Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 0:23-bk-11046

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 15
Judge:Peter D Russin
Case #: 0:24-ap-01206
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 30, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Perla Leon
1153 ELAINE CT
Flossmoor, IL 60422
Represented By
Perla Leon
contact info
Plaintiff
Chavonnes Badenhorst St Clair Cooper
1111 Brickell Avenue Suite 1250
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Gregory S Grossman, Esq
Sequor Law PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Thursday, January 23, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Deposition Thu 01/23 10:53 AM
Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum of Dr. Gary Tennant on February 10, 2025 at 10:00am Filed by Plaintiff Chavonnes Badenhorst St Clair Cooper. (Grossman, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 29, 2024
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Sat 06/29 11:45 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Chavonnes Badenhorst St Clair Cooper Related [+]. (Gonzalez, Maria)
Related: [-] 6 Order Continuing Status/Scheduling Conference,8 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Chavonnes Badenhorst St Clair Cooper
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Sat 06/29 10:54 AM
Amended Complaint by Chavonnes Badenhorst St Clair Cooper against Perla Leon. Complaint Amended to address allegations. Related [+]. (Grossman, Gregory)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 24-01206 Complaint by Chavonnes Badenhorst St Clair Cooper against Perla Leon. Nature of Suit:,(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Chavonnes Badenhorst St Clair Cooper
Thursday, June 13, 2024
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 06/14 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 06/13/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order Continuing Scheduling Conference (Re: 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Chavonnes Badenhorst St Clair Cooper). Scheduling Conference to be held on 08/28/2024 at 10:00 AM U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Courtroom 301 (PDR), Fort Lauderdale, FL. (Graster-Thomas, Tanesha)
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
6 6 3 pgs order Order Continuing Status/Scheduling Conference Tue 06/11 8:33 AM
Order Continuing Scheduling Conference Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 08/28/2024 at 10:00 AM U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Courtroom 301 (PDR), Fort Lauderdale, FL. (Graster-Thomas, Tanesha)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Chavonnes Badenhorst St Clair Cooper
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Filing Tue 05/14 5:28 PM
Notice of Filing and Certificate of Service , Filed by Plaintiff Chavonnes Badenhorst St Clair Cooper. (Grossman, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
4 4 3 pgs cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 04/05 2:08 PM
Summons Service Executed on Perla Leon 4/3/2024 Filed by Plaintiff Chavonnes Badenhorst St Clair Cooper, Defendant Perla Leon. (Grossman, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Mon 04/01 9:38 AM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 06/12/2024 at 01:30 PM U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Courtroom 301 (PDR), Fort Lauderdale, FL. (Cifuentes Esteban, Zoila)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Chavonnes Badenhorst St Clair Cooper
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Mon 04/01 9:34 AM
Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Perla Leon Answer Due 5/1/2024 (Cifuentes Esteban, Zoila)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 30, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Sat 03/30 4:06 PM
Adversary case 24-01206 Complaint by Chavonnes Badenhorst St Clair Cooper against Perla Leon. Nature of Suit:,(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Grossman, Gregory)
Related: [-]