Biotie Therapies AG
Member Case
Lead case is: 7:24-bk-22284
Lead case is: 7:24-bk-22284
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David S Jones |
Case #: | 7:24-bk-22289 |
Case Filed: | Apr 01, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Biotie Therapies AG
, |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004 |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Motion, Joint Administration
Thu 04/04 12:13 PM
Order Signed on 4/4/2024 (I) Directing the Joint Administration of the Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief. The Docket in Case No. 22-22284 (DSJ) Should Be Consulted for All Matters Affecting This Case. (Calderon, Lynda) |
|
misc
Case Association - Joint Administration
Thu 04/04 2:55 PM
An Order (the " Joint Administration Order) " has been entered in this case directing the joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Acorda Therapeutics, Inc., Civitas Therapeutics, Inc., Biotie Therapies, LLC, Biotie Therapies AG, Neuronex, Inc., and Acorda Therapeutics Limited. All Docket Entries Shall be Made in Lead Case No. 24-22284 (DSJ) (Bush, Brent) |
||
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Motion, Joint Administration (batch) (one PDF)
Mon 04/01 8:35 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Cahn, Blaire (Cahn, Blaire) |
|
1 | 1
24
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 04/01 6:26 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Case Designated As Mega as per LBR 1073-1. Chapter 11 Plan due by 7/30/2024, Disclosure Statement due by 7/30/2024, Initial Case Conference due by 5/1/2024, Filed by Blaire Cahn of Baker & McKenzie LLP on behalf of Biotie Therapies AG. (Cahn, Blaire) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Mon 04/01 9:38 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-22289 ) [misc,824] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16572507. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |