Iowa Northern District Court
Judge:Leonard T Strand
Case #: 2:24-cv-01010
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 28, 2024 6:32 AM CDT
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions Inc
Represented By
Christina J Blackford Lesko
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
contact info
Defendant
Trans Union LLC
Represented By
Emily M Stultz
Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett Moser
contact info
Patrick L Sealey
Heidman Law Firm
contact info
Ian Fuqua, I
Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett Moser
contact info
Plaintiff
Brooklyn Nading
Represented By
Nicole Hughes
Telpner Peterson Law Firm LLP
contact info
Thomas J Lyons, Jr
Consumer Justice Center PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
56 56 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines Thu 04/24 3:19 PM
ORDER granting55 Motion for Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines. Discovery due by 5/20/2025. Motions due by 6/20/2025. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 4/24/2025. (mmc)
Related: [-]
55 55 motion Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines Thu 04/24 2:25 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time Discovery and Pre-Trial Deadlines by Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Lesko, Christina) . (mmc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
54 54 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/23 6:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Angela M Taylor on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Taylor, Angela)
Related: [-]