California Northern District Court
Judge:Jon S Tigar
Case #: 4:24-cv-01908
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2024
Terminated:Feb 03, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 24, 2024 1:24 AM PDT
Defendant
UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By
Robert Edward Hess
Maynard Nexsen, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
S. H.
Represented By
Jeena Renee Jiampetti
Springer Ayeni
contact info
Cassie Springer Ayeni
Springer Ayeni
contact info
Adetunji Olude
Springer Ayeni, A Professional Law Corporation
contact info


Docket last updated: 35 minutes ago
Monday, February 03, 2025
26 26 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 02/03 9:36 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar re 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Action with Prejudice. (dms, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
25 25 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 01/23 3:18 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Action with Prejudice filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America.(Hess, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 09/11 9:37 AM
ORDER EXTENDING MEDIATION COMPLETION DEADLINE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 23 Stipulation. (dms, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
23 23 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 09/10 1:35 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America.(Hess, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
22 22 order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Order Referring Case to Private ADR ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 06/25 11:25 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER AND REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on 06/25/2024. Case referred to Private Mediation to be completed by 09/23/2024. Amended Pleadings due by 7/8/2024. Plaintiffs opening Rule 52 brief due by 1/23/2025. Defendants opening/opposition Rule 52 brief due by 2/20/2025. Plaintiffs opposition/reply Rule 52 brief due by 3/13/2025. Defendants reply brief due by 04/03/2025. Rule 52 Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2025 02:00 PM - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (dms, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Private ADR Tue 06/25 12:41 PM
CASE REFERRED to Private ADR. (cmf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
21 21 misc Joint Case Management Statement Fri 06/14 4:50 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Hess, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
20 20 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 06/04 2:44 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Hess, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
19 19 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Fri 05/31 3:07 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Jiampetti, Jeena)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 05/24 2:56 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Filer is reminded that other entities need to be added. Re:18 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
18 18 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 05/23 12:32 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America re1 Complaint --- Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America's Notice of Interested Parties --- (Hess, Robert)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 05/23 12:29 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Unum Group for UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. re1 Complaint --- Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America's Corporate Disclosure Statement --- (Hess, Robert)
Related: [-]
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/23 12:26 PM
ANSWER to Complaint Defendant's Answer to Complaint (ERISA) by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Hess, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
15 15 3 pgs order Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Tue 04/23 10:43 AM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO PROCEED IN THE CASE ANONYMOUSLY by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 13 Administrative Motion.(mll, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Change In Counsel Tue 04/16 12:37 PM
NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Jeena Renee Jiampetti (Jiampetti, Jeena)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
13 13 motion Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Mon 04/15 1:45 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to proceed anonymously filed by S. H.. Responses due by 4/19/2024.(Jiampetti, Jeena)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Stipulation and Proposed Order
Friday, April 12, 2024
12 12 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Fri 04/12 4:35 PM
STIPULATION For Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (By Not More Than 30 Days) filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Hess, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/09 9:24 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by S. H.. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America served on 4/2/2024, answer due 4/23/2024. (Jiampetti, Jeena)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
10 10 service Summons Issued Fri 03/29 1:25 PM
Summons Issued as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 03/29 1:23 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Fri 03/29 12:25 PM
CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A combined list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than June 24, 2024 by 2:00 p.m. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (mll, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 03/29 10:17 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by S. H. (Jiampetti, Jeena)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 03/29 9:17 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 3/29/2024.(ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Thursday, March 28, 2024
5 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by S. H... (Jiampetti, Jeena)
Related: [-]
3 3 Proposed Summons. (Jiampetti, Jeena)
Related: [-]
2 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/11/2024. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs COMPLAINT against UNUM Life Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19268083.). Filed by S. H..(Jiampetti, Jeena)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet