Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Henry Edward Autrey
Case #: 4:24-cv-00490
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 29, 2024 4:32 AM CDT
Defendant
Ryan P. Litchfield
an individual 708 Knollshire Way Court
O'Fallon, MO 63368
Defendant
Shamrock Concrete LLC
Defendant
Shamrock Contracting, LLC
Plaintiff
Julie A. Su
Represented By
Quinlan Braden Moll
Us Department Of Labor - Kansas City
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
20 20 order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Tue 04/01 11:49 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:19 Fourth MOTION for Extension of: Time for Service of Process by Plaintiff Julie A. Su.(Moll, Quinlan) filed by Julie A. Su ; Additional time is granted up to and including June 13, 2025 in which to accomplish service of process. No additional time will be granted after June 13, 2025. So Ordered. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/1/2025. (CLH)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
19 19 motion Extension Mon 03/31 5:14 PM
Fourth MOTION for Extension of: Time for Service of Process by Plaintiff Julie A. Su.(Moll, Quinlan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ryan Litchfield Waiver of Service Email,
Att: 2 Exhibit Shamrock Concrete Facebook Posts
Friday, March 28, 2025
18 18 8 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 03/28 4:36 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re17 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Party Shamrock Concrete LLC; Shamrock Contracting, LLC filed by Plaintiff Julie A. Su.(Moll, Quinlan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Addam Kinsel,
Att: 2 Exhibit Back Wages Owed
17 17 motion Default Judgment Party Only Fri 03/28 4:33 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Party Shamrock Concrete LLC; Shamrock Contracting, LLC by Plaintiff Julie A. Su. (Moll, Quinlan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
16 16 notice Electronic Notice re: Motion for Default Judgment Tue 03/25 8:22 AM
Electronic Notice re: Motion for Default Judgment. An Entry of Default was recently entered by the Clerk of Court in this case against Defendants Shamrock Concrete LLC, Shamrock Contracting, LLC. Please file a Motion for Default Judgment as soon as possible or file a Notice with the Court stating why the motion cannot be filed at this time. (CBL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
15 15 order Clerks Entry of Default Thu 02/27 11:01 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendants Shamrock Concrete LLC, Shamrock Contracting, LLC. (copy of default mailed to defendants on 2/27/25.) (HMA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
misc Remark Wed 02/19 11:13 AM
***REMARK- the Motion for Clerk's Default was forwarded to the Clerk of Court/Chief Deputy for ruling. (CLH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
14 14 motion Default Entry Tue 02/18 1:14 PM
MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default against Defendant Shamrock Concrete LLC; Defendant Shamrock Contracting, LLC by Plaintiff Julie A. Su. (Moll, Quinlan)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 02/18 12:42 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Julie A. Su. Shamrock Contracting, LLC served on 12/19/2024, answer due 1/9/2025. (Moll, Quinlan)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 02/18 12:40 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Julie A. Su. Shamrock Concrete LLC served on 11/13/2024, answer due 12/4/2024. (Moll, Quinlan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
11 11 order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Tue 12/31 1:11 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:10 Third MOTION for Extension of Time for Service of Process filed by Plaintiff Julie A. Su; ORDERED Granted. Plaintiff is allowed up to and including March 31, 2025, to effect service on the remaining Defendant in this matter, Ryan Litchfield. So ordered. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/31/2024. (HMA)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
10 10 motion Extension Mon 12/30 3:35 PM
Third MOTION for Extension of: Time for Service of Process by Plaintiff Julie A. Su.(Moll, Quinlan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Shamrock Concrete Affidavit of Service
Thursday, October 31, 2024
9 9 order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Thu 10/31 10:17 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:8 Second MOTION for Extension of: Time for Service of Process filed by Plaintiff Julie A. Su; GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Related [+] Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/31/2024. (HMA)
Related: [-] sponse to Court due by 12/30/2024.
Monday, September 30, 2024
8 8 motion Extension Mon 09/30 5:01 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of: Time for Service of Process by Plaintiff Julie A. Su. (Moll, Quinlan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Thu 09/05 2:56 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Julie A. Su as to Ryan P. Litchfield, Shamrock Concrete LLC, Shamrock Contracting, LLC. (CLH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 07/16 2:37 PM
Summons Issued as to defendant Shamrock Concrete LLC. The summons was emailed to attorney Quinlan Moll. (JEB)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 07/16 1:30 PM
Summons Issued as to defendant Ryan P. Litchfield, Shamrock Contracting, LLC. The summons were emailed to attorney Quinlan Moll. (JEB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
4 4 misc Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT) Thu 07/11 3:42 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL re1 Complaint, Summons by Plaintiff Julie A. Su.(Moll, Quinlan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Shamrock Contracting, LLC,
Att: 2 Summons Ryan Litchfield
Thursday, June 27, 2024
3 3 2 pgs order Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule) Thu 06/27 12:32 PM
ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Process and for Order Directing United States Marshal's Service (Doc. No.2 ) is hereby granted. Plaintiff is granted an additional 90 days, until and including September 30, 2024, to effect service. The U.S. Marshal Service is hereby directed to serve Defendants Shamrock Concrete LLC, Shamrock Contracting, LLC, and Ryan Litchfield in this case. Plaintiff shall provide the U.S. Marshal Service with the documents needed to enact service. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 6/27/2024. (JEB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
2 2 motion Extension Wed 06/26 3:47 PM
MOTION for Extension of: Time for Service of Process and for Order Directing United States Marshal's Service by Plaintiff Julie A. Su.(Moll, Quinlan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Form USM 285 Shamrock Contracting, LLC,
Att: 3 Form USM 285 Shamrock Concrete LLC,
Att: 4 Form USM 285 Ryan Litchfield,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
misc Case Opening Notification Tue 04/02 8:36 AM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry Edward Autrey. 3 Waiver(s) of Service issued. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JWD)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/01 5:32 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant Ryan P. Litchfield, Shamrock Concrete LLC, Shamrock Contracting, LLC Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Julie A. Su.(Moll, Quinlan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Waiver of Service Shamrock Concrete LLC,
Att: 4 Waiver of Service Shamrock Contracting, LLC,
Att: 5 Waiver of Service Ryan Litchfield,
Att: 6 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form