Kentucky Eastern District Court
Judge:Candace J Smith
Referred: Candace J Smith
Case #: 2:24-cv-00046
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause29:2612 Family and Medical Leave Act
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 28, 2024 7:32 AM EDT
Defendant
Kenton County Airport Board
Represented By
N. Jeffrey Blankenship
Ziegler & Schneider, P.S.C.
contact info
Matthew C. Smith
Ziegler & Schneider, P.S.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Nahed Bays
Represented By
Diana Lyn Shaw
Finney Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Stephen E. Imm
Finney Law Firm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
29 29 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 05/16 3:33 PM
ORDER: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE set for 5/22/2025 at 10:30 AM in COVINGTON before Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 5/16/2025.(TDB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
28 28 misc Status Report Wed 05/14 2:07 PM
STATUS REPORT by Kenton County Airport Board. (Blankenship, N.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
27 27 notice Other Notice Fri 04/04 9:53 AM
NOTICE by Kenton County Airport Board Notice of Service (Blankenship, N.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
26 26 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Agreed Order Wed 04/02 3:36 PM
ORDER: The Court APPROVES and ACCEPTS the terms or conditions the parties have outlined in their proposed Agreed Protective Order25 . Therefore, it shall be incorporated by reference and shall be entered with modifications A - F contained in the Order therein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 4/2/2025. (WHP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
utility Motion Submitted Wed 03/26 9:15 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J Smith for review: re25 Proposed Agreed Order by Kenton County Airport Board (WHP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
25 25 motion Proposed Agreed Order Tue 03/25 4:44 PM
Proposed Agreed Order by Kenton County Airport Board. (Blankenship, N.)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
23 23 respoth Notice of Appearance Mon 03/24 10:05 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nahed Bays. (Isaacs, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
24 24 minutes Telephone Conference ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines 1 - Terminate Deadlines Order on Motion for Agreed Order Mon 03/24 11:32 AM
MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR TELEPHONIC MOTION CONFERENCE held on 3/21/2025 before Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith: 1) The Scheduling Order entered June 13, 202413 , as amended March 7, 202520 , is hereby further amended as follows: Discovery due by 5/14/2025. Status Report due by 5/14/2025. Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 6/13/2025. 2) Proposed Agreed Protective Order21 is denied without prejudice. (Tape #KYED-COV_2-24-cv-46_20250321_140604.) Signed by Candace J Smith. (WHP)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 03/14 2:47 PM
ORDER: TELEPHONIC MOTION CONFERENCE set for 3/21/2025 at 02:00 PM in COVINGTON before Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 3/14/2025. (WHP)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Fri 03/14 8:44 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J Smith for review: re21 Proposed Agreed Order by Kenton County Airport Board (WHP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
21 21 motion Proposed Agreed Order Thu 03/13 9:04 AM
Proposed Agreed Order by Kenton County Airport Board. (Blankenship, N.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Trial Management Order Deadlines ~Util - Set Deadlines Terminate Deadlines Fri 03/07 8:27 AM
AGREED ORDER TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINE:18 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery is GRANTED. Discovery due by 4/15/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 3/7/2025. (WHP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
utility Motion Submitted Thu 03/06 8:35 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J Smith for review:18 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Kenton County Airport Board (WHP) Modified text on 3/6/2025 (WHP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
19 19 motion Proposed Agreed Order Wed 03/05 11:46 AM
Proposed Agreed Order by Kenton County Airport Board. (Blankenship, N.)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 03/05 11:42 AM
JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Kenton County Airport Board (Blankenship, N.)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
17 17 notice Other Notice Mon 01/13 4:36 PM
NOTICE by Kenton County Airport Board (Blankenship, N.)
Related: [-]
16 16 discov Response to Discovery Request Mon 01/13 4:30 PM
RESPONSE to Discovery Request by Kenton County Airport Board.(Blankenship, N.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
15 15 discov Notice to Take Deposition Thu 12/12 2:37 PM
AMENDED NOTICE to Take Deposition of Nahed Bays on February 18, 2025 2:00 pm by Kenton County Airport Board.(Blankenship, N.)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
14 14 discov Notice to Take Deposition Fri 11/15 3:39 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Nahed Bays on December 5, 2024 at 10 a.m. by Kenton County Airport Board.(Blankenship, N.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
13 13 order Scheduling Order Deadline Thu 06/13 9:18 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER:(1) Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures on or before July 23, 2024. (2) Amended pleadings by consent or motion and/or motions to join parties on or before July 30, 2024. (3) Rule 26(a)(2)(A) expert identity disclosure accompanied by either (a)(2)(B) report or (a)(2)(C) summary disclosure Plaintiff's experts by October 18, 2024; Defendants experts by November 15, 2024; Rebuttal experts by December 16, 2024. (4) Discovery (including expert discovery) to be completed by March 21, 2025. (5) Discovery Disputes Parties shall utilize the procedure set forth in the Standing Referral Order entered upon the filing of this action (see R.3 at 3) to address any discovery disputes. (6) Status Report by close of expert discovery (currently March 21, 2025). (7) Dispositive and Daubert Motions on or before April 24, 2025. (8) Deadline Extensions must be requested prior to expiration of the applicable deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 6/13/2024.(TDB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Tue 06/11 9:44 AM
ORDER: that this case is hereby REASSIGNED to United States Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith to conduct all proceedings, including entry of judgment, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 6/11/2024.(TDB)
Related: [-]
utility File Submitted Tue 06/11 9:06 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of David L. Bunning for review:10 JOINT Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (TDB)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
10 10 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 06/10 10:14 AM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Shaw, Diana)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order For Meeting and Report Mon 06/03 9:40 AM
ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: (1) Within twenty-one (21) days from the date of the entry of this Order, the parties shall meet to discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses, and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case, and to develop a proposed discovery plan. (2) Within ten (10) days after the meeting, the parties shall file a joint status report containing: (see ORDER a-e) (3) Should the parties find that a joint report is not possible, the parties shall each file individual reports which the Court shall entertain for the purposes of setting out its Scheduling Order or other appropriate Order. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 6/3/2024.(TDB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MJ Consent Form
Friday, May 31, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/31 3:54 PM
ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Complaint by Kenton County Airport Board.(Blankenship, N.)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 04/29 11:42 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nahed Bays. Kenton County Airport Board waiver sent on 4/3/2024, answer due 6/3/2024. (Shaw, Diana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
6 6 order Order on Motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/04 4:00 PM
VIRTUAL ORDER: granting5 MOTION for Stephen E. Imm to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Nahed Bays, the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 4/4/2024. (TJG)
Related: [-]
misc Bar Status Check Thu 04/04 8:53 AM
BAR STATUS Check completed as to Stephen E. Imm re5 MOTION for Stephen E. Imm to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nahed Bays ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5807435). (TDB)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Thu 04/04 8:54 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re5 MOTION for Stephen E. Imm to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nahed Bays ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5807435) (TDB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/03 1:26 PM
MOTION for Stephen E. Imm to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nahed Bays ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5807435)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith.(Imm, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Entry Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stephen E. Imm, Esq.
Monday, April 01, 2024
4 4 notice Attorney Notice Mon 04/01 3:42 PM
NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Stephen E. Imm by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorn ey Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2(TDB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Rule 83.1,
Att: 2 Rule 83.2
3 3 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 04/01 3:39 PM
STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; (3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(TDB)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/01 3:35 PM
COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). ( Filing fee $405; receipt number AKYEDC-5805766), filed by Nahed Bays.(TDB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Conflict Check Mon 04/01 3:37 PM
Conflict Check run. (TDB)
Related: [-]