California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher M Klein
Case #: 2:24-bk-21326
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
The Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento
2110 Broadway
Sacramento,, CA 95818
Represented By
Paul J. Pascuzzi
contact info
Jason E. Rios
contact info
Ori Katz
contact info
Last checked: Thursday Jun 06, 2024 7:35 PM PDT
Creditor
John Doe P.R.D.
Boucher LLP 21600 Oxnard St #600
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Represented By
Raymond P. Boucher
Boucher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Jesuit High School of Sacramento
1 Natoma St
Folsom, CA 95630
Represented By
James R. Donahue
James R Donahue Law Corporation
contact info
Creditor
John Doe B.C.R.
Boucher LLP 21600 Oxnard St #600
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Represented By
Raymond P. Boucher
Boucher LLP
contact info
Creditor
John Doe D.J.S.
Boucher LLP 21600 Oxnard St #600
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Represented By
Raymond P. Boucher
Boucher LLP
contact info
Creditor
John Doe E.D.G.
Boucher LLP 21600 Oxnard St #600
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Represented By
Raymond P. Boucher
Boucher LLP
contact info
Creditor
John Doe E.L.B.
Boucher LLP 21600 Oxnard St #600
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Represented By
Raymond P. Boucher
Boucher LLP
contact info
Creditor
John Doe G.B.M.
Boucher LLP 21600 Oxnard St #600
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Represented By
Raymond P. Boucher
Boucher LLP
contact info
Creditor
John Doe J.B.
Boucher LLP 21600 Oxnard St #600
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Represented By
Raymond P. Boucher
Boucher LLP
contact info
Creditor
John Doe J.C.A.
Boucher LLP 21600 Oxnard St #600
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Represented By
Raymond P. Boucher
Boucher LLP
contact info
Creditor
John Doe J.H.
Boucher LLP 21600 Oxnard St #600
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Represented By
Raymond P. Boucher
Boucher LLP
contact info
Creditor
John Doe J.P.M.
Boucher LLP 21600 Oxnard St #600
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Represented By
Raymond P. Boucher
Boucher LLP
contact info
Creditor
John Doe K.E.K.
Boucher LLP 21600 Oxnard St #600
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Represented By
Raymond P. Boucher
Boucher LLP
contact info
Creditor
John Doe L.F.R.
Boucher LLP 21600 Oxnard St #600
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Represented By
Raymond P. Boucher
Boucher LLP
contact info
Creditor
John Doe M.P.O.
Boucher LLP 21600 Oxnard St #600
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Represented By
Raymond P. Boucher
Boucher LLP
contact info
Creditor
John Doe M.W.M.
Boucher LLP 21600 Oxnard St #600
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Represented By
Raymond P. Boucher
Boucher LLP
contact info
Creditor
John Doe N.P.S.
Boucher LLP 21600 Oxnard St #600
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Represented By
Raymond P. Boucher
Boucher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Jesuit Community of Sacramento
Michael Tyrell 1200 Jacob Ln
Carmichael, CA 95608
Creditor
John Doe R.C.J.
Boucher LLP 21600 Oxnard St #600
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Represented By
Raymond P. Boucher
Boucher LLP
contact info
Creditor
John Doe R.G.T.
Boucher LLP 21600 Oxnard St #600
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Represented By
Raymond P. Boucher
Boucher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Redding Christian School
Melissa Foster 21945 Old 44 Dr
Palo Cedro, CA 96073
Creditor
Placer County Tax Collector
Laura Heckman 2976 Richardson Dr
Auburn, CA 95603
Creditor
Pfau Cochran Vertetis Amala PLLC
Mariah E. Ogden 701 5th Ave #4300
Seattle, WA 98104
Creditor
Pastor of St. Paul Catholic Church
Fr. Joyle Martinez 8720 Florin Rd
Sacramento, CA 95828
Creditor
Missionary Fraternity of Mary
1138 S 25th St
Milwaukee, WI 53204
Creditor
Mount Angel Seminary
Stephen English Perkins Coie LLP 1120 NW Couch St 10th Fl
Portland, OR 97209
Creditor
National Surety Corporation
Represented By
Harris B. Winsberg
Parker, Hudson, Rainer, And Dobbs LLP
contact info
Matthew G. Roberts
Parker, Hudson, Rainer, And Dobbs LLP
contact info
Brian C. Aton
Parker, Hudson, Rainer & Dobbs LLP
contact info
Todd C. Jacobs
Parker, Hudson, Rainer, And Dobbs LLP
contact info
John E. Bucheit
Parker, Hudson, Rainer, And Dobbs LLP
contact info
R. David Gallo
Parker, Hudson, Rainer, And Dobbs LLP
contact info
Matthew Michael Weiss
Parker, Hudson, Rainer, And Dobbs LLP
contact info
Matthew Clark Lovell
Nicolaides Fink Thorpe Michaelides Sulli
contact info
Laura Hamilton Smith
Nicolaides Fink Thorpe, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Manuel Nazzal
605 Market St #1103
San Francisco, CA 94105
Represented By
Sophia Achermann
contact info
Creditor
Pastor of St. Ignatius Loyola Parish Sacramento, a Corporation Sole
Thomas M. Lucas, Pastor 3235 Arden Way
Sacramento, CA 95825
Creditor
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Keller Benvenutti Kim LLP 425 Market St 26th Fl
San Francisco, CA 94105
Represented By
Luke Laursen Sperduto
Stinson LLP
contact info
Gabrielle Albert
Keller Benvenutti Kim LLP
contact info
Robert T. Kugler
Stinson LLP
contact info
Clarissa C. Brady
Stinson LLP
contact info
Tobias S. Keller
Keller Benvenutti Kim LLP
contact info
Andrew Glasnovich
Stinson LLP
contact info
Edwin H. Caldie
Stinson LLP
contact info
Samantha Hanson-Lenn
Stinson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Pastor of St. Anthony
660 Florin Rd
Sacramento, CA 95831
Creditor
Our Lady of the Redwoods
PO Box 115
Garberville, CA 95542
Creditor
Pastor of Our Lady of Lourdes Parish
745 Ware Ave
Colusa, CA 95932
Creditor
Credit Counseling
1608 E Day Rd
Mishawaka, IN 46545
Creditor
Treasurer-Tax Collector
PO Box 678002
Placerville, CA 95667
Creditor
Thermalito Water-Sewer District
Jayme Boucher 410 Grand Ave
Oroville, CA 95965
Creditor
The Parochial Fund, Inc.
Robert M. Charles, Jr. One South Church Ave #2000
Tucson, AZ 85701
Represented By
Robert M Charles, Jr
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP
contact info
John C. Gray
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP
contact info
Robert M. Charles, Jr.
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP
contact info
Creditor
The Catholic Mutual Relief Society of America
Christopher K.S. Wong ARENTFOX SCHIFF LLP 44 Montgomery St 38th Fl
San Francisco, CA 94104
Represented By
Aram Ordubegian
contact info
Christopher K.S. Wong
Arentfox Schiff LLP
contact info
Daniel J. Schufreider
contact info
Joseph Mark Fisher
Arentfox Schiff LLP
contact info
Everett J. Cygal
contact info
Creditor
Parishes of the Roman Catholic Diocese of Sacramento
Wilke Fleury LLP 621 Capitol Mall 9th Fl
Sacramento, CA 95814
Represented By
Daniel L. Egan
contact info
Steven J. Williamson
contact info
Creditor
St. Patrick-St. Vincent Catholic High School of the Diocese of Sacramento
Boutin Jones Inc. 555 Capitol Mall #1500
Sacramento, CA 95814
Represented By
Thomas G. Mouzes
contact info
Creditor
Fiore Achermann
605 Market St #1103
San Francisco, CA 94105
Represented By
Sophia Achermann
contact info
Creditor
Chris Alling
1200 Jacob Ln
Carmichael, CA 95608
Creditor
Arch Insurance Group Inc.
Francine Petrocino 210 Hudson St #300
Jersey City, NJ 07311
Creditor
The Catholic Foundation, Inc.
Robert M. Charles, Jr. One South Church Ave #2000
Tucson, AZ 85701
Represented By
Robert M Charles, Jr
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP
contact info
John C. Gray
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP
contact info
Robert M. Charles, Jr.
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP
contact info
Creditor
Catholic Funeral & Cemetery Services, Inc.
Robert M. Charles, Jr. One South Church Ave #2000
Tucson, AZ 85701
Represented By
Robert M Charles, Jr
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP
contact info
John C. Gray
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP
contact info
Robert M. Charles, Jr.
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP
contact info
Creditor
Tehama County Tax Collector
Lorrie Brown PO Box 769
Red Bluff, CA 96080
Creditor
St. Patrick Fund for Children, Inc.
Robert M. Charles, Jr. One South Church Ave #2000
Tucson, AZ 85701
Represented By
Robert M Charles, Jr
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP
contact info
John C. Gray
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP
contact info
Robert M. Charles, Jr.
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP
contact info
Creditor
Young J. Choi
2001 4th Ave
Sacramento, CA 95818
Creditor
City of Sacramento
Kathy Crooks Revenue Division 915 I St #1201
Sacramento, CA 95814
Creditor
DFS Flooring, LP
15651 Saticoy St
Van Nuys, CA 91406
Creditor
Ann Darling
605 Market St #1103
San Francisco, CA 94105
Represented By
Sophia Achermann
contact info
Creditor
St. Joseph Parish Corporation Sole
130 S 4th St
Rio Vista, CA 94571
Creditor
St. Francis Catholic High School of the Diocese of Sacramento, Inc.
Downey Brand LLP 621 Capitol Mall 18th Fl
Sacramento, CA 95814
Represented By
Jamie P. Dreher
contact info
Creditor
St Patrick St Vincent Catholic High School
Tom Mouzes 555 Capitol Mall #1500
Sacramento, CA 95814
Creditor
Christopher Smith
605 Market St #1103
San Francisco, CA 94105
Represented By
Sophia Achermann
contact info
Creditor
David Hill
555 Montgomery St #820
San Francisco, CA 94111
Creditor
Holy Trinity School
3115 Tierra de Dios Dr
El Dorado Hills, CA 95762
Creditor
Interstate Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By
Harris B. Winsberg
Parker, Hudson, Rainer, And Dobbs LLP
contact info
Matthew G. Roberts
Parker, Hudson, Rainer, And Dobbs LLP
contact info
Brian C. Aton
Parker, Hudson, Rainer & Dobbs LLP
contact info
Todd C. Jacobs
Parker, Hudson, Rainer, And Dobbs LLP
contact info
John E. Bucheit
Parker, Hudson, Rainer, And Dobbs LLP
contact info
R. David Gallo
Parker, Hudson, Rainer, And Dobbs LLP
contact info
Matthew Michael Weiss
Parker, Hudson, Rainer, And Dobbs LLP
contact info
Matthew Clark Lovell
Nicolaides Fink Thorpe Michaelides Sulli
contact info
Laura Hamilton Smith
Nicolaides Fink Thorpe, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Jane Doe B.N.W.
Boucher LLP 21600 Oxnard St #600
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Represented By
Raymond P. Boucher
Boucher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Jane Doe E.D.
Boucher LLP 21600 Oxnard St #600
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Represented By
Raymond P. Boucher
Boucher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Jane Doe K.L.M.
Boucher LLP 21600 Oxnard St #600
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Represented By
Raymond P. Boucher
Boucher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Jane Doe M.A.G.
Boucher LLP 21600 Oxnard St #600
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Represented By
Raymond P. Boucher
Boucher LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
Joseph Wiebelhaus
Creditor Committee
Christopher Smith
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Edwin H. Caldie 50 S 6th St #2600
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
Robert T. Kugler
Stinson LLP
contact info
Clarissa C. Brady
Stinson LLP
contact info
Andrew Glasnovich
Stinson LLP
contact info
Edwin H. Caldie
Stinson LLP
contact info
Samantha Hanson-Lenn
Stinson LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
Eleanor McCampbell
Creditor Committee
Kevin Kelley
Creditor Committee
Jacob Keck
Creditor Committee
Khadija Golden
Creditor Committee
Craig Carroll
Creditor Committee
Patrick Flynn
Creditor Committee
Iris Delgado
Interested Party
Sacramento Food Bank and Family Services
Gregory C. Nuti 6232 La Salle Ave #D
Oakland, CA 94611
Represented By
Gregory C. Nuti
contact info
Interested Party
The Roman Catholic Bishop of Fresno
Hagop T. Bedoyan 7647 North Fresno St
Fresno, CA 93720
Represented By
Hagop T. Bedoyan
contact info
Interested Party
Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Clyde & Co US LLP 30 S Wacker Blvd #2600
Chicago, IL 60606
Represented By
Timothy W. Evanston
contact info
Jeff D. Kahane
contact info
Robert Sweeney
Clyde & Co Us LLP
contact info
Betty Luu
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Russell Webb Roten
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Catalina J. Sugayan
Clyde & Co Us LLP
contact info
Yongli Yang
Clyde & Co Us LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Certain London Market Insurance Companies
Clyde & Co US LLP 30 S Wacker Blvd #2600
Chicago, IL 60606
Represented By
Timothy W. Evanston
contact info
Jeff D. Kahane
contact info
Robert Sweeney
Clyde & Co Us LLP
contact info
Betty Luu
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Russell Webb Roten
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Catalina J. Sugayan
Clyde & Co Us LLP
contact info
Yongli Yang
Clyde & Co Us LLP
contact info
Other Professional
GlassRatner Advisory & Capital Group, LLC
Other Professional
Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc
Donlin Recano and Company 48 Wall Street, 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10005
Other Professional
Weinstein & Numbers, LLP
Special Counsel
Stephen J. Greene
Represented By
Stephen J. Greene, Jr.
Greene & Roberts LLP
contact info
Special Counsel
Thomas A. Johnson
Represented By
Thomas A. Johnson
contact info
Stockholder
None
U.S. Trustee
Tracy Hope Davis
501 I St #7-500
Sacramento, CA 95814
Represented By
Jared A. Day
contact info
Jason M. Blumberg
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
Robert T Matsui United States Courthouse 501 I Street, Room 7-500
Sacramento, CA 95814

GPO Jul 01 2024
Memorandum Re: 366 Stipulated Protective Order [FWP-26] (ltas)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
1284 1284 misc Document - Including Amended Wed 04/30 3:22 PM
Limited Service List (as of April 30, 2025) [FWP-6] Filed by Debtor The Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento (mgrs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
1283 1283 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 04/29 1:26 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of1281 Notice [FWP-18] (mgrs)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
1282 1282 misc Copy of Complaint/Notice of Removal Tue 04/29 1:15 PM
Adversary Case 25-2054 (72 (Injunctive relief - other)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)) : Complaint 25-02054 by The Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento against John S-4 Doe, John Doe SAC 1507, R.R., J.R., John Doe D.J.S., A.D., Jane Roe 265, Jane Roe 385, John Roe 413, John Roe 414, John Doe N.P.S., Joseph Doe S 512, John Doe SAC 1915, Jane Doe SAC 1429, John Doe CLG03308, Jane Doe LL, John JW Roe SAC, John Doe MD, M.T., John Doe 165, John Doe 140, M.O., John Doe 1615, John Roe 550, John Doe CLG03350, Jennifer Doe S 525, John Doe J.B., LL John Doe JT, John Roe 587, John Doe CLG03492, John Doe SAC 1924, John Doe SAC 1276, John Doe 464, R.A., Jennifer Doe S 509, John Doe SAC 1180, John Roe 627, Joseph Doe S 524, John Doe SAC 1523, Jane Doe 868, John Roe 481, Jane Doe SF 1883, Jane Doe K.L.M., LL John Doe MW, A.A. Roe 1, John Doe 166, John Doe SAC 1221, LL Jane Doe JEP, J.R.T., Jennifer Doe S 528, LL John Doe UM, J.E., Jane S-7 Doe, G.H., Jane Doe 1733, John Doe 45, John Doe SAC 1127, Joseph Doe S 517, John Roe 314, Jane Roe 657, John Doe 104, John Doe 137, John Roe 214, John Roe 469, Joseph Doe S 519, Joseph Doe S 520, Joseph Doe S 602, Joseph Doe S 584, Joseph Doe S 522, John Doe SAC 1988, John Doe D.H., John Doe SAC 2068, Joseph Doe S 604, Jennifer Doe S 606, Joseph Doe S 502, Joseph Doe S 503, Joseph Doe S 504, Jane TP Roe SF, John Doe SAC 2049, John SAC-1 Doe, Jane Doe 564, Jane Roe 333, John Doe SAC 1208, John Doe 572, John Doe (RD), Jane Doe SAC 2056, Jennifer Doe S 600, John S-10 Doe, Jane MH Roe SAC, Jane Doe 549, John S-5 Doe, Jane Doe SAC 1177, John S-3 Doe, Jane Doe E.D., John JR Roe, Joseph Doe S 506, Joseph Doe S 507, John Doe P.R.D., John Doe SAC 1506, John Doe SAC 2088, Jane Doe (J.W.), Jane Doe SAC 1204, Jane Doe SAC 1432, Jane Roe 443, C.P., G.B., John Doe 1737, John Roe 303, John Doe SAC 1935, John Doe SAC 1554, LL John Doe TDR, G.D., John Doe 102, Joseph Doe S 515, John Doe SAC 1531, Jane Doe 577, John Doe G.B.M., John Roe 625, John Doe SAC 1911, John Doe SAC 2060, John M.F. Doe, Joseph Doe S 501, John SAC-2 Doe, Samantha Doe SA4, John Roe 560, John Doe SAC 1926, John Doe SAC 1124, Jane Doe SAC 1876, M.M., M.L., John Doe SAC 2092, John Doe 42, John Doe 174, John Doe (MN), John Roe 278, John Roe 216, Jennifer Doe S 526, Jane Doe SAC 1519, Jane Doe SAC 1193, John S-17 Doe, Jane Roe 1590, Jane S-13 Doe, S.C., John Roe 129, John Roe 282, Jane Roe 684, C.C., John Doe SAC 1973, N.J., John Roe 651, Jane Doe SAC 1637, John Doe SAC 1980, John Doe E.D.G., Jane Doe SAC 1884, John Doe 534, John Doe M.W.M., John Doe M.P.O., John Doe SAC 1545, M.W., John ST Roe SAC, Jane Doe SAC 2076, Jane Roe 209, Joseph Doe S 513, Jane Doe SAC 1185, Jane Doe 420, Jennifer Doe S 529, John Doe 521, T.C., John JD Roe SAC, John Doe 2741, Jane Roe 574, Jane Roe 675, John Roe 687, Jane Roe 671, John Doe J.H., LL John Doe TWGA, Jane Doe 639, Jane HK Roe, Jane S-11 Doe, John Doe 562, John Doe B.C.R., John Doe 2731, Jane Roe 298, John Doe SAC 1920, John Doe 542, John S-16 Doe, John Doe K.E.K., John Doe SAC 1421, John Doe SAC 1286, John Doe SF 1886, John Doe CLG03442, John S-14 Doe, John Roe 669, Jane Doe M.A.G., Jane Doe SAC 1891, John Doe E.L.B., Joseph Doe S 508, John Doe 568, John Doe J.P.M., John Doe L.F.R., Jane Doe B.N.W., Joseph Doe S 605, John Doe GR, Jane Roe 583, John Doe J.C.A., Joseph Doe S 516, Joseph Doe S 518, John Doe R.C.J., Jane Roe 670, John Doe DM, John Doe LL, John MF Roe SAC, Jennifer Doe SCW, T.T., Jennifer Doe S 523, Jennifer Doe S 597, Jennifer Doe S 598, Jane Doe, John JT Roe SAC, John Roe 497, John Roe 178, John Roe 217, John Roe 694, John Doe CLG03476, John Doe R.G.T., John Doe SAC 2050, John Doe SAC 2029, Jane Doe 744, John Doe P.F.. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7484921) (mgrs) (mgrs)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
1281 1281 notice Generic Notice Fri 04/25 2:18 PM
Notice of Filing of Fourth Quarterly Statement of Amounts Paid to Ordinary Course Professionals [FWP-18] (msts)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
1280 1280 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 04/23 9:59 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of1225 Motion/Application for Compensation [LLJ-4] for Lori Lapin Jone, Examiner(s),1226 Notice of Hearing,1227 Declaration,1228 Exhibit(s) (mgrs)
Related: [-]