New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Sanket J Bulsara
Referred: James M Wicks
Case #: 2:24-cv-02313
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2024
Defendant
Andrew Schuerlein
Defendant
Brian Nadel
Defendant
Firestone
Defendant
Nassau County
Defendant
Nassau County Police Department
Defendant
Rivka Shuter
Defendant
Robert Henaghan
Defendant
Veronica Guariglia
Plaintiff
Andrew R. Denton

GPO Oct 23 2024
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached memorandum and order, plaintiff's claim against ADA Shuter and plaintiff's claim for injunctive relief are dismissed. Defendant officers Nadel, Schuerlein, Henaghan, and Firestone, as well as Nassau County, remain active defendants in this case. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this memorandum and order to plaintiff, and to modify the case caption as directed in this memorandum and order. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, so in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 10/23/2024. (IH)
GPO Apr 02 2025
ORDER denying 45 Motion to Appoint Counsel: As set forth in the attached Order, Given that discovery has recently begun and is progressing, after considering the Hodge factors in the context of Plaintiff's application and the pleadings as well as the record as a whole, there is no special reason to request the services of a pro bono attorney at this time. Although Plaintiff's incarceration presents an obstacle for the prosecution of his case, for the reasons set forth above, the application for the appointment of pro bono counsel is denied without prejudice and with leave to renew at a later stage in these proceedings, if so warranted at that time. This denial also is without prejudice to Plaintiff hiring his own counsel to represent him. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 44445 (1962). The Clerk of the Court shall mail this Order to the Plaintiff at his address of record in an envelope marked "Legal Mail" and shall record such mailing on the docket. Please See Order for Further Details. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 4/2/2025. (DF)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
53 53 misc Mail Receipt Tue 04/29 3:49 PM
Mail receipt (Rozea, Matthew)
Related: [-]
52 52 motion Dismiss Tue 04/29 2:19 PM
MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to the Younger Doctrine with corrected Civil Action number on Local Rule 12.1 Statement by Firestone, Veronica Guariglia, Robert Henaghan, Brian Nadel, Nassau County, Nassau County Police Department, Andrew Schuerlein, Rivka Shuter. (Rozea, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Robert J. Costello,
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 3 Local Rule 12.1 Notice
Monday, April 28, 2025
order Order(Other) Mon 04/28 2:01 PM
ORDER: In light of Plaintiff's letter51 , Defendants are directed to refile the motion to dismiss with the correct case number listed on all submissions. Defendants are also directed to re-serve Plaintiff with the updated motion. So Ordered by Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 4/28/2025. (MPG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
51 51 misc Letter Thu 04/24 2:41 PM
Letter dated 4/20/2025 filed by Andrew Denton RE: Clarification. (AMF)
Related: [-]