Maryland District Court
Judge:Timothy J Sullivan
Case #: 8:24-cv-00951
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981cv Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 28, 2024 7:33 AM EDT
Defendant
Randi Lewis
Represented By
Erin M. Franzblau
Croke, Fairchild, Duarte & Beres, LLC
contact info
Kraig Betner Long
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
David J. Doyle
Smith, Gambrell & Russell, LLP
contact info
Alexander A. Pabon
Smith, Gambrell & Russell LLP
contact info
Maya R. Foster
Nelson Mullins LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Thomas Johnson
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
Defendant
Eliza Stoker
Represented By
Erin M. Franzblau
Croke, Fairchild, Duarte & Beres, LLC
contact info
Kraig Betner Long
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
David J. Doyle
Smith, Gambrell & Russell, LLP
contact info
Alexander A. Pabon
Smith, Gambrell & Russell LLP
contact info
Maya R. Foster
Nelson Mullins LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Thomas Johnson
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
Defendant
Andy Ufberg
Represented By
Erin M. Franzblau
Croke, Fairchild, Duarte & Beres, LLC
contact info
Kraig Betner Long
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
David J. Doyle
Smith, Gambrell & Russell, LLP
contact info
Alexander A. Pabon
Smith, Gambrell & Russell LLP
contact info
Maya R. Foster
Nelson Mullins LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Thomas Johnson
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
Defendant
Major, Lindsey & Africa
Represented By
Erin M. Franzblau
Croke, Fairchild, Duarte & Beres, LLC
contact info
Kraig Betner Long
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
David J. Doyle
Smith, Gambrell & Russell, LLP
contact info
Alexander A. Pabon
Smith, Gambrell & Russell LLP
contact info
Maya R. Foster
Nelson Mullins LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Thomas Johnson
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Gita F. Sankano
Represented By
Michael J. Willemin
Wigdor LLP
contact info
Gregg Cohen Greenberg
Zipin, Amster And Greenberg, LLC
contact info

GPO Mar 17 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 3/17/2025. (heps, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, April 17, 2025
54 54 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/17 1:41 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting53 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Brooke Payton. Directing attorney Brooke Payton to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 4/17/2025. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
53 53 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/15 4:49 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brooke Payton (Filing fee $100, receipt number BMDDC-11911418.) by Gita F. Sankano(Greenberg, Gregg)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
52 52 misc Status Report Mon 04/14 2:59 PM
STATUS REPORT by Major, Lindsey & Africa(Long, Kraig)
Related: [-]