District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Tanya S Chutkan
Case #: 1:22-cv-00354
Nature of Suit376 Other Statutes - Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause31:3729 False Claims Act
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2022
Terminated:Mar 31, 2025
Case in other court:New Jersey, 1:21-cv-20200
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 02, 2024 11:05 PM EDT
Defendant
BEHAVIORAL HEALTH GROUP, INC.
Defendant
BHG HOLDINGS, LLC
Defendant
JOHN DOE ENTITIES 1-50
Interested Party
DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By
Jessica Marie Micciolo
Office Of The Attorney General For The District Of Columbia
contact info
Interested Party
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
Benton Gregory Peterson
U.S. Attorney'S Office For The District Of Columbia
contact info
Plaintiff
PRECHELLE SHANNON
Represented By
Joel D. Hesch
Joel Hesch
contact info
Gregory M. Utter
Callow & Utter Law Group
contact info
Joseph M. Callow, Jr
Callow & Utter Law Group
contact info

GPO Mar 31 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION re: Defendant's 39 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/31/2025. (lcer)

Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
49 49 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Fri 04/25 10:56 AM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid re48 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (zjm)
Related: [-]
48 48 appeal Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Fri 04/25 10:19 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to45 Order,44 Memorandum & Opinion by PRECHELLE SHANNON. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number ADCDC-11643970. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Callow, Joseph)
Related: [-]
appeal USCA Case Number Fri 04/25 4:25 PM
USCA Case Number 25-7059 for48 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by PRECHELLE SHANNON. (zjm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
47 47 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Thu 04/03 12:11 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to BHG HOLDINGS, LLC. Attorney Kathleen McDermott terminated. (McDermott, Kathleen) Modified docket text on 4/3/2025 (mg)
Related: [-]
46 46 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/03 11:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kayla M.S. Kaplan on behalf of BHG HOLDINGS, LLC. (Kaplan, Kayla) Modified docket text on 4/3/2025 (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
45 45 order .Order Mon 03/31 11:36 AM
ORDER granting Defendant's39 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/31/2025. (lcer)
Related: [-]
44 44 21 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Mon 03/31 11:35 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION re: Defendant's39 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/31/2025. (lcer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
43 43 respm Reply to opposition to motion Wed 09/18 2:20 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re39 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BHG HOLDINGS, LLC.(McDermott, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Kathleen McDermott,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Friday, September 06, 2024
42 42 29 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Fri 09/06 4:26 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re39 Motion to Dismiss, filed by PRECHELLE SHANNON. (Callow, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
41 41 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 08/26 9:40 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to39 MOTION to Dismiss by PRECHELLE SHANNON.(Callow, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 08/26 9:51 AM
MINUTE ORDER: GRANTING41 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file an opposition to Defendant's motion to dismiss on or before September 6, 2024. Defendant shall file its reply on or before September 18, 2024. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/26/24. (lce)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
40 40 misc Declaration Wed 08/14 3:41 PM
DECLARATION of Jonathan P. York by BHG HOLDINGS, LLC re39 MOTION to Dismiss . (McDermott, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
39 39 motion Dismiss Wed 08/14 3:11 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by BHG HOLDINGS, LLC.(McDermott, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Declaration of Jonathan York,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Exhibit E,
Att: 8 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
38 38 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 07/31 9:14 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against BEHAVIORAL HEALTH GROUP, INC., BHG HOLDINGS, LLC, JOHN DOE ENTITIES 1-50 with Jury Demand filed by PRECHELLE SHANNON.(Callow, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - May 21, 2021 email chain,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - July 15, 2021 email chain,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - July 6, 2021 email chain,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - August 20, 2021 email chain,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - October 24, 2021 email chain
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
37 37 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 07/24 11:08 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint and Proposed Revised Briefing Schedule by PRECHELLE SHANNON.(Callow, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 07/24 1:03 PM
MINUTE ORDER: GRANTING37 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint on or before July 31, 2024. A response to the Amended Complaint is due on or before August 14, 2024. Any opposition to the responsive pleading is due on or before August 28, 2024, and any reply in support of the responsive pleading is due on or before September 11, 2024. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/24/24. (lce)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
36 36 motion Extension of Time to Mon 07/08 12:45 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Proposed Briefing Schedule by BHG HOLDINGS, LLC. (York, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 07/08 12:59 PM
MINUTE ORDER: GRANTING36 Motion for Extension of Time. Relator shall file an Amended Complaint on or before July 24, 2024. Defendants shall respond to the Amended Complaint on or before August 7, 2024. If Defendants file a motion in response to the Amended Complaint, Relator shall file any opposition on or before August 21, 2024, and Defendants shall file any reply on or before September 4, 2024. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/8/24. (lce)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of QC **DO NOT USE- FOR REPORTING PURPOSES ONLY.** Mon 07/08 4:34 PM
NOTICE OF ERROR re36 Motion for Extension of Time to; emailed to jonathan.york@morganlewis.com, cc'd 10 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please note the following for future filings; do not refile document , 2. DO NOT REFILE. Counsel is reminded that log in and password should match signature page. (zjm, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
35 35 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/10 4:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan P. York on behalf of BHG HOLDINGS, LLC (York, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 06/06 10:23 AM
MINUTE ORDER: GRANTING33 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant BHG Holdings LLC shall respond to the Complaint on or before July 10, 2024. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/6/24. (lce)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/06 10:25 AM
MINUTE ORDER: GRANTING34 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan P. York. Jonathan P. York is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendant BHG Holdings, LLC in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/6/24. (lce)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
34 34 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 06/05 3:41 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jonathan P. York, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10944056. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BEHAVIORAL HEALTH GROUP, INC., BHG HOLDINGS, LLC.(McDermott, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
33 33 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 06/05 3:32 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by BEHAVIORAL HEALTH GROUP, INC., BHG HOLDINGS, LLC.(McDermott, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
32 32 notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Wed 06/05 3:10 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BEHAVIORAL HEALTH GROUP, INC., BHG HOLDINGS, LLC (McDermott, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/05 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen McDermott on behalf of BEHAVIORAL HEALTH GROUP, INC., BHG HOLDINGS, LLC (McDermott, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
30 30 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Tue 04/30 1:18 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Order to Show Cause,,, filed by PRECHELLE SHANNON. (Callow, Joseph)
Related: [-]
29 29 service Waiver of Service Tue 04/30 11:10 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE. BHG HOLDINGS, LLC waiver sent on 4/9/2024, answer due 6/8/2024. (Callow, Joseph)
Related: [-]
28 28 service Waiver of Service Tue 04/30 11:09 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE. BEHAVIORAL HEALTH GROUP, INC. waiver sent on 4/9/2024, answer due 6/8/2024. (Callow, Joseph)
Related: [-]
order .Order Tue 04/30 1:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of30 Plaintiff's Response to Show Cause Order,28 Waiver of Service, and29 Waiver of Service, Plaintiff's show cause obligations are hereby DISCHARGED. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before June 10, 2024. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/30/24. (lce)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 04/30 4:14 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/10/2024. (zglw)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
order Order to Show Cause Mon 04/01 2:23 PM
MINUTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff filed this False Claims Act lawsuit November 24, 2021. On December 15, 2023, the United States and the District of Columbia filed notices declining to intervene, ECF Nos. 14, 17. As the Court provided in its December 18, 2023, Order, ECF No. 15, this notice triggered Plaintiff's obligation to serve Defendants. More than 90 days have passed since the notice, however, and it appears from the record that Plaintiff has not yet served Defendants. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff SHOW CAUSE, in writing, on or before May 3, 2024, why this action should not be dismissed. Should Plaintiff fails to effectuate service or to satisfactorily respond to the present order by May 3, 2024, the court may dismiss this action without further notice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m); Local Civ. R. 83.23. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/1/24. (lce)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 04/01 2:27 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Show Cause due by 5/3/2024. (mac)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
27 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M. Callow, Jr on behalf of PRECHELLE SHANNON (zjm)
Related: [-]
26 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory M. Utter on behalf of PRECHELLE SHANNON (zjm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
Filing fee received: $ 200, receipt number: 206355. re20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- JOSEPH M. CALLOW, JR and21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- GREGORY M. UTTER (zjm)
Related: [-]
MINUTE ORDER: GRANTING20 21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Joseph M. Callow, Jr. and Gregory M. Utter are hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Prechelle Shannon Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/4/24. Counsel have been notified by first class mail.(zgf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
25 25 DECLARATION by PRECHELLE SHANNON re21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- GREGORY M. UTTER, Receipt No TBD. Filing fee $100.. (zjm)
Related: [-]
24 24 ERRATA by PRECHELLE SHANNON re21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (zjm)
Related: [-]
23 23 DECLARATION by PRECHELLE SHANNON re20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- JOSEPH M. CALLOW, JR., Receipt No TBD. Filing fee $100.. (zjm)
Related: [-]
22 22 ERRATA by PRECHELLE SHANNON re20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (zjm)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
21 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- GREGORY M. UTTER, Receipt No TBD. Filing fee $100. by PRECHELLE SHANNON. (zjm)
Related: [-]
20 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- JOSEPH M. CALLOW, JR., Receipt No TBD. Filing fee $100. by PRECHELLE SHANNON. (zjm)
Related: [-]
19 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel D. Hesch on behalf of PRECHELLE SHANNON (zjm)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ERROR regarding21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- GREGORY M. UTTER, Receipt No TBD. Filing fee $100.,20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- JOSEPH M. CALLOW, JR., Receipt No TBD. Filing fee $100.. The following error(s) need correction: Pro Hac Vice motion must be accompanied by a payment of $100 and a Certificate of Good Standing issued within the last 30 days (LCvR 83.2(c)(2)). Please file certificate as an Errata. Also, Declaration must have an original, ink signature. Please refile using the event Declaration. (zjm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
18 18 ORDER: Copies of the parties' filings must be sent to the states of Colorado, Florida, Georgia, Louisiana, Maryland, Michigan, New Jersey, North Carolina, Rhode Island, Tennessee, the District of Columbia, and the Commonwealth of Virginia. Written consent of these states required for dismissal or settlement. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/19/2023. Counsel have been notified by first class mail. (zcdw)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
15 15 ORDER: Unsealing the complaint and the14 United States' Notice of Election to Decline Intervention. All other documents to remain sealed. Copies of the parties' filings must be sent to the United States. Written consent of the United States required for dismissal or settlement. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/18/2023. Counsel have been notified electronically. (ztl)
Related: [-]
***Case Unsealed pursuant to Order filed 12/18/2023. (zjm)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
14 14 NOTICE OF ELECTION TO DECLINE INTERVENTION by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (znmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 24, 2021
1 1 COMPLAINT against BEHAVIORAL HEALTH GROUP, INC., BHG HOLDINGS, LLC, JOHN DOE ENTITIES 1-50 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number CAM013495) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PRECHELLE SHANNON.(pr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/9/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 RECEIPT