New York Southern District Court
Judge:John G Koeltl
Case #: 1:24-cv-02432
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125la Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2024
Terminated:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Sep 28, 2024 7:39 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
The Arena Group Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Juannell Riley
Harris St. Laurent & Wechsler LLP
contact info
Megan Elizabeth Dubatowka
Harris St. Laurent & Wechsler LLP
contact info
Joshua Ron Bressler
Bressler Law PLLC
contact info
Yonaton Aronoff
Harris St. Laurent & Wechsler LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
ABG Intermediate Holdings 2 LLC
Represented By
Dennis Brandon Trice
Kaplan Martin LLP
contact info
Roberta Ann Kaplan
Kaplan Martin LLP
contact info
Timothy Sun Martin
Kaplan Martin LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
ABG-SI LLC
Represented By
Dennis Brandon Trice
Kaplan Martin LLP
contact info
Roberta Ann Kaplan
Kaplan Martin LLP
contact info
Timothy Sun Martin
Kaplan Martin LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Authentic Brands Group, LLC
2711 Centerville Road, Suite 400
Wilmington, DE 19808
Represented By
Dennis Brandon Trice
Kaplan Martin LLP
contact info
Roberta Ann Kaplan
Kaplan Martin LLP
contact info
Timothy Sun Martin
Kaplan Martin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Manoj Bhargava
Represented By
Lauren Walas
Kienbaum Hardy Viviano Pelton & Forrest, P.L.C.
contact info
Joseph E. Viviano
Kienbaum Hardy Viviano Pelton & Forrest, P.L.C.
contact info
David Porter
Kienbaum Hardy Viviano Pelton & Forrest, P.L.C.
contact info
Eric J Pelton
Kienbaum Opperwall Hardy & Pelton, P.L.C
contact info
Joshua Ron Bressler
Bressler Law PLLC
contact info
Defendant
The Arena Group Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Juannell Riley
Harris St. Laurent & Wechsler LLP
contact info
Megan Elizabeth Dubatowka
Harris St. Laurent & Wechsler LLP
contact info
Joshua Ron Bressler
Bressler Law PLLC
contact info
Yonaton Aronoff
Harris St. Laurent & Wechsler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ABG Intermediate Holdings 2 LLC
Represented By
Maximilian Crema
Kaplan Martin LLP
contact info
Dennis Brandon Trice
Kaplan Martin LLP
contact info
Roberta Ann Kaplan
Kaplan Martin LLP
contact info
Timothy Sun Martin
Kaplan Martin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ABG-SI LLC
Represented By
Maximilian Crema
Kaplan Martin LLP
contact info
Dennis Brandon Trice
Kaplan Martin LLP
contact info
Roberta Ann Kaplan
Kaplan Martin LLP
contact info
Timothy Sun Martin
Kaplan Martin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Authentic Brands Group, LLC
Represented By
Maximilian Crema
Kaplan Martin LLP
contact info
Dennis Brandon Trice
Kaplan Martin LLP
contact info
Roberta Ann Kaplan
Kaplan Martin LLP
contact info
Timothy Sun Martin
Kaplan Martin LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Sportority Inc., d/b/a Minute Media
Represented By
Peter Duffy Doyle
Proskauer Rose Llp (nyc)
contact info
Timothy Burroughs
Proskauer Rose
contact info
Adam Judd Farbiarz
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
The Arena Group Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Juannell Riley
Harris St. Laurent & Wechsler LLP
contact info
Megan Elizabeth Dubatowka
Harris St. Laurent & Wechsler LLP
contact info
Joshua Ron Bressler
Bressler Law PLLC
contact info
Yonaton Aronoff
Harris St. Laurent & Wechsler LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
ThirdParty Defendant
Minute Media, Inc.
Terminated: 08/05/2024


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
109 109 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 04/30 2:12 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) AND (c)(2): IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties and their respective counsel, that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with Prejudice, against Defendants The Arena Group Holdings, Inc. and Manoj Bhargava, Counter Defendants Authentic Brands Group, LLC, ABG-SI LLC, and ABG Intermediate Holdings 2 LLC, and Third-Party Defendant Sportority Inc., d/b/a Minute Media, and previously dismissed Third-Party Defendant Minute Media Inc., pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii) and (c)(2). The Clerk is directed to dismiss all claims without prejudice. The Clerk is also directed to close this case. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/30/2025) ABG Intermediate Holdings 2 LLC, ABG-SI LLC, ABG-SI LLC, ABG-SI LLC, Authentic Brands Group, LLC, Authentic Brands Group, LLC, Authentic Brands Group, LLC, Authentic Brands Group, LLC, Manoj Bhargava, Sportority Inc., d/b/a Minute Media, Sportority Inc., d/b/a Minute Media, The Arena Group Holdings, Inc., ABG Intermediate Holdings 2 LLC and ABG Intermediate Holdings 2 LLC terminated. (ks)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal Wed 04/30 8:50 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 108 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge John G. Koeltl for approval for the following reason(s): the stipulation of dismissal is also pursuant to (c)(2). (tp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
108 108 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 04/29 9:14 AM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) The Arena Group Holdings, Inc., Manoj Bhargava pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by The Arena Group Holdings, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Dubatowka, Megan)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Tue 04/29 8:45 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Megan Dubatowka. RE-FILE Document No. 107 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were selected (Select Defendants Only). Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned signature image) PDF. (tp)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
107 107 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 04/28 10:32 AM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) The Arena Group Holdings, Inc., ABG Intermediate Holdings 2 LLC, ABG-SI LLC, Authentic Brands Group, LLC, Authentic Brands Group, LLC, Manoj Bhargava, Minute Media, Inc., Sportority Inc., d/b/a Minute Media pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by The Arena Group Holdings, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Dubatowka, Megan)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Mon 04/28 9:26 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Megan Dubatowka. RE-FILE Document No. 106 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): individual parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against were not selected; the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not signed (ink/wet signatures) by all parties who have appeared. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned signature image) PDF. (nd)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 27, 2025
106 106 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Sun 04/27 9:57 AM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Parties and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by The Arena Group Holdings, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Dubatowka, Megan)
Related: [-]