Evangeline Masonic Club Holding Corporation
Louisiana Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | John W Kolwe |
Case #: | 4:24-bk-50256 |
Case Filed: | Apr 01, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Evangeline Masonic Club Holding Corporation
PO Box 62072
Lafayette, LA 70596-2072 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
DIP
|
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of U. S. Trustee
300 Fannin St., Suite 3196
Shreveport, LA 71101 |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:02 PM CDT |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
trustee
First Meeting of Creditors Statement of Adjourning/Continuing
Thu 05/02 2:47 PM
Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors. All Parties Present. 341 Meeting Held April 24, 2024, continued to June 20, 2024 Meeting of Creditors Continued to 6/20/2024 at 02:00 PM at 341 Meeting - Telephone Conference, UST. Call: 866-762-6425, Passcode: 8530051#. (Haugen, Anna) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Hearing Notice Served. (Definite Hearing)
Wed 05/01 3:39 PM
Notice of Hearing (Served) on Re: (29 Miscellaneous Motion) with Certificate of Service . Hearing scheduled for 6/18/2024 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom Five, Lafayette. Filed by Anna Haugen on behalf of Office of U. S. Trustee (Haugen, Anna) |
|
Att: 1 matrix | ||
30 | 30
motion
Amended Motion
Wed 05/01 3:38 PM
First Amended Motion with Certificate of Service Filed by Gerald J. Casey on behalf of Habibi Shriners (Casey, Gerald) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit O-Excerpt Bylaws Habibi | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit P - Excerpt Bylaws Shriners Int. | ||
29 | 29
motion
Miscellaneous Motion (Generic)
Wed 05/01 3:37 PM
Motion for Determination of the Single Asset Real Estate Nature of this Case Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 101(51B) and Objection to Debtors Designation as a Small Business Debtor, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 1020(b) with Certificate of Service Filed by Anna Haugen on behalf of Office of U. S. Trustee (Haugen, Anna) |
|
Att: 1 matrix | ||
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 04/25 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . Notice Date 04/25/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
order
Employ
Tue 04/23 3:53 PM
Order Granting (ezra) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Hearing Notice, IF AND ONLY IF Objections Served
Mon 04/22 6:29 PM
Reserved Hearing (Served) , IF AND ONLY IF Objection, A Hearing Will Be Held, 06/04/2024, 02:30 PM, at Courtroom Five, Lafayette with Certificate of Service . Objections/Responses due by 5/9/2024. Filed by Gerald J. Casey on behalf of Habibi Shriners (Casey, Gerald) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit matrix | ||
25 | 25
9
pgs
misc
Memorandum
Mon 04/22 6:25 PM
Memorandum Filed by Gerald J. Casey on behalf of Habibi Shriners (Casey, Gerald) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Petition for Writ | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ruling of the Court | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Judgment | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Third Circuit Ruling | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Order | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Order | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Suspensive Appeal Bond | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Motion to Test Sufficiency | ||
24 | 24
motion
Relief from Stay (Fee)
Mon 04/22 6:21 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay with Certificate of Service . Fee Amount Due $199, Filed by Gerald J. Casey on behalf of Habibi Shriners (Casey, Gerald) |
|
23 | 23
notice
Hearing Notice Served. (Definite Hearing)
Mon 04/22 6:15 PM
Notice of Hearing (Served) on Re: (21 Motion to Dismiss Case) with Certificate of Service . Hearing scheduled for 6/4/2024 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom Five, Lafayette. Filed by Gerald J. Casey on behalf of Habibi Shriners (Casey, Gerald) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit matrix | ||
22 | 22
10
pgs
misc
Memorandum
Mon 04/22 6:12 PM
Memorandum Filed by Gerald J. Casey on behalf of Habibi Shriners (Casey, Gerald) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Petition for Writ | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Affidavit | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Corporate Records | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Memorandum | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Ruling of the Court | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Judgment | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Petition | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Motion for TRO | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit TRO | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Third Circuit Ruling | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Order | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Order Setting Deadline for Stay | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit Suspensive Appeal Bond | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit Motion to Test Sufficiency | ||
21 | 21
motion
Dismiss Case
Mon 04/22 5:17 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case with Certificate of Service Filed by Karly A. Kyzar, George A. Veazey, Gerald J. Casey on behalf of Habibi Shriners, David Hyatt, Thomas Kussmann, William K. Powell (Casey, Gerald) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Appearance and Request Notice
Mon 04/22 4:34 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice with Certificate of Service . Filed by Karly A. Kyzar on behalf of William K. Powell (Kyzar, Karly) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Appearance and Request Notice
Mon 04/22 4:32 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice with Certificate of Service . Filed by Karly A. Kyzar on behalf of Thomas Kussmann (Kyzar, Karly) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Appearance and Request Notice
Mon 04/22 4:29 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice with Certificate of Service . Filed by Karly A. Kyzar on behalf of David Hyatt (Kyzar, Karly) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Appearance and Request Notice
Mon 04/22 3:11 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice with Certificate of Service . Filed by George A. Veazey on behalf of Habibi Shriners (Veazey, George) |
|
crditcrd
Autodocket US Treasury Receipt
Mon 04/22 6:21 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Motion for Relief From Stay([LINK 24-50256 ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00) . Receipt Number A24384944, in the Amount of $ 199.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Periodic Report Concerning Related Entities
Wed 04/17 1:34 PM
Periodic Report Regarding Value, Operations and Profitability of Entities in Which the Estate Holds a Substantial or Controlling Interest,, Filed by Thomas E. St. Germain on behalf of Evangeline Masonic Club Holding Corporation (St. Germain, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to DIP
Thu 04/04 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to DIP. . Notice Date 04/04/2024. (Admin.) |
|
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors
Thu 04/04 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. . Notice Date 04/04/2024. (Admin.) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Appearance and Request Notice
Thu 04/04 2:26 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice . Filed by Anna Haugen on behalf of Office of U. S. Trustee (Haugen, Anna) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Appearance and Request Notice
Thu 04/04 12:43 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice with Certificate of Service . Filed by Gerald J. Casey on behalf of Habibi Shriners (Casey, Gerald) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
court
First Meeting of Creditors Set - Chapter 11
Tue 04/02 9:46 AM
Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be held on 4/24/2024 at 02:00 PM at 341 Meeting - Telephone Conference, UST. Call: 866-762-6425, Passcode: 8530051#. (ezra) |
|
10 | 10
3
pgs
order
Order to Debtor in Possession and Status Conference Option
Tue 04/02 8:57 AM
Order to Debtor in Possession and Setting Status Conference.Status Conference Hearing to be held on 8/13/2024 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom Five, Lafayette. Filed on 4/2/2024 (ezra) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
petdoc
Corporate Resolution
Mon 04/01 4:33 PM
Corporate Resolution Filed by Thomas E. St. Germain of Weinstein & St. Germain, LLC on behalf of Evangeline Masonic Club Holding Corporation (St. Germain, Thomas) |
|
8 | 8
petdoc
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
Mon 04/01 4:24 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Thomas E. St. Germain of Weinstein & St. Germain, LLC on behalf of Evangeline Masonic Club Holding Corporation (St. Germain, Thomas) |
|
7 | 7
3
pgs
motion
Employ
Mon 04/01 4:18 PM
Application to Employ Tom St. Germain as Attorney Filed by Thomas E. St. Germain on behalf of Evangeline Masonic Club Holding Corporation (St. Germain, Thomas) |
|
6 | 6
petdoc
Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN (Rule 1007)
Mon 04/01 4:17 PM
Declaration Re Electronic Filing and Statement of SSN Filed by Thomas E. St. Germain of Weinstein & St. Germain, LLC on behalf of Evangeline Masonic Club Holding Corporation (St. Germain, Thomas) |
|
5 | 5
petdoc
Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID
Mon 04/01 4:11 PM
Picture ID Copy, Filed by Thomas E. St. Germain of Weinstein & St. Germain, LLC on behalf of Evangeline Masonic Club Holding Corporation (St. Germain, Thomas) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Statement of Corporate Ownership
Mon 04/01 4:09 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed Filed by Thomas E. St. Germain on behalf of Evangeline Masonic Club Holding Corporation (St. Germain, Thomas) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Equity Security Holders
Mon 04/01 4:05 PM
Equity Security Holders Filed by Thomas E. St. Germain on behalf of Evangeline Masonic Club Holding Corporation (St. Germain, Thomas) |
|
2 | 2
petdoc
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
Mon 04/01 4:01 PM
List of Creditors who have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims against you and are Not Insiders for Non-Individual Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Thomas E. St. Germain of Weinstein & St. Germain, LLC on behalf of Evangeline Masonic Club Holding Corporation (St. Germain, Thomas) |
|
1 | 1
30+
pgs
petdoc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (Fee)
Mon 04/01 3:52 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual All Schedules, Statements and Disclosure of Compensation for Attorney. Fee Amount Due $1738 Filed by Thomas E. St. Germain of Weinstein & St. Germain, LLC on behalf of Evangeline Masonic Club Holding Corporation. Declaration of ECF Filing due by 04/3/2024. Disclosure Statement Chapter 11 Small Business due by 09/30/2024. Chapter 11 Small Business Plan due by 09/30/2024. (St. Germain, Thomas) |
|
crditcrd
Autodocket US Treasury Receipt
Mon 04/01 3:59 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition Chapter 11([LINK 24-50256 ) [petdoc,volp11a] (1738.00) . Receipt Number A24335862, in the Amount of $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |