South Dakota District Court
Case #: 5:24-cr-50034
Case Filed:Feb 29, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 30, 2024 2:35 AM CDT
Defendant
Samuel Andrew Bear Robe, Jr. (1)
Represented By
Alecia E. Fuller (FPD)
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Sarah B. Collins
U.S. Attorney'S Office (rapid City, Sd)
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/30/2024 3:49 AM CDT
Thursday, February 29, 2024
1 1 INDICTMENT (personal identifiers redacted) as to Samuel Andrew Bear Robe, Jr (1) count(s) 1, 2. NOTICE REGARDING COOPERATOR INFORMATION: All plea agreements and sentencing memoranda contain a sealed supplement which includes either a statement there was cooperation or a statement there was no cooperation. It is not possible to determine from examination of docket entries whether a defendant did or did not cooperate with the government. (KLE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Sealed Charging Document
2 2 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Samuel Andrew Bear Robe, Jr. (KLE)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER granting2 Motion to Seal Case as to Samuel Andrew Bear Robe Jr. (1). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Daneta Wollmann on 02/29/2024. (KLE)
Related: [-]