Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-00214

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Donald R Cassling
Case #: 1:24-ap-00079
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2024
Terminated:Jun 04, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Keith Levison
Represented By
Keith Levison
contact info
Plaintiff
The Illinois Department Of Employment Security
Represented By
Andrew Dryjanski
Illinois Attorney General
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
10 10 court Close Adversary Case Tue 06/04 2:40 PM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-79 Closed . (Collins-Mong, Tara)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Default Tue 06/04 2:37 PM
Order Granting Motion for Entry of Default Related [+], Granting Motion For Default Judgment. Signed on 6/4/2024. (Collins-Mong, Tara)
Related: [-] 6 6
8 8 court Hearing Concluded (Other) Tue 06/04 11:22 AM
Status Hearing Concluded Related [+]. (Rodriguez, Shanda)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, May 16, 2024
7 7 misc Proposed Order Thu 05/16 9:58 AM
Proposed Order - Order of Default and Default Judgment Filed by Andrew Dryjanski on behalf of The Illinois Department Of Employment Security Related [+]. (Dryjanski, Andrew)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Entry of Default, Motion for Default Judgment
6 6 motion Default Thu 05/16 9:25 AM
Notice of Motion and Motion for Entry of Default, Notice of Motion and Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Andrew Dryjanski on behalf of The Illinois Department Of Employment Security. Hearing scheduled for 6/4/2024 at 10:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 619, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Cassling. (Dryjanski, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 ExhibitA
Att: 2 ExhibitB
Att: 3 ExhibitC
Att: 4 ExhibitD
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
5 5 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Tue 05/14 11:26 AM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 06/04/2024 at 10:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 619, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Cassling, , , . (Rodriguez, Shanda)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, April 01, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 04/01 10:27 AM
Summons Service Executed on Keith Levison Related [+]. (Dryjanski, Andrew)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
3 3 crditcrd none Mon 04/01 10:05 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 24-00079 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47713726. Fee Amount $ 350.00 (Dryjanski, Andrew) Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 04/01 9:52 AM
Summons Issued on Keith Levison Answer Due 05/1/2024 (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/01 9:52 AM
Adversary case 24-00079 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)): Complaint by The Illinois Department Of Employment Security against Keith Levison. Fee Amount $350. Status hearing to be held on 5/14/2024 at 10:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 619, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Cassling. (Dryjanski, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 ExhibitA
Att: 2 ExhibitB
Att: 3 ExhibitC
Att: 4 ExhibitD