Dickey Shea's, LLC
Texas Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Brenda T Rhoades |
Case #: | 4:24-bk-40760 |
Case Filed: | Apr 01, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 26, 2024 |
Debtor
Dickey Shea's, LLC
2201 Miranda Pl
Corinth, TX 76210-4638 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Mark A. Weisbart
Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Trustee 10501 N Central Expy Suite 106
Dallas, TX 75231 |
|
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 110 N. College Ave. Suite 300
Tyler, TX 75702 |
Docket last updated: 04/02/2024 12:04 AM CDT |
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
crditcrd
none
Mon 04/01 6:12 PM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition, All Schedules & Statements (fee)-case upload([LINK 24-40760 ) [caseupld,1027u] ( 338.00) filing fee. Receipt number A13280375, amount $ 338.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
caseupld
Voluntary Petition Chapter 7, All Schedules & Statements [fee]-case upload
Mon 04/01 3:11 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition, Schedules A-J, Statements, Matrix, and All Other Required Documents(Uploaded electronically). Filed by Abraham C. Bloomenstiel of Bloomenstiel P.C. on behalf of Dickey Shea's, LLC. Document Due 4/8/2024. (Bloomenstiel, Abraham) |
|
2 | 2
court
Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7
Mon 04/01 11:52 PM
341(a) |