Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Eddward P Ballinger Jr
Case #: 2:24-bk-02408
Case Filed:Mar 30, 2024

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
The Grid at Mesa, LLC, Debtor
May Potenza Baran & Gillespie PC 1850 N. Central Avenue, Ste 1600
Phoenix, AZ 85004
Represented By
GRANT L. CARTWRIGHT
May, Potenza, Baran & Gillespie, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE 230 NORTH FIRST AVENUE SUITE 204
PHOENIX, AZ 85003


Docket last updated: 54 minutes ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
290 290 other Certificate of Service Fri 05/02 4:51 PM
Certificate of Service filed by BRADLEY A COSMAN of Perkins Coie on behalf of KEITH BIERMAN. Related [+] (COSMAN, BRADLEY)
Related: [-] 284 Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee Application for Compensation,285 Notice of Bar Date,286 Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee,288 Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee,289 Notice of Bar Date
Monday, April 28, 2025
289 289 notice Bar Date (negative notice) (Notice of) Mon 04/28 2:07 PM
Notice of Bar Date / Notice of Filing Second Interim Fee Application of Perkins Coie LLP for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by BRADLEY A COSMAN of Perkins Coie on behalf of KEITH BIERMAN Related [+].(COSMAN, BRADLEY)
Related: [-] 288 Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee
288 288 motion Compensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee (Application for) Mon 04/28 2:04 PM
Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Trustee / Second Interim Fee Application of Perkins Coie LLP for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for KEITH BIERMAN, Trustee Chapter 11, Period: 11/1/2024 to 3/31/2025, Fees:$196,993.40, Expenses: $0.00. filed by KEITH BIERMAN. (COSMAN, BRADLEY)
Related: [-]
287 287 notice Bar Date (negative notice) (Notice of) Mon 04/28 1:59 PM
Notice of Bar Date / Notice of Filing Second Interim Fee Application of MCA Financial Group, Ltd. for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by BRADLEY A COSMAN of Perkins Coie on behalf of KEITH BIERMAN Related [+].(COSMAN, BRADLEY)
Related: [-] 286 Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee
286 286 motion Compensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee (Application for) Mon 04/28 1:53 PM
Application for Compensation by Professional Employed by Trustee / Second Interim Fee Application of MCA Financial Group, Ltd. for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for KEITH BIERMAN, Trustee Chapter 11, Period: 12/1/2024 to 3/31/2025, Fees:$85,676.00, Expenses: $732.23. filed by KEITH BIERMAN. (COSMAN, BRADLEY)
Related: [-]
285 285 notice Bar Date (negative notice) (Notice of) Mon 04/28 1:40 PM
Notice of Bar Date / Notice of Filing First Interim Fee Application for Compensation of Chapter 11 Trustee filed by BRADLEY A COSMAN of Perkins Coie on behalf of KEITH BIERMAN Related [+].(COSMAN, BRADLEY)
Related: [-] 284 Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee Application for Compensation
284 284 motion Trustee Application for Compensation (Chapter 7 or 11) Mon 04/28 1:32 PM
Trustee Application for Compensation / First Interim Fee Application for Compensation of Chapter 11 Trustee for KEITH BIERMAN, Trustee Chapter 11, Period: 7/23/2024 to 3/31/2025, Fees:$53,922.00, Expenses: $0.00. filed by KEITH BIERMAN.(COSMAN, BRADLEY)
Related: [-]