California Eastern District Court
Judge:Dena M Coggins
Referred: Jeremy D Peterson
Case #: 2:24-cv-00963
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2024
Terminated:Nov 19, 2024
Case in other court:Sacramento County Superior Court, 24CV003371
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 24, 2024 1:21 AM PDT
Defendant
C&S Logistics of Sacramento/Tracy LLC
Represented By
Kerri H. Sakaue
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Matthew C. Kane
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Amy Elaine Beverlin
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Sylvia Jihae Kim
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Defendant
C&S Wholesale Grocers, LLC
Represented By
Matthew C. Kane
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Sylvia Jihae Kim
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Teniah Tercero
Represented By
Diego Francisco Aviles
Wilshire Law Firm, PLC
contact info
Jeffrey Charles Bils
Wilshire Law Firm, PLC
contact info
Aram Boyadjian
Wilshire Law Firm
contact info
John G. Yslas
Wilshire Law Firm, PLC
contact info

GPO Apr 29 2024
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/29/2024 EXTENDING the deadline for Defendants to file any Motions or Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint to 5/31/2024. (Clemente Licea, O)
GPO Jun 27 2024
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Senior District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 06/27/2024 RELATING cases 2:23-cv-2608-MCE-JDP; 2:23-cv-2586-MCE-JDP; 2:24-cv-00526 MCE-JDP; 2:24-cv-00953 MCE-JDP; 2:24-cv-00963 MCE-JDP; 2:24-cv-1011 MCE JDP. (Nair, C)
GPO Sep 23 2024
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Senior District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/22/2024 RELATING Cases, 2:23cv2608, 23cv2586, 24cv0526, 24cv0953, 24cv0963, 24cv1011, 24cv2228. (Mendez Licea, O)
GPO Nov 19 2024
ORDER signed by District Judge Dena M. Coggins on 11/18/2024 GRANTING 18 Motion to Remand; REMANDING CASE to Sacramento County Superior Court; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 19 request for judicial notice; DENYING, as rendered moot by this order, 12 motion to compel arbitration, 13 motion to dismiss, and 14 motion to dismiss. Certified copy of remand order sent to other court. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, February 27, 2025
42 42 appeal USCA Order/Mandate/Memo Mon 03/03 9:58 AM
USCA ORDER: The petition for permission to appeal is denied. (Deputy Clerk AJB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
41 41 appeal USCA Case Number Tue 12/03 2:02 PM
USCA CASE NUMBER 24-7197 (Licea Chavez, V)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
40 40 22 pgs order Order ~Util - Case Remanded Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion to Remand Tue 11/19 10:35 AM
ORDER signed by District Judge Dena M. Coggins on 11/18/2024 GRANTING18 Motion to Remand; REMANDING CASE to Sacramento County Superior Court; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART19 request for judicial notice; DENYING, as rendered moot by this order,12 motion to compel arbitration,13 motion to dismiss, and14 motion to dismiss. Certified copy of remand order sent to other court. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
39 39 2 pgs misc Order Reassigning Newly Appointed District Judge Thu 10/10 3:15 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Troy L. Nunley: Due to the appointment of District Judge Dena M. Coggins to the bench of the Eastern District of California, this action is reassigned from District Judge *Morrison C. England, Jr.* to District Judge Dena M. Coggins for all further proceedings. All hearings currently set before the District Judge in this reassigned action are VACATED. (Mendez Licea, O)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order
Monday, September 23, 2024
38 38 2 pgs order Order Mon 09/23 10:55 AM
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Senior District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/22/2024 RELATING Cases, 2:23cv2608 23cv2586 24cv0526 24cv0953 24cv0963 24cv1011 24cv2228 (Mendez Licea, O)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
37 37 notice Notice of Related Case Fri 08/23 2:04 PM
NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:23-cv-02586-MCE-JDP, 2:23-cv-02608-MCE-JDP, 2:24-cv-00526-MCE-JDP, 2:24-cv-00953-MCE-JDP, 2:24-cv-01011-MCE-JDP, 2:24-cv-02228-DJC-AC by C&S Logistics of Sacramento/Tracy LLC, C&S Wholesale Grocers, LLC. (Kim, Sylvia)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
36 36 misc Objections Mon 07/15 7:49 PM
OBJECTIONS by Defendant C&S Wholesale Grocers, LLC to34 Reply,35 Declaration. (Kane, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
35 35 respm Declaration Thu 07/11 7:23 PM
DECLARATION of Aram Boyadjian in Support of Reply in support of18 Motion to Remand. (Boyadjian, Aram)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit K
34 34 misc Reply Thu 07/11 7:08 PM
REPLY by Teniah Tercero re18 Motion to Remand. (Bils, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
33 33 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/11 7:05 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Aram Boyadjian on behalf of Teniah Tercero. Attorney Boyadjian, Aram added. (Boyadjian, Aram)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 06, 2024
32 32 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Motions Submitted/Under Advisement Order on Motion to Compel Sat 07/06 12:19 PM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 7/11/2024 hearing on the Motion to Compel Arbitration12 is VACATED and the motion is SUBMITTED without appearance and argument. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Accordingly, the Request for Telephonic/Remote Appearance31 is DENIED as moot. (Terrin, S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
31 31 misc Request for Telephonic/Remote Appearance Wed 07/03 5:55 PM
REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC/REMOTE APPEARANCE at the 7/11/2024 Motion to Compel Arbitration hearing by Teniah Tercero. (Bils, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
30 30 respm Opposition to Motion Thu 06/27 8:15 PM
OPPOSITION by C&S Wholesale Grocers, LLC to18 Motion to Remand. (Kane, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Matthew C. Kane,
Att: 2 Declaration of Brandon Driscoll
29 29 2 pgs order Order Thu 06/27 12:49 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Senior District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 06/27/2024 RELATING cases 2:23-cv-2608-MCE-JDP; 2:23-cv-2586-MCE-JDP; 2:24-cv-00526 MCE-JDP; 2:24-cv-00953 MCE-JDP; 2:24-cv-00963 MCE-JDP; 2:24-cv-1011 MCE JDP. (Nair, C)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
28 28 misc Reply Mon 06/24 5:47 PM
REPLY by C&S Wholesale Grocers, LLC re12 Motion to Compel,. (Kane, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Krista Gaedje (Supplemental),
Att: 2 Evidentiary Objections to Teniah Tercero Declaration,
Att: 3 Evidentiary Objections to Diego Aviles Declaration,
Att: 4 Response to Plaintiffs Evidentiary Objections
27 27 misc Reply Mon 06/24 5:41 PM
REPLY by C&S Logistics of Sacramento/Tracy LLC re13 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,. (Kane, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Cynthia Lake (Supplemental),
Att: 2 Evidentiary Objections to Jeffrey Bils Declaration
26 26 misc Reply Mon 06/24 5:36 PM
REPLY by C&S Wholesale Grocers, LLC re14 Motion to Dismiss. (Kane, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Related Case Tue 06/18 2:42 PM
NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:24-cv-01011-DAD-AC by C&S Wholesale Grocers, LLC. (Kane, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 16, 2024
24 24 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Motions Submitted/Under Advisement Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion to Remand Sun 06/16 9:59 PM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 7/25/2024 hearing on the Motion to Remand18 is VACATED and the motion is SUBMITTED without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 230(c)-(d). If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. (Terrin, S)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
23 23 respm Opposition to Motion Fri 06/14 11:10 PM
OPPOSITION by Teniah Tercero to13 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,.(Bils, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jeffrey C. Bils,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
22 22 respm Opposition to Motion Fri 06/14 11:03 PM
OPPOSITION by Teniah Tercero to14 Motion to Dismiss.(Bils, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
21 21 respm Opposition to Motion Fri 06/14 6:11 PM
OPPOSITION by Teniah Tercero to12 Motion to Compel,.(Aviles, Diego)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Krista Gaedje,
Att: 2 Declaration of Diego Aviles in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition,
Att: 3 Declaration of Teniah Tercero in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/14 5:47 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Diego Francisco Aviles on behalf of Teniah Tercero. Attorney Aviles, Diego Francisco added. (Aviles, Diego)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
19 19 respm Request for Judicial Notice Thu 06/13 7:43 PM
REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Teniah Tercero in re18 Motion to Remand.(Bils, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J
18 18 motion Remand Thu 06/13 7:28 PM
MOTION to REMAND by Teniah Tercero. Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior District Judge Morrison C. England Jr..(Bils, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
17 17 notice Notice of Interested Parties Thu 06/13 7:20 PM
NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Teniah Tercero. (Bils, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/13 7:17 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Charles Bils on behalf of Teniah Tercero. Attorney Bils, Jeffrey Charles added. (Bils, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
15 15 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Motions Submitted/Under Advisement Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 06/04 3:29 PM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 7/11/2024 hearing on the Motions to Dismiss (ECF Nos. 13-14) is VACATED and the motion is SUBMITTED without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 230(c)-(d). If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. (Terrin, S)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
14 14 35 pgs motion Dismiss Fri 05/31 6:07 PM
MOTION to DISMISS by C&S Wholesale Grocers, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior District Judge Morrison C. England Jr..(Kane, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (to RJN),
Att: 2 Proposed Order
13 13 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 05/31 6:03 PM
MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION by C&S Logistics of Sacramento/Tracy LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior District Judge Morrison C. England Jr..(Kane, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Cynthia Lake,
Att: 2 Declaration of Mahesh Goswami,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
12 12 motion Compel Fri 05/31 5:57 PM
MOTION to COMPEL Individual Arbitration of Plaintiff's Claims and to Stay All Proceedings Pending Resolution of the Motion and/or Completion of Arbitration by C&S Wholesale Grocers, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior District Judge Morrison C. England Jr..(Kane, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Krista Gaedje,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, April 29, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Mon 04/29 2:17 PM
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/29/2024 EXTENDING the deadline for Defendants to file any Motions or Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint to 5/31/2024. (Clemente Licea, O)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
10 10 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 04/22 2:22 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Pending Consolidation of Actions by C&S Logistics of Sacramento/Tracy LLC.(Beverlin, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 04/16 12:22 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER signed Senior District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 04/15/2024 RELATING cases 2:24-cv-0526 MCE JDP, 2:23-cv-2586 MCE JDP, 2:23-cv-2608 MCE JDP, 2:24-cv-0953 WBS AC and 2:24-cv-0963 DAD AC. This related case is REASSIGNED to Senior District Judge Morrison C. England and Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson for all further proceedings; any dates currently set in this case are VACATED. District Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Allison Claire are no longer assigned to case. The case number on all future filings shall be: 2:24-cv-0963 MCE JDP. (CC: DAD, AC). (Nair, C)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Related Case Fri 04/05 11:35 AM
NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:24-cv-00953-AC, 2:23-CV-02586-MCE-JDP, 2:23-cv-02608-MCE-JDP, 2:24-cv-00526-MCE-JDP by C&S Wholesale Grocers, LLC.(Kane, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Comparison Chart of Pending CS Actions
Thursday, April 04, 2024
7 7 4 pgs misc Stipulation Thu 04/04 10:24 AM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 28 DAYS by C&S Logistics of Sacramento/Tracy LLC. (Kane, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/03 3:43 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Sylvia Jihae Kim on behalf of C&S Logistics of Sacramento/Tracy LLC, C&S Wholesale Grocers, LLC. Attorney Kim, Sylvia Jihae added. (Kim, Sylvia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/02 5:32 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Amy Elaine Beverlin on behalf of C&S Logistics of Sacramento/Tracy LLC. Attorney Beverlin, Amy Elaine added. (Beverlin, Amy)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/02 5:29 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Kerri H. Sakaue on behalf of C&S Logistics of Sacramento/Tracy LLC. Attorney Sakaue, Kerri H. added. (Sakaue, Kerri)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
3 3 misc Civil New Case Documents for DAD Fri 03/29 11:26 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/13/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order,
Att: 2 Consent Form,
Att: 3 VDRP
Thursday, March 28, 2024
2 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants C&S Logistics of Sacramento/Tracy, LLC, C&S Wholesale Grocers, LLC. (Kane, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 24CV003371 by All Defendants. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11433635)(Kane, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Declaration of Brandon Driscoll