Washington Western District Court
Judge:Tana Lin
Case #: 2:24-cv-00435
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause18:1595 Civil Remedies: Sex trafficking of children or TVPRA
Case Filed:Mar 29, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Sep 26, 2024 3:20 AM PDT
Defendant
Does 1-200
Defendant
SeaTac Hotels LLC
Represented By
Glen Edward Bowen
Clement & Drotz PLLC
contact info
John E Drotz
Clement & Drotz PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Motel 6 Inc Operating LP
Represented By
Rachelle R. Stefanski
Pacifica Law Group LLP
contact info
Heather M. Jensen
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp (seattle)
contact info
Defendant
Madison Avenue P&L Enterprises Inc
Represented By
Robert D Lee
Cozen O'Connor (sea)
contact info
Samuel E Cayton
Cozen O'Connor (sea)
contact info
Defendant
G6 Hospitality Purchasing LLC
Represented By
Maxine Elizabeth Faisant
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp (seattle)
contact info
Rachelle R. Stefanski
Pacifica Law Group LLP
contact info
Heather M. Jensen
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp (seattle)
contact info
Defendant
G6 Hospitality Property LLC
Represented By
Maxine Elizabeth Faisant
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp (seattle)
contact info
Rachelle R. Stefanski
Pacifica Law Group LLP
contact info
Heather M. Jensen
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp (seattle)
contact info
Defendant
G6 Hospitality LLC
Represented By
Maxine Elizabeth Faisant
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp (seattle)
contact info
Rachelle R. Stefanski
Pacifica Law Group LLP
contact info
Heather M. Jensen
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp (seattle)
contact info
Defendant
G6 Hospitality IP LLC
Represented By
Maxine Elizabeth Faisant
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp (seattle)
contact info
Rachelle R. Stefanski
Pacifica Law Group LLP
contact info
Heather M. Jensen
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp (seattle)
contact info
Defendant
G6 Hospitality Franchising LLC
Represented By
Maxine Elizabeth Faisant
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp (seattle)
contact info
Rachelle R. Stefanski
Pacifica Law Group LLP
contact info
Heather M. Jensen
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp (seattle)
contact info
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
Represented By
Katie Llamas
Singleton Schreiber Llp (sd)
contact info
Gerald Singleton
Singleton Schreiber Llp (sd)
contact info
Meagan Verschueren
Singleton Schreiber Llp (sd)
contact info
Stephen Jackson Hill
Singleton Schreiber Llp (wa)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Salesforce.com Inc
Terminated: 05/29/2024
Represented By
Kristin A Linsley
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher (sf)
contact info
Summer A Wall
contact info
Stephen C Willey
Fennemore Craig Pc (sea)
contact info
Bradley J Hamburger
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher Llp (la/grand Ave)
contact info
Defendant
John Brunst
Terminated: 05/29/2024
Defendant
Backpage.com LLC
Terminated: 05/29/2024
Defendant
Veer Hospitality Phoenix LLC
Terminated: 07/22/2024
Represented By
Todd A Bowers
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani Llp (seattle)
contact info
Defendant
Scott Spear
Terminated: 05/29/2024
Defendant
Michael Lacey
Terminated: 05/29/2024
Defendant
Carl Ferrer
Terminated: 05/29/2024
Defendant
Evergreen Lodging Group LLC
Terminated: 07/22/2024


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 11, 2025
104 104 order TL Order Setting Trial Date & Related Dates (FORM) Fri 04/11 3:50 PM
ORDER RESETTING JURY TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Tana Lin, re100 Stipulated Motion. 20 Day Jury Trial is set for 9/28/2026 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Tana Lin. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/2/2026, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 4/1/2026, Discovery Motions due by 4/1/2026, Discovery completed by 4/29/2026, Dispositive motions due by 5/27/2026, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 6/30/2026, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 7/30/2026, Motions in Limine due by 8/24/2026, Pretrial Order due by 9/8/2026, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 9/11/2026, Pretrial Conference set for 9/18/2026 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Tana Lin. (KMP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
103 103 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/08 3:08 PM
ORDER re102 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,101 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorneys Kate Wallace, and Emily Marie Akins for Defendants G6 Hospitality Franchising LLC, G6 Hospitality IP LLC,G6 Hospitality LLC, G6 Hospitality Property LLC, G6 Hospitality Purchasing LLC, and for Motel 6 Inc Operating LP, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (HH)
Related: [-]
102 102 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/08 10:35 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kathleen (Kate) Wallace FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants G6 Hospitality LLC, G6 Hospitality IP LLC, G6 Hospitality Property LLC, G6 Hospitality Purchasing LLC, G6 Hospitality Franchising LLC, Motel 6 Inc Operating LP (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8919613 (Hunter, Ramona)
Related: [-]
101 101 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/08 10:31 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Emily Akins FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants G6 Hospitality LLC, G6 Hospitality IP LLC, G6 Hospitality Property LLC, G6 Hospitality Purchasing LLC, G6 Hospitality Franchising LLC, Motel 6 Inc Operating LP (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8919597 (Hunter, Ramona)
Related: [-]