting19 Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 11/18/2024. (lcacr3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
19 19 motion Leave to File Document Tue 11/12 3:16 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae by AMERICAN IMMIGRANT INVESTOR ALLIANCE.(Bless, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 28 pgs Brief of Amicus Curiae,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/12 3:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse Matthew Bless on behalf of AMERICAN IMMIGRANT INVESTOR ALLIANCE (Bless, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
17 17 32 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Thu 10/31 9:01 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re15 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UR MENDOZA JADDOU. (Faso, Alessandra)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs motion Dismiss Thu 10/31 9:01 PM
Cross MOTION to Dismiss by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UR MENDOZA JADDOU.(Faso, Alessandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 32 pgs Memorandum in Support
Thursday, October 03, 2024
15 15 3 pgs motion Summary Judgment Thu 10/03 9:34 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by INVEST IN THE USA.(Hughes, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 47 pgs Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 3 pgs Declaration of Rush B. Deacon,
Att: 3 5 pgs Declaration of Aaron L. Grau,
Att: 4 2 pgs Declaration of Paul W. Hughes,
Att: 5 3 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 6 8 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 7 5 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 8 4 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 9 2 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 10 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, September 12, 2024
14 14 2 pgs notice Notice (Other) Thu 09/12 11:41 AM
NOTICE of Filing Index of Certified Administrative Record by UR MENDOZA JADDOU, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY(Faso, Alessandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit Index of Certified Administrative Record
Monday, September 09, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/09 1:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Grace Wallack on behalf of INVEST IN THE USA (Wallack, Grace)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/09 1:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew A. Lyons-Berg on behalf of INVEST IN THE USA (Lyons-Berg, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
order Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 09/04 12:00 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties'11 Joint Motion for Briefing Schedule, and for good cause shown, the Court ORDERS that the Motion for a Briefing Schedule is GRANTED and furthers that: (1) The Government shall provide a copy of the certified administrative record to Plaintiff and file a certified list of the contents of the administrative record with the Court on or before September 12, 2024. (2) IIUSA shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before October 3, 2024. (3) The Government shall file its opposition to summary judgment and its cross-motion to dismiss on or before October 31, 2024. (4) IIUSA shall reply to the Government's opposition and file its opposition to the Governments motion to dismiss on or before November 21, 2024. (5) The Government shall file its reply on or before December 5, 2024. (6) The Court will hold a motions hearing on January 15, 2025 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Ana C. Reyes. The parties are advised that the Court will be highly skeptical of any extension motion and should prepare, should they make one, for the distinct possibility that the Court will deny it. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 09/04/2024. (lcar3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
11 11 motion Briefing Schedule Tue 09/03 3:01 PM
Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by INVEST IN THE USA.(Hughes, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, August 29, 2024
minutes Pre-motion Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 08/29 1:38 PM
Minute Entry for Pre-motion Conference held on 8/29/2024 before Judge Ana C. Reyes. Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2024 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 12- In Person before Judge Ana C. Reyes. Court Reporter Elizabeth St. Loth. (zjch, )
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
notice Notice of Hearing Fri 07/26 10:55 AM
NOTICE of Hearing:Status Conference set for 8/29/2024 at 12:30 PM via video before Judge Ana C. Reyes. (zjch, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
order .Order Tue 07/23 9:58 AM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court REMINDS the parties that, consistent with the Court's5 Standing Order and Minute Order of June 20, 2024, they should contact the Courtroom Deputy, Jonathan Hopkins (Jonathan_Hopkins@dcd.uscourts.gov), to schedule a pre-motion conference. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 7/23/2024. (lcar3)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
10 10 4 pgs respm Response to (non-motion) Document Mon 07/22 7:39 PM
RESPONSE re9 Notice (Other) Response to pre-motion conference letter filed by INVEST IN THE USA. (Hughes, Paul)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
9 9 6 pgs notice Notice (Other) Mon 07/15 5:45 PM
NOTICE Requesting a Pre-Motion Conference by UR MENDOZA JADDOU, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY re7 Notice (Other) (Faso, Alessandra)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
8 8 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/21 11:24 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alessandra Faso on behalf of All Defendants (Faso, Alessandra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
order .Order Thu 06/20 2:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court hereby ORDERS that Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's7 Notice Requesting a Pre-Motion Conference either (1) on or before the date on which their response to Plaintiff's1 Complaint is due under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12, if they respond with a pre-motion notice proposing a dispositive motion under Rule 12(b), or (2) within five days of filing their answer, if they respond to the Complaint by filing an answer. The parties should contact the Courtroom Deputy, Jonathan Hopkins (Jonathan_Hopkins@dcd.uscourts.gov), to schedule a pre-motion conference. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 6/20/2024. (lcar3)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
7 7 6 pgs notice Notice (Other) Mon 06/17 3:29 PM
NOTICE Request for Pre-Motion Conference by INVEST IN THE USA (Hughes, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Wed 05/22 10:12 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/16/2024. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/15/2024. (Hughes, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
5 5 11 pgs order Standing Order Thu 04/04 1:21 PM
STANDING ORDER. The parties are ORDERED to comply with the Court's Standing Order. See Standing Order for details. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 4/4/2024. (lcar3)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
4 4 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Mon 04/01 12:22 PM
SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
3 3 2 pgs cmp Civil Cover Sheet (USE ONLY IF INSTRUCTED) Mon 04/01 12:07 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by INVEST IN THE USA re1 Complaint,, filed by INVEST IN THE USA. Related document:1 Complaint,, filed by INVEST IN THE USA.(Hughes, Paul)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Error- New Case Mon 04/01 10:49 AM
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR regarding1 Complaint,,. The following error(s) need correction: Incorrect civil cover sheet. Please file the Civil Cover Sheet (JS44) form at www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmw)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/01 12:19 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Ana C. Reyes. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
2 2 1 pgs notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Fri 03/29 8:21 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by INVEST IN THE USA (Hughes, Paul)
Related: [-]
1 1 37 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/29 8:17 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10792111) filed by INVEST IN THE USA.(Hughes, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 8 Summons to U.S. Attorney General,
Att: 9 Summons to U.S. Department of Homeland Security,
Att: 10 Summons to Ur M. Jaddou,
Att: 11 Summons to Alejandro Mayorkas,
Att: 12 Summons to United States Attorney's Office,
Att: 13 Summons to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services