Alabama Northern District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00085
Case Filed:Feb 29, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 30, 2024 2:28 AM CDT
Defendant
Robert Elton Trimble (1)
Represented By
Kevyn Armstrong-Wright
Office Of The Federal Public Defender Nd/al
contact info
Kevin L Butler
Federal Public Defender
contact info
James Tobia Gibson
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
USM
United States Marshal
contact info
Prim F. Escalona, US Attorney
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
US Probation
United States Probation Office
contact info
Robin Leann White
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/30/2024 3:40 AM CDT
Thursday, February 29, 2024
1 1 INDICTMENT as to dft Robert Elton Trimble (1) count(s) 1. Please file all subsequent documents using the criminal case number assigned to this indictment. (KBB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (SEALED) Signed Indictment
2 2 MOTION to Seal Indictment filed by USA as to dft Robert Elton Trimble. (KBB)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER granting2 Motion to Seal Indictment as to dft Robert Elton Trimble (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 2/29/2024. (KBB)
Related: [-]