Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas W Thrash, Jr
Case #: 1:24-cv-01356
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 24, 2024 4:32 AM EDT
Defendant
Secretariat Advisors, LLC
Represented By
Seth T. Ford
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders Llp - Atl
contact info
John Sikes Gibbs, III
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders Llp - Atl
contact info
Moses Tincher
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
FTI Consulting, Inc.
Represented By
Thomas E. Gilbertsen
Dueffert Gilbertson PLLC
contact info
Cheralynn M. Gregoire
Berman Fink Van Horn PC
contact info
Benjamin I. Fink
Berman Fink Van Horn P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
FTI LLC
Represented By
Thomas E. Gilbertsen
Dueffert Gilbertson PLLC
contact info
Benjamin I. Fink
Berman Fink Van Horn P.C.
contact info

GPO Mar 07 2025
OPINION AND ORDER. Defendant Secretariat Advisors, LLC's Motion to Dismiss [Doc. 7] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Court dismisses Count I with respect to the tortious interference with business relations claim. To the extent that Counts I through III and VI are premised upon allegations of trade secret misappropriations, they are also dismissed. The Motion to Dismiss is denied as to all other relief requested therein. Additionally, Plaintiffs FTI Consulting, Inc. and FTI, LLC's Motion for Certification to the Supreme Court of Georgia [Doc. 17] is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/7/2025. (tcc) Modified on 3/10/2025 (tcc).

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Tue 05/06 2:41 PM
Clerk's Notation re44 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Reviewed and approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
44 44 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 05/05 2:14 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by FTI Consulting, Inc., FTI LLC identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Mawer Investment Management, Ltd. for FTI Consulting, Inc.. (Gregoire, Cheralynn)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
43 43 order Scheduling Order Fri 05/02 3:52 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:42 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 12/22/2025. Motions due by 1/22/2026. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/22/2026. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/2/2025. (jbu)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
42 42 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Wed 04/23 4:05 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Secretariat Advisors, LLC. (Ford, Seth)
Related: [-]
41 41 discov Certificate of Service Wed 04/23 2:25 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by FTI Consulting, Inc., FTI LLC.(Hagenson, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
40 40 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/22 3:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alyssa Grace Gill on behalf of FTI Consulting, Inc., FTI LLC (Gill, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
39 39 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/22 3:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Hagenson on behalf of FTI Consulting, Inc., FTI LLC (Hagenson, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
38 38 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/22 2:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy L. Kahn on behalf of FTI Consulting, Inc., FTI LLC (Kahn, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
37 37 discov Certificate of Service Mon 04/21 6:32 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by FTI Consulting, Inc., FTI LLC.(Gregoire, Cheralynn)
Related: [-]
36 36 discov Certificate of Service Mon 04/21 6:30 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by FTI Consulting, Inc., FTI LLC.(Gregoire, Cheralynn)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
35 35 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 04/07 2:47 PM
ORDER: The34 Consent Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. The Parties' deadline to file a Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan is hereby extended through and including April 23, 2025. The Parties' deadline to serve initial disclosures is extended through and including April 23, 2025. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/7/2025. (tcc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
34 34 motion Extension of Time Thu 04/03 4:42 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time For The Parties to File Joint Preliminary Conference Report and Discovery Plan and Serve Initial Disclosures by FTI Consulting, Inc., FTI LLC.(Fink, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
33 33 misc Leave of Absence Wed 04/02 5:04 PM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June 13, 2025 through June 16, 2025, by Benjamin I. Fink. (Fink, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
32 32 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/31 4:45 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by Secretariat Advisors, LLC. Discovery ends on 8/28/2025.(Ford, Seth)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
31 31 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 03/21 10:30 AM
ORDER: The30 Consent Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to file its Answer to the Complaint is hereby extended through and including Monday, March 31, 2025. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/21/2025. (tcc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
30 30 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Wed 03/19 3:51 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Secretariat Advisors, LLC.(Ford, Seth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A - Proposed Consent Order
Friday, March 07, 2025
29 29 32 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 03/10 10:38 AM
OPINION AND ORDER. Defendant Secretariat Advisors, LLC's Motion to Dismiss [Doc.7 ] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Court dismisses Count I with respect to the tortious interference with business relations claim. To the extent that Counts I through III and VI are premised upon allegations of trade secret misappropriations, they are also dismissed. The Motion to Dismiss is denied as to all other relief requested therein. Additionally, Plaintiffs FTI Consulting, Inc. and FTI, LLC's Motion for Certification to the Supreme Court of Georgia [Doc.17 ] is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/7/2025. (tcc) Modified on 3/10/2025 (tcc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
28 28 misc Leave of Absence Tue 03/04 4:01 PM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): March 19, 2025 through March 23, 2025, March 26, 2025 through March 31, 2025, May 22, 2025 through May 27, 2025, June 30, 2025 through July 9, 2025, by Benjamin I. Fink. (Fink, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
27 27 misc Leave of Absence Thu 12/12 2:38 PM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): March 27, 2025 and March 28, 2025, May 21, 2025 through May 27, 2025, July 1, 2025 through July 10, 2025, by Benjamin I. Fink. (Fink, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
26 26 misc Leave of Absence Tue 10/01 11:38 AM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): November 7, 2024 through November 11, 2024; and January 10, 2025 through January 27, 2025, by Benjamin I. Fink. (Fink, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Thu 09/05 11:02 AM
NOTICE by FTI Consulting, Inc., FTI LLC re20 Response in Opposition to Motion (Supplement Authority)(Gregoire, Cheralynn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Wed 08/28 9:34 AM
NOTICE by FTI Consulting, Inc., FTI LLC re20 Response in Opposition to Motion (Supplement Authority)(Gregoire, Cheralynn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
23 23 respm Reply Brief Wed 08/28 9:12 AM
REPLY BRIEF re17 MOTION for Certification to the Supreme Court of Georgia filed by FTI Consulting, Inc., FTI LLC. (Gregoire, Cheralynn)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
utility Submission to District Judge Mon 08/26 2:24 PM
Submission of17 MOTION for Certification to the Supreme Court of Georgia to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (jeh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 08/06 4:05 PM
Submission of7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint , to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (bmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
22 22 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 08/05 4:35 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re17 MOTION for Certification to the Supreme Court of Georgia filed by Secretariat Advisors, LLC. (Tincher, Moses)
Related: [-]
21 21 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 08/05 4:34 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Secretariat Advisors, LLC. (Tincher, Moses)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
20 20 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 07/22 5:38 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint (Supplemental) filed by FTI Consulting, Inc.. (Fink, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 07/11 3:11 PM
ORDER granting18 Joint Motion For Extension of Time and Remedy and denying as moot16 Motion for Remedy for Defendant's Violation of Local Rule 5.1(C). On or before July 22, 2024, Plaintiffs shall be permitted to file a supplemental brief in support of their Response in Opposition to Secretariat's Motion to Dismiss15 that is 3.75 pages long. On or before August 5, 2024, Defendant shall file its Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss and Response to FTI's Motion for Certification. On or before August 29, 2024, FTI shall file its Reply Brief in Support of its Motion for Certification. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/11/2024. (bgt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
18 18 motion Extension of Time Tue 07/09 6:14 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Briefing and for Remedy re:16 MOTION for Remedy for Defendants Violation of Local Rule 5.1(C) ,17 MOTION for Certification to the Supreme Court of Georgia ,15 Response in Opposition to Motion by Secretariat Advisors, LLC.(Tincher, Moses)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, June 28, 2024
17 17 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 06/28 4:23 PM
MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION TO THE SUPREME COURT OF GEORGIA by FTI Consulting, Inc., FTI LLC.(Fink, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Certification to the Supreme Court of Georgia
16 16 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 06/28 4:12 PM
MOTION FOR REMEDY FOR DEFENDANTS VIOLATION OF LOCAL RULE 5.1(C) by FTI Consulting, Inc., FTI LLC.(Fink, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion For a Remedy for Defendant's Violation of Local Rule 5.1(c)
15 15 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 06/28 3:41 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by FTI Consulting, Inc., FTI LLC. (Fink, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
14 14 misc Leave of Absence Mon 06/17 12:36 PM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): August 8, 2024 through August 16, 2024, August 23, 2024, September 19, 2024 through September 23, 2024, September 26, 2024 through September 30, 2024, October 14, 2024 through October 16, 2024, by Benjamin I. Fink. (Fink, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 06/13 1:56 PM
ORDER GRANTING12 Motion to Stay Pre-Discovery Deadlines Pending Resolution of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. It is ORDERED that all pre-discovery deadlines required by Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 16 and 26, including initial disclosures and planning conferences and reports, shall be stayed for all Parties pending the Court's ruling on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 6/13/2024. (kng)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
12 12 motion Stay Wed 06/12 10:36 AM
Joint MOTION to Stay Pre-Discovery Deadlines Pending Resolution of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Secretariat Advisors, LLC.(Tincher, Moses)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/11 12:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Sikes Gibbs, III on behalf of Secretariat Advisors, LLC (Gibbs, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 06/07 9:23 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time. The above Plaintiffs' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is hereby extended through and including 6/28/2024. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 6/6/2024. (dmb) Modified on 6/7/2024 (kng)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time Tue 06/04 9:17 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to answer or otherwise respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by FTI Consulting, Inc..(Fink, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Wed 05/29 3:37 PM
Clerk's Notation re8 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Reviewed and approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
8 8 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 05/28 5:04 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Secretariat Advisors, LLC. (Ford, Seth)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Dismiss Tue 05/28 5:02 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint with Brief In Support by Secretariat Advisors, LLC.(Ford, Seth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Defendant Secretariat Advisors, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
6 6 misc Leave of Absence Tue 05/07 5:07 PM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): May 17-21, 2024, May 31-June 3, 2024, by Benjamin I. Fink. (Fink, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/19 2:09 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FTI Consulting, Inc., FTI LLC. Secretariat Advisors, LLC waiver mailed on 3/29/2024, answer due 5/28/2024. (Gregoire, Cheralynn)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
4 4 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/05 1:01 PM
ORDER granting3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas E. Gilbertsen. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/05/2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/05 1:02 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Thomas E. Gilbertsen re4 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Thu 04/04 9:59 AM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:3 APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas E. Gilbertsen Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13337945). Attorney Thomas E. Gilbertsen added appearing on behalf of FTI Consulting, Inc., FTI LLC. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
3 3 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/03 2:58 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas E. Gilbertsen Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13337945).by FTI Consulting, Inc., FTI LLC.(Fink, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, March 28, 2024
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 03/29 12:05 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Secretariat Advisors, LLC. (bmr)
Related: [-]
1 1 50 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/29 12:04 PM
COMPLAINT filed by FTI Consulting, Inc., FTI LLC. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13326822)(bmr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 28 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet